USA, et al v. Quintero-Solis
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-mj-03002-LOA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
81326 Re-entry after deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag MAG-TERMED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Order
MINUTE ORDER excludable delay stopped , dft Jose Quintero-Solis moved to Crim Case No: CR 01-58 PHX SRB , counts terminated and excludables stopped at magistrate level., , all parties moved to a criminal case, mag case termed [0-4] (LAD)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001, Terminated: 12/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Morton Sitver; at the request of defense counsel plea hrg is reset in TIME only to 1:30 on 1/18/01 [5-1] re: order [5-1] (PKD)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 9:30 on 1/18/01 for Jose Quintero-Solis , before Mag Judge Morton Sitver [4-3] (SMM)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Waiver of Indictment
        WAIVER of Indictment pending by USA as to Jose Quintero-Solis ; Judge drawn to hear plea: Bolton (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
          ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson as to Jose Quintero-Solis re: detention order [3-1] (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            ( FILED: 01/02/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer Bond set to SPANISH for Jose Quintero-Solis. , first appearance of Jose Quintero-Solis ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Jose Quintero-Solis appears with counsel Gerald Williams. Detention hearing submitted, dft detained. Preliminary hearing waived. [2-4] (former emp)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Complaint
              COMPLAINT Jose Quintero-Solis (1) count(s) cmp (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Arrest
                DEFENDANT Jose Quintero-Solis arrested. (former emp)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 53 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?