USA, et al v. Figueroa-Trejo
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-mj-03001-LOA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
81326(a) Illegal re-entry after deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag MAG-TERMED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Order
MINUTE ORDER excludable delay stopped , dft Rodrigo Figueroa-Trejo moved to Crim Case No: CR 01-56 PHX SRB , counts terminated and excludables stopped at magistrate level. , cr all parties moved to a criminal case, mag case termed [0-4] (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001, Terminated: 12/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    MINUTE ORDER plea hearing set for 2:00 1/19/01 for Rodrigo Figueroa-Trejo , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [5-3] (PHR)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 CJA 20 Appointment
      CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Rodrigo Figueroa-Trejo appointing Atmore Baggot (PHR)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
        ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Lawrence O Anderson as to Rodrigo Figueroa-Trejo re: detention order [3-1] (PHR)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          ( FILED: 1/2/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer first appearance of Rodrigo Figueroa-Trejo ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Rodrigo Figueroa-Trejo appears with counsel Atmore L Baggot , detention hrg submitted; dft detained; prelim hrg waived and dft held to answer before the District Court; SPANISH interpreter required for Rodrigo Figueroa-Trejo. [2-4] (PHR)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Complaint
            COMPLAINT filed as to Rodrigo Figueroa-Trejo (PHR)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Arrest
              DEFENDANT Rodrigo Figueroa-Trejo arrested. Rodrigo Figueroa-Trejo (1) count(s) cmp (PHR)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 66 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?