Pickell v. City of Virginia, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00687-TEM-TEM
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Julie L. Pickell, Plaintiff

Represented by Butler Williams & Skilling, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harris Dewey Butler, III +1 804 648 4848 +1 804 648 6814 hbutler@butlerwilliams.com

Represented by Shelley & Schulte PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tim Schulte +1 804 644 9700 +1 804 644 9770 schulte@scs-work.com
v.
No Logo Alfred M. Jacocks, Jr., Defendant

Represented by Office of the City Attorney - Virginia Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Douglas Stiles +1 757 385 4531 +1 757 385 5687 mstiles@vbgov.com
Space Kimberly Rouse Van Essendelft +1 757 427 4531
No Logo City Of Virginia Beach, Virginia, Defendant

Represented by Office of the City Attorney - Virginia Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Douglas Stiles +1 757 385 4531 +1 757 385 5687 mstiles@vbgov.com
Space Kimberly Rouse Van Essendelft +1 757 427 4531
No Logo Gary Goodfellow, Defendant

Represented by Office of the City Attorney - Virginia Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Douglas Stiles +1 757 385 4531 +1 757 385 5687 mstiles@vbgov.com
Space Kimberly Rouse Van Essendelft +1 757 427 4531
No Logo Greg S. Mullen, Defendant

Represented by Office of the City Attorney - Virginia Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Douglas Stiles +1 757 385 4531 +1 757 385 5687 mstiles@vbgov.com
Space Kimberly Rouse Van Essendelft +1 757 427 4531
No Logo Jonathan W. Oakes, Defendant

Represented by Office of the City Attorney - Virginia Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Douglas Stiles +1 757 385 4531 +1 757 385 5687 mstiles@vbgov.com
Space Kimberly Rouse Van Essendelft +1 757 427 4531
No Logo Joseph J. Massie, Defendant

Represented by Norris & St. Clair, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space S. LAWRENCE DUMVILLE +1 757 498 7700 +MDL TER MINATED ldumville@norrisstclair.com
No Logo Mark A. Kuehn, Defendant

Represented by Office of the City Attorney - Virginia Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Douglas Stiles +1 757 385 4531 +1 757 385 5687 mstiles@vbgov.com
Space Kimberly Rouse Van Essendelft +1 757 427 4531
Attributes
Office Norfolk
Filed 9/25/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $800000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Unknown
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Virginia Beach City
Terminated 6/10/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, MAG, PROTO
Timeline
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Stipulation
STIPULATION of dismissal. OB. (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Disposable Record
Disposable Record (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Terminated Case
Case closed (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Status Conference
Status Conference held (clerk)
LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Staying case ; jury trial of 6/14/04 and final pretrial conference of 5/28/04 at 10:00 a.m. are cancelled, parties are directed to appear in chambers on 5/28/04 at 10:00 a.m. to advise the court of the status of the case; and it is the intention of the court on 5/28/04 to reschedule the trial date and completion of discovery so that the case will be promptly heard no later than September of 2004, entered and filed 4/16/04 (signed by Mag Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 4/16/04 [EOD Date: 4/16/04] (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Status Conference
Status Conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 5/28/04 before Mag Judge Tommy E. Miller (clerk)
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
Minute entry: (COURT PROCEEDINGS); (TEM, USMJ) (Gloria Smith, O.C.R.) Gregory N. Stillman, Esq. appeared for pltf.Dana J. Finberg, Esq. & Thomas Fitzpatrick, Esq. appeared for defts. Matter came before the court on motion by defts to compel (356-1). Arguments heard. Court ruled on motion; court to submit order. Court stands in recess. (nlyt)
LREF
Blank 26 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that documents from the investigative files of the Professional Standards Office of the City's Police Department that relate to claims of gender discrimination by female officers in specialty units from 1992 to present shall be produced by the City; at this point in discovery, the City shall not be required to produce internal investigative files relating to claims of gender discrimination by female officer not employed in specialty units, which the parties have agreed would require further order by this court; all documents produced pursuant to this order shall be considered confidential within the meaning of the protective order; and this order does not compel the production of documents protected by the attorney-client privilege; however, all documents withheld on this basis shall be identified in a Privilege Log, agreed, entered and filed 2/20/04 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 2/20/04 [EOD Date: 2/20/04] (clerk)
LREF
Blank 25 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth the handling of confidential documents, testimony and information produced pursuant to the discovery process, see this order for specifics, agreed, entered and filed 2/10/04 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 2/10/04 (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Set/Clear Flags
**Set Protective Order Flag. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 24 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
AGREED ORDER that the proper name of defendant John Oaks is Jonathan W. Oakes and that the style of this case is changed to reflect the correct name, agreed, entered and filed 1/7/04 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 1/8/04 [EOD Date: 1/8/04] (clerk)
LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying [8-1] motion by Joseph J. Massie to Dismiss pursuant to FRCVP 12(b)(6)&(e) without prejudice to defendant Joseph J. Massie filing a motion for summary judgment, entered and filed 1/7/04 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 1/8/04 [EOD Date: 1/8/04] (clerk)
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
Minute entry: COURT PROCEEDINGS: TEM,mj; Gloria Smith, OCR. Counsel appeared. Came on for hearing on defendant Massie's (#8) motion to dismiss. Argued. Court made rulings on the record. Court denied motion to dismiss w/o prejudice as to any summary judgment motion. Court will prepare an order. (glen)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing held re: [8-1] motion by Joseph J. Massie to Dismiss pursuant to FRCVP 12(b)(6)&(e) by Joseph J. Massie (glen)
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order: jury trial set at 10:00 a.m. on 6/14/04 at Norfolk. Expert witnesses to be identified by 2/16/04; disclosure outlined in Rule 26 (a)(2)(B) by 3/16/04; response to such disclosure by 4/16/04 rebuttal by 5/3/04; discovery by plaintiff(s) on or before 4/5/04 and defendant(s) on or before 5/3/04; discovery/deposition in lieu of witness at trial concluded by 5/10/04; pretrial disclosures to be delivered to all counsel and unrepresented parties on or before 5/21/04; objections delivered by 5/26/04; an attorney's conference is set for 5/21/04 at 2:00 p.m.; a final pretrial conference shall be conducted on 5/28/04 at 10:00 a.m.; trial by jury has been demanded and proposed voir dire and written jury instructions are to be received by 6/7/04; the hearing on Joseph J. Massie's motion to dismiss is set for 1/7/04 at 3:00 p.m., entered 12/16/03 and filed 12/22/03 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 12/22/03 (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing [8-1] motion by Joseph J. Massie to Dismiss pursuant to FRCVP 12(b)(6)&(e) set at 3:00 p.m. on 1/7/04 before Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller (clerk)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Remark
COPIES OF PROCESS SERVER'S AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE on Leslie L. Lilley, Alfred M. Jacocks, Jr., Greg G. Mullen, Gary Goodfellow, Mark A. Kuehn, John Oaks, Joseph J. Massie, filed by plaintiff Julie L. Pickell (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Discovery Hearing
16(b) Conference held (clerk)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY by Joseph J. Massie to response to [8-1] motion by Joseph J. Massie to Dismiss pursuant to FRCVP 12(b)(6)&(e), received. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER extending time for plaintiff to respond to motion to dismiss by Joseph Massie to 12/10/03 and defendant shall have until 12/17/03 to file his reply to plaintiff's response, set Brief deadline to 12/17/03 , agreed, entered and filed 12/11/03 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 12/11/03 [EOD Date: 12/11/03] (clerk)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER renaming defendant City of Virginia Beach and Its Police Department to City of Virginia Beach, Virginia and thus the renaming of party resolves and withdraws the [5-1] motion by City of Virginia Beach to Dismiss, agreed, entered and filed 12/11/03 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 12/11/03 [EOD Date: 12/11/03] (clerk)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Memorandum in Opposition
MEMORANDUM by Julie L. Pickell in opposition to [8-1] motion by Joseph J. Massie to Dismiss pursuant to FRCVP 12(b)(6)&(e), received. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003, Terminated: 6/10/2004 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by Julie L. Pickell to [5-1] motion by City of Virginia to Dismiss (clerk)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller to conduct all proceedings in this case, including the trial, and order the entry of judgment; entered and filed 12/5/03 (signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith) Copies Mailed: 12/5/03 (clerk)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge
CONSENT to trial by Magistrate by City of Virginia Beach, Alfred M. Jacocks Jr., Gary Goodfellow, Mark A. Kuehn, Greg S. Mullen, John Oaks (full consent). (clerk)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge
Consent to trial by Magistrate by Julie L. Pickell (plaintiff only, not full consent) (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
16b conference reset for 9:00 a.m. on 12/16/03 (clerk)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: 26(f) attorneys' conference set 12/11/03 at 2:00 p.m.; 16(b) scheduling conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 12/30/03 initial disclosure 1/14/04; no party required to respond to discovery sooner than 1/26/04; entered and filed 12/1/03 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies mailed: 12/1/03 (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Miscellaneous Document
Referred for 16(b) Conference (clerk)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge
Consent to trial by Magistrate by Joseph J. Massie (this defendant only). (clerk)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM in support of [8-1] motion by Joseph J. Massie to Dismiss pursuant to FRCVP 12(b)(6)&(e), received. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003, Terminated: 1/7/2004 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by Joseph J. Massie to Dismiss pursuant to FRCVP 12(b)(6)&(e) (clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003, Terminated: 6/10/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER by Joseph J. Massie (Attorney S. Lawrence Dumville) to first amended complaint; jury demand (clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM in support of [5-1] motion by City of Virginia to Dismiss, received. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003, Terminated: 12/11/2003 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by City of Virginia to Dismiss (ariv)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003, Terminated: 6/10/2004 Answer
ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by City of Virginia, Alfred M. Jacocks Jr., Gary Goodfellow, Mark A. Kuehn, Greg S. Mullen, John Oaks (Attorney Kimberly Rouse Van Essendelft, Mark Douglas Stiles) (clerk) Modified on 11/24/2003
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Stipulation
STIPULATION of dismissal of defendant Mark Pantak. OB. (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Summons Issued
SUMMONS for amended complaint, with 1 copy, issued for City of Virginia, Alfred M. Jacocks Jr., Gary Goodfellow, Mark A. Kuehn, Joseph J. Massie, Greg S. Mullen, John Oaks and mailed to counsel by FedEX. Forms and notice and copies to plaintiff's counsel. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Julie L. Pickell against Greg S. Mullen, John Oaks; amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand (clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Complaint
COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 40686; jury demand (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Set/Clear Flags
Jury Trial Flag (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Miscellaneous Document
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller (clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 843 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?