USA v. Tobolsky
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00199-HCM-FBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert John Krask +1 757 441 6331 bob.krask@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Norfolk
Filed 2/10/2004
County Virginia Beach City
Terminated 3/26/2004
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 17A U.S.C. § 506A.F
Offense Level 4
T.17 USC 506(a)(1) and T.18 USC 2319(b)(1) and 2 [17A506A.F] CRIMINAL INFRINGEMENT ON COPYRIGHTS - T.17 USC 506(b) FORFEITURE
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Rule 20 - Transfer Out
Consent to Transfer Jurisdiction (Rule 20) to Middle District of Florida (Orlando Division) as to Alexander Tobolsky - Count closed: Count 1 . (kgri)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
    Rule 40 Documents as to Alexander Tobolsky received from Middle District of Florida (Orlando Division). Deft. released on PR bond with conds. Deft. dir. to appear in EDVA on 2/12/04. (kgri)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER as to Alexander Tobolsky, Modifying Conditions of Release ent. and filed 2/20/04 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry ) Copies Mailed: 2/20/04 (they)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
        NOTICE of Appearance for Alexander Tobolsky by Attorney Larry Mark Dash, AFPD. (kgri)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
          ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Alexander Tobolsky (Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry on 2/10/04 and filed on 2/12/04) Copies Mailed: 2/12/04. (kgri)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
            Arraignment as to Alexander Tobolsky held before Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry (Recorded: FTR). USA appeared through: AUSA Robert Krask. Dft(s) appeared through: Larry Dash, AFPD. Deft. waived formal arrgn. Deft. plead not guilty. Jury demanded. Prel. mots. due 3/12/04; resps. due w/i 11 days; Jury Trial set for 4/20/04 at 10:00 a.m. in Norfolk. Deft. contd. on present bond. Court Hours: 2:30-2:45 p.m. (kgri)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Agreed Discovery OrderCourt Filing
              Agreed Discovery Order by Alexander Tobolsky, USA (Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry and filed in open court on 2/11/04) Copies Mailed: 2/12/04. (kgri)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FORM executed as to Alexander Tobolsky and filed in open court. (kgri)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
                  ORDER Appointing Federal Public Defender for Alexander Tobolsky (Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry) Copies mailed 2/11/04. (kgri)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                    Government's Disclosure Statement Regarding Organizational Victim as to Alexander Tobolsky. (kgri)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Bond
                      UNSECURED APPEARANCE BOND entered by Alexander Tobolsky Amount $ 10,000.00. (kgri)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                        CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Alexander Tobolsky exec. and filed in open court. (kgri)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Indictment Unsealed
                          Indictment unsealed as to Alexander Tobolsky. (kgri)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Oral Order
                            ORAL ORDER granting [0-0] oral motion by USA to Unseal Indictment as to Alexander Tobolsky (1) (Entered by Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry) (kgri)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004, Terminated: 2/10/2004 Oral Order
                              ORAL MOTION in open court by USA to Unseal Indictment as to Alexander Tobolsky. (kgri)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Initial Appearance
                                Initial appearance in this district as to Alexander Tobolsky held before Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry (Recorded: FTR). USA appeared through: AUSA Bob Krask. Dft(s) appeared NOT IN CUST. w/o cnsl. (Defendant informed of rights.) Counsel desired. Court dir. appt. of cnsl. Govt. motion to unseal indictment - granted. Florida bond amended to include addl. conds. and set at $10,000.00 Unsecured. Court Hours: 3:30-4:11 p.m. (kgri)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Arrest - Other District
                                  ARREST of Alexander Tobolsky on 1/15/04 in Middle District of Florida (Orlando Div.). (kgri)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Warrant Issued
                                    ARREST WARRANT issued as to Alexander Tobolsky and del. to US Mshl. under seal. (kgri)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER as to Alexander Tobolsky Sealing [1-1] indictment . (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. B. Stillman and filed in open court on 12/18/03) Copies Mailed: 12/19/03. (kgri)
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Indictment -Sealed
                                        SEALED INDICTMENT as to Alexander Tobolsky (1) - Count 1 returned and filed in open court. Govt. requested and court dir. warrant to be issued. (kgri)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                          CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge F. B. Stillman. (kgri)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?