Liddell v. Immigration
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00188-RBS-TEM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrew Nathaniel Liddell, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Anson Rhine +1 757 441 6331
Office Norfolk
Filed 3/6/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Hanover
Terminated 11/14/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Judgment*
JUDGMENT on decision by the court that the petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED and DISMISSED as petitioner's claims are moot since he was deported from the United States on 8/4/03, entered by the clerk and filed 11/14/03. OB. Copies Mailed: 11/14/03 [EOD DATE: 11/17/03] (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    FINAL ORDER accepting the findings and recommendations set forth in the report of the Magistrate Judge filed 10/24/03; denying and dismissing [1-1] petition for writ of habeas corpus as petitioner's claims are moot since he was deported from the United States on 8/4/03; and noting appeal procedures, entered and filed 11/4/03 (signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith) Copies Mailed: 11/14/03 [EOD Date: 11/17/03] (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Disposable Record
      Disposable Record (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Terminated Case
        Case closed (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller, entered and filed 10/24/03. Objections to R and R due by 11/13/03. Copies Mailed: 10/24/03 (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Remark
            LETTER stating petitioner has been deported, filed by respondent Immigration and Naturalization Service. Directed to be filed by Chambers. (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Docket Annotation
              Address of petitioner updated. (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Response
                Response by Andrew Nathaniel Liddell to [5-1] answer by Immigration (vwar)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Response
                  RESPONSE by Immigration and Naturalization Service to [1-1] petition for writ of habeas corpus. (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER that petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED and it is ORDERED that said petition be FILED; the respondent is ORDERED to file within 60 days from the date of this Order an answer to the petition; Respond Deadline 6/23/03 ; petitioner may file a response to respondent's answer within 21 days after receipt of said answer; entered and filed 4/23/03 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 4/23/03 [EOD Date: 4/24/03] (lbax)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                      Inmate account report form filed. (Pamunkey Regional Jail). (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                        Inmate Account Form Requested From Pamunkey Regional Jail. (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller to conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, if necessary, and to submit to a judge proposed findings of fact, if applicable and recommendations for the disposition of the case; the magistrate judge shall file his report with the clerk; and the parties may respond according to the rules, entered and filed 3/17/03 (signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith) Copies Mailed: 3/17/03 [EOD Date: 3/18/03] (clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003, Terminated: 11/14/2003 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                            PETITION for writ of habeas corpus; conditionally filed. (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                              CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller (clerk)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?