United States v. Cox
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00028-RGD-JEB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 2:59 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Joseph Seidel, Jr. +1 757 441 6331 rob.seidel@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Norfolk
Filed 2/26/2003
County Virginia Beach City
Terminated 7/14/2003
Reopened
Magistrate Case
202-mj-00501
Citation
Offense Level
Violation of T.18871 - Knowingly and intentionally make a threat to take the life of, to kidnap and to inflict bodily harm upon the President of the United States [ 202-m -501 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
T.18871 (18871.F) Threaten to take the life and inflict bodily harm upon the President of the United States (Date Offense Concluded 8/26/02)
Def Custody Status Fugitive
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Exhibit
Exhibit of Paper Received by Robert Joseph Seidel, Jr. 7/9/08 (ldab, )
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Addendum to Petition on Probation
    Addendum to Petition on Supervised Release as to James Monroe Cox, entered and filed 7/8/08 (ldab, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Exhibit
      Exhibit of Paper Returned as to Robert Joseph Seidel, Jr.. (ldab, )
        LREF
        Blank 37 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Petition and Order on Supervised Release/ProbationCourt Filing
        Petition and Order on Supervised Release directing a warrant to be issued, entered and filed 05/25/07. (Signed by Judge Robert G. Doumar) copies mailed on 05/29/07, ob. (ldab, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Warrant Issued
          Arrest Warrant Issued and Delivered to USM 05/29/07 as to James Monroe Cox. (ldab, )
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of MANDATE as to James Monroe Cox (they)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 USCA Judgment
              JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) with copy of opinion of USCA Affirmed the judgment of the District Ct re: [28-1] appeal as to James Monroe Cox (they)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                ADVANCE COPY OF PRINTED OPINION as to James Monroe Cox re: [28-1] appeal USCA #03-4608; Affirmed. (kgri)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 Judgment Returned Executed
                  Judgment Returned Executed as to James Monroe Cox ; on 9/18/03; deft. delivered to USM Springfield, MO (they)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                    Certification of completion sent to USCA re: as to James Monroe Cox [28-1] appeal by James Monroe Cox (clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 32 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Appeal Transcript
                      TRANSCRIPT OF SENTENCING PROCEEDINGS filed as to James Monroe Cox for dates of 7/14/03 Re: [28-1] appeal (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 31 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Appeal Transcript
                        TRANSCRIPT OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS filed as to James Monroe Cox for dates of 6/3/03 Re: [28-1] appeal (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 30 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 USCA Order
                          Copy of USCA Order appointing the FPD at Norfolk as attorney for James Monroe Cox (clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 USCA Case Number
                            USCA Case Number as to James Monroe Cox Re: [28-1] appeal USCA Number: 03-4608 CASE MANAGER: C.D. Ida (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                              Transcript Order form for Trial on 6/3/03 and Sentencing on 7/14/03 filed by James Monroe Cox (clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
                                Copy of Notice of appeal, Judgment filed 7/15/03 and certified copy of docket as to James Monroe Cox to USCA: copy of notice of appeal, docketing statement, transcript order form and docket sheet to counsel for defendant/appellant; copy fo notice of appeal to AUSA, PO, PTS, USM, Ct. Rptr. re: [28-1] appeal (clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003, Terminated: 2/19/2004 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by James Monroe Cox, filed. (clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    SUPERVISED RELEASE VIOLATION ORDER as to James Monroe Cox, entered and filed 4/2/09. (Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis) copies mailed and e-designated on 4/2/09, ob. (ldab, ) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
                                      JUDGMENT - James Monroe Cox (1) - Count 1: IMPRISONMENT: FIFTY-ONE (51) MONTHS; SUPERVISED RELEASE: TWO (2) YEARS; SPECIAL ASSESSMENT: $100.00; ent. and filed 7/15/03. (Signed by Judge Robert G. Doumar) Copies Mailed: 7/15/03, o.b. (kgri)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Additional Addendum to Petition on Supervised Release as to James Monroe Cox, entered and filed 3/24/09, copies mailed 3/25/09, ob. (ldab, ) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                          Permanent Record (kgri)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER as to James Monroe Cox. The Court hereby ORDERS that all proceedings relevant to the Defendant's case be reassigned in the Eastern District of Virginia, Norfolk Division. Entered and filed 3/23/09. (Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar) copies mailed on 3/23/2009. (ldab, ) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                              Sentencing before Judge Robert G. Doumar held (Penny Wile, OCR) USA appeared through: Robert J. Seidel, Jr. Dft(s) appeared through: Larry W. Shelton, AFPD. James Monroe Cox (1) count(s) 1 Court Hours: 2:00-2:40 (bwin)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER OF DETENTION as to James Monroe Cox, entered and filed 1/30/09. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry) copies mailed on 1/30/2009, ob. (ldab, ) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Position on Sentencing
                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL POSITION with Respect to Sentencing Factors by James Monroe Cox (scar)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to James Monroe Cox, entered and filed 1/27/09. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry) copies mailed on 1/28/09, ob. (ldab, ) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Position on Sentencing
                                                      AMENDED POSITION with Respect to Sentencing Factors by USA as to James Monroe Cox (they)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by James Monroe Cox, filed in open court 1/27/09 (ldab, ) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Position on Sentencing
                                                          POSITION with Respect to Sentencing Factors by USA as to James Monroe Cox (they)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/27/2009 in case as to James Monroe Cox. (ldab, ) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Response to Motion
                                                              RESPONSE by USA as to James Monroe Cox re [22-1] motion Defendant's Motion for Downward Departure by James Monroe Cox (they)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Petition and order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to James Monroe Cox, entered and filed 01/06/2009. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) copies mailed on 01/07/2009, ob. (ldab, ) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003, Terminated: 7/15/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                  Defendant's Motion for Downward Departure by James Monroe Cox . (kgri)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003 Position on Sentencing
                                                                    POSITION of Defendant with Respect to Sentencing Factors by James Monroe Cox. (kgri)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                      Sentencing before Judge Robert G. Doumar set for 2:00, 7/14/03, for James Monroe Cox. (bwin)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Court Verdict
                                                                        COURT VERDICT Guilty: James Monroe Cox (1) count(s) 1 (bwin)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                          Bench Trial as to James Monroe Cox held before Judge Robert G. Doumar (Penny Wile, OCR). USA appeared through Robert J. Seidel, Jr., AUSA. Dft(s) appeared n custody) with Larry W. Shelton, AFPD. Opening statements heard. Witnesses excluded on motion of deft. Govt. presented evidence and rested. Deft. moved for a directed verdict. Ruling withheld. Deft. presented evidence and rested. Deft. remewed motion. Denied. Arguments heard. Court ruled finding the deft. Guilty. Court Hours: 10:00-12:40 (bwin)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Bench Trial - Begun
                                                                            Bench trial begun as to James Monroe Cox (1) count(s) 1 (bwin)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Waiver of Trial by JuryCourt Filing
                                                                              WAIVER of trial by jury by James Monroe Cox, USA approved by the Court. ( signed by Judge Robert G. Doumar ) (they)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Notice of Intent to Use Evidence
                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF INTENT to Introduce Evidence Pursuant to Rule 404(b) by USA as to James Monroe Cox (popo)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Notice of Intent to Use Evidence
                                                                                  NOTICE OF INTENT to Introduce Evidence Pursuant to Rule 404(b) by USA as to James Monroe Cox (popo)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Motion in Limine
                                                                                    MOTION by USA as to James Monroe Cox by USA in Limine to Preclude Irrelevant Defense (popo)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER OF DETENTION as to James Monroe Cox, entered 3/24/03 & filed 3/25/03 (Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry) Copies Distributed: 3/25/03 (arou)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                        Arraignment as to James Monroe Cox held before Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry (FTR) USA appeared through Rob Seidel, AUSA; deft appeared through Larry Shelton, FPD; Prelim. Motion Filings due 4/30/03; Jury Trial set for 10:00 6/3/03; Deft waived formal arraignment; deft plead not guilty; jury demanded; deft remanded to custody of USM Rob Seidel, AUSA (arou)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Detention Hearing
                                                                                          Detention hearing as to James Monroe Cox held before Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry (FTR) USA appeared through Rob Seidel, AUSA; Deft appeared through Larry Shelton, FPD. Court ordered deft detained pending trial. Deft remanded to custody of USM (arou)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Agreed Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            Agreed Discovery Order by James Monroe Cox, USA. ent & filed 3/20/03 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller ) Copies Mailed: 3/20/03 (scar)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Warrant Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT issued on indictment Returned Unexecuted as to James Monroe Cox (scar)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to James Monroe Cox Detention Hearing set for 11:00 3/24/03 for James Monroe Cox entered and filed 3/20/03 ( Signed by Judge Robert G. Doumar ) copies mailed 3/20/03 (clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. 4241 FINDING THE DEFENDANT COMPETENT as to James Monroe Cox; the Court FINDS that the deft. is able to understand the anture and consequences of the proceedings against him and to assist properly in his defense and the Court FINDS that the deft. is not presently suffering from a mental disease or defect rendering him mentally incompetent, entered and filed 3/20/03 (Signed by Judge Robert G. Doumar ) Copies Mailed: 3/20/03 (clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Competency Hearing
                                                                                                    Competency Hearing as to James Monroe Cox held before Judge Robert G. Doumar (Penny Wile, OCR). USA appeared through Robert Seidel, AUSA. Dft(s) appeared (in custody) with Larry Shelton, AFPD. Court finds deft. competent to stand trial. Detention hearing set March 24, 2003; 11:00 a.m. Court will prepare order. (bwin)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                      Competency hearing as to James Monroe Cox [10-1] set at 11:00 3/20/03 before Judge Robert G. Doumar (arou)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Psychiatric Report +
                                                                                                        Sealed Report as to James Monroe Cox (arou)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Motion for Psychiatric Exam
                                                                                                          MOTION by USA To Determine Competency Pursuant to T.18:4241 (arou) Modified on 03/14/2003
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Indictment
                                                                                                            INDICTMENT RETURNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT as to James Monroe Cox (1) count(s) 1. On motion of the Govt., the Court directed warrant to be issued (arou)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT issued as to James Monroe Cox and delivered to USM on 2/27/03 (arou)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry (arou)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Mental Examination to Determine the Defendant's Mental Competency as to James Monroe Cox (1), entered and filed in open court (Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 11/6/02 [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002, Terminated: 11/6/2002 Motion for Psychiatric Exam
                                                                                                                    MOTION by James Monroe Cox for Mental Examination to Determine the Defendant's Mental Competency [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance for James Monroe Cox by Attorney Larry Shelton [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                        Minute entry as to James Monroe Cox: Came on for preliminary/detention hearing before Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller (FTR) USA Appeared through: Robert Seidel, AUSA Dft(s) appeared through: Walter Dalton, AFPD. Prel & detention hearing continued generally pending competency examination. [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER Appointing Federal Public Defender for James Monroe Cox: Public Defender is Larry W. Shelton, enterd & filed 11/4/02 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to James Monroe Cox, entered and filed 11/4/02 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Distributed: 11/5/02 [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                              CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by James Monroe Cox, filed in open court [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to James Monroe Cox on 11/4/02 [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                  Initial appearance as to James Monroe Cox held before Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller (FTR) USA appeared through Robert Seidel, AUSA; Deft appeared in custody w/out counsel; Counsel desired; Court directed appointment of counsel. Temp. detention ordered. Detention Hearing set for 2:00 11/6/02. Deft remanded to custody of USM. (Defendant informed of rights.) [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Document Unsealed
                                                                                                                                    Complaint unsealed as to James Monroe Cox [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Document Unsealed
                                                                                                                                      Complaint unsealed as to James Monroe Cox [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Complaint(Sealed)
                                                                                                                                        SEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to James Monroe Cox, executed & filed 11/1/02 James Monroe Cox (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Oral Order
                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER to Seal this Case until Monday, 11/4/02 at time of arrest as to James Monroe Cox (Entered by Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry) [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                            CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT issued as to James Monroe Cox and delivered to USM [ 2:02-m -501 ] (arou)
                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 267 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?