USA v. Parrillo
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:98-cr-00181-CMH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Alexandria
Filed 5/1/1998
County Fairfax
Terminated 7/24/1998
Reopened
Magistrate Case
197-mj-01231
Citation
Offense Level
Threaten the President of the United States [ 197-m -1231 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871(a) Threatening the President of the United States (12/24/97)
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT for Revocation of Supervised Release ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
    Supervised Release Violation Hearing as to James William Parrillo held before Judge Claude M. Hilton ( Reporter: Linnell) USA appeared through: Karin Richards Dft(s) appeared w/counsel Frank Salvato. Dft admits viol. of conditions of SR. Court finds dft in viol. of cond. of SR. Dft committed to custody of US Atty Gen. to serve a term of 6 mos. and SR is terminated. Dft remanded. (psid)
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 7/20/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Position on Sentencing
      POSITION with Respect to Sentencing Factors by James William Parrillo (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000, Terminated: 1/27/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        MOTION by USA as to James William Parrillo by USA for order pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4246 (jcup)
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 Notice of Hearing.
          Praecipe of Hearing as to James William Parrillo set Sentencing for 9:00 a.m. for 7/21/00 (jcup) Modified on 07/12/2000
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Psychiatric Report +
            Psychiatric Report as to James William Parrillo (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER as to James William Parrillo granting [22-1] motion by James William Parrillo for Psychiatric Exam and the dft shall undergo a psychiatric examination, for a reasonable period of time, not to exceed 30 days at FCI, Butner, NC. The U.S. Marshals shall, as soon as possible, transport the dft to FCI Butner for the purpose of said examination (See Order for details) ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/27/2000 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                Minute entry as to James William Parrillo : before Judge Claude M. Hilton ( Reporter: Linnell) USA appeared through: Charles Rosenberg Dft(s) appeared w/counsel Frank Salvato. Matter on for Supervised Release Violation Hearing. Dft's motion for mental examination - granted. Order entered in open court. Dft to be transported to FCI Butner for a psychiatric exam. Dft remanded. (psid)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000, Terminated: 1/21/2000 Motion for Psychiatric Exam
                  MOTION by James William Parrillo for Psychiatric Exam (lbac)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/19/2000 Response in Support
                    MEMORANDUM by USA as to James William Parrillo in support of Revocation of defendant's Supervised Release (clar)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      REPORT of Hearing on Violation of Supervised Release and ORDER as to James William Parrillo: ordered that deftis remanded to USMS to appear before Judge Hilton on 1/21/00 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa C. Buchanan ) Copies Mailed: yes (lbac)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                        Supervised Release Violation Hearing as to James William Parrillo set 9:00 1/21/00 before Judge Hilton (lbac)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Probation Violation Hearing as to James William Parrillo held before Magistrate Judge Theresa C. Buchanan ( 35) USA appeared through: Kerr. Dft(s) appeared through: Salvato. Deft stipulates to violations. Deft remanded to USMS to appear before Judge Hilton. Order to be entered. (lbac)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                            Probation Violation Hearing as to James William Parrillo reset 9:30 1/14/00 before Judge Buchanan (lbac)
                              LREF
                              Blank 19 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to James William Parrillo ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa C. Buchanan ) (lbac)
                                LREF
                                Blank 18 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 Warrant Returned Executed
                                ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to James William Parrillo on 1/11/00 (lbac)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Probation Violation Hearing as to James William Parrillo set 2:00 1/13/00 before Judge Buchanan (lbac)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Probation Violation Hearing as to James William Parrillo held before Magistrate Judge Theresa C. Buchanan ( 34) USA appeared through: Kerr. Dft(s) appeared through: w/out. Gov request detention - granted. Matter continued for PH/DH as to Probation violations. Deft detained. (lbac)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                      PETITION AND ORDER on Probation/Supervised Release as to James William Parrillo that the Court will Order a warrant to be issued directing that the offender appear before the Court to show cause why supervision should not be revoked - ent & filed (signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) (clar)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999 Warrant Issued
                                        BENCH WARRANT issued as to James William Parrillo (no bond recommendation) (clar)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998 Judgment*Court Filing
                                          JUDGMENT James William Parrillo (1) count(s) 1. 20 mos. w/3 year super. release term ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998 Set/Reset Hearings
                                            Sentencing held before Judge Claude M. Hilton ( Reporter: Linnell) USA appeared through: Tom Connolly Dft(s) appeared w/counsel Frank Salvato James William Parrillo (1) count(s) 1. Judgment: Guilty. Dft committed to custody of US BOP for 20 mos. w/3 year supervised release term and assessed $100. Cond. of SR: substance abuse testing/treatment at the direction of PO, mental health counseling at direction of PO. Court rec. that the dft be incarcerated at Butner. Dft remanded. (psid)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998 Position on Sentencing
                                              POSITION with Respect to Sentencing Factors by USA as to James William Parrillo (clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Description not available
                                                STATEMENT OF FACTS as to James William Parrillo (psid)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Plea Agreement
                                                  Plea Agreement as to James William Parrillo (psid)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Waiver of Indictment
                                                    WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by James William Parrillo (psid)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Information - Felony
                                                      INFORMATION as to James William Parrillo (1) count(s) 1 (Preliminary Examination cancelled.) (psid)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                        Sentencing set for 9:00 7/24/98 for James William Parrillo James William Parrillo (1) count(s) 1 (psid)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Plea - Miscellaneous
                                                          PLEA entered by James William Parrillo . Court accepts plea. by James William Parrillo Guilty: James William Parrillo (1) count(s) 1 (psid)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Plea Agreement
                                                            Plea Agreement Hearing as to James William Parrillo held before Judge Claude M. Hilton ( Reporter: Linnell) USA appeared through: Chuck Rosenberg Dft(s) appeared w/counsel Frank Salvato. Dft FA, PG to the Criminal Info. Accepted. Referred to PO for PSIR and cont. to 7/24/98 at 9:00 for g/l sent. Court Orders that the dft be kept in Alexandria. Dft remanded. (psid)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Detention Hearing
                                                              Detention hearing as to James William Parrillo set for 10:00 5/1/98 for James William Parrillo [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (jsch)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                This case has been cont. to 5/1/98 @ 10:00 a.m. for DH as to James William Parrillo [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (jsch)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to James William Parrillo Detention Hearing set for 2:30 4/28/98 for James William Parrillo ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (jsch)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                    Minute entry as to James William Parrillo : before Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ( Casamo & Assoc.) USA appeared through: Drager Dft(s) appeared through: Salvato. This matter came on for Deft's appearance after mental evaluation. Deft. found competent to stand trial. Gov't requested Detention - Granted. Case cont. to 4/28/98 @ 2:30 p.m. for DH/PH. Deft. remanded. [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (jsch)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Psychiatric Report +
                                                                      Psychiatric Report as to James William Parrillo (UNDER SEAL) [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (psid)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER as to James William Parrillo, Extending period of examination and evaluation through 4/13/98. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) Copies Mailed: 02.24.98 [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (rtra)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/7/1998, Entered: 1/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDERED that the defendant, James William Parillo, shall undergo a pretrial psychiatric examination, for a reasonsable period of time, not to exceed forty-five (45) days, at the Federal Correctional Institute, Butner, North Carolina, by a qualified psychiatrist and ORDERED that this examination shall be completed within forty-five (45) days from the date of this order and that upon completion of the examination, copies of the sealed report shall be provided to United States District Court and Frank Salvato and to the United States Attorney. The U.S. Marshals Service shall, as soon as practicable, transport the defendant to FCI Butner for the purpose of said examination as to James William Parrillo granting [6-1] joint motion by USA and James William Parrillo for Psychiatric Exam as to James William Parrillo (1) ( Signed by Judge Barry R. Poretz ) Copies Mailed: y [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (jsch)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/6/1998, Entered: 1/8/1998, Terminated: 1/7/1998 Motion for Psychiatric Exam
                                                                            JOINT MOTION by USA and James William Parrillo for Psychiatric Exam [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (jsch)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/6/1998, Entered: 1/8/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                              Minute entry as to James William Parrillo : before Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ( Casamo & Assoc.) USA appeared through: Rosenberg Dft(s) appeared through: Salvato. This matter came on for a DH/PH. Deft. filed a joint motion in open court for a mental examination and advised that the defendant is unable to assist properly in his defense. Motion Granted. Deft. remanded to be the U.S. Marshals for transportation to the Federal Correctional Institute, Butner, N.C. [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (jsch)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/1998, Entered: 1/2/1998 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed as to James William Parrillo on 12/30/97 [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (avax)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/30/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                  Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed as to James William Parrillo on 12/30/97 [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (jsch)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/30/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to James William Parrillo ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (jsch)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/30/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998 Initial Appearance
                                                                                      Initial appearance as to James William Parrillo held ; Preliminary Examination set for 1:30 1/6/98 for James William Parrillo before Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ( Casamo & Assoc.) USA appeared through: Chesnut Dft(s) appeared through: Salvato (Defendant informed of rights.) Gov't requested Detention - Granted. Case cont. to 1/6/98 @ 1:30 p.m. for DH/PH. Deft. remanded. [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (jsch)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997 Affidavit
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by USA as to James William Parrillo Re: [1-1] complaint [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (rtra)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT as to James William Parrillo [ 1:97-m -1231 ] (rtra)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1,783 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?