USA v. Kistner, et al
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:05-cr-00053-RBS-TEM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Westley Haynie +1 757 441 6331 steve.haynie@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Norfolk
Filed 4/20/2005
County Virginia Beach City
Terminated 11/9/2005
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
T.181343 & 2 (181343.F) - Wire Fraud (date offense concluded Ct.1
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
T.181343 & 2 (181343.F) - Wire Fraud (date offense concluded Ct.1
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
T.181344 & 2 (181344A.F) - Bank Fraud (date offense concluded 2-2-02)
Count 5-7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
T.181014 & 2 (181014.F) - False statement & report in connection with a loan application & an Open-End Voucher & Security Agreement
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Report and OrderCourt Filing
Report and Order Terminating Probation Prior to Original Expiration Date as to Sarah Diane Kistner. Signed by Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 12/7/06; Copies mailed 12/7/06. (kgri, )
    LREF
    Blank 33 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Motion for Early Termination of Probation
    MOTION for Early Termination of Probation by Sarah Diane Kistner. (kgri, )
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
      JUDGMENT as to Sarah Diane Kistner (1) - Counts 1-2, 4, 5-7: Dismissed on motion of the United States; Count 3: Probation: Five (5) years; Restitution: $14,014.25; Special Assessment: $100.00. Signed by Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 11/8/05 and filed on 11/9/05; Copies mailed 11/9/05, o.b. (kgri, )
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Restitution JudgmentCourt Filing
        Restitution Judgment as to Sarah Diane Kistner, entered & filed in open court. Signed by Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on November 8, 2005. Copies mailed with J&C. (mgra)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Sentencing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rebecca Beach Smith: Stephen W. Haynie, AUSA, Larry M. Dash, AFPD, and Darryl Upshur, probation officer, present. Deft. present on bond. Sentencing held on 11/8/2005, for Sarah Diane Kistner (1). Count(s) 1-2, 4, 5-7, Dismissed on motion of the United States; Sentenced on Count(s) 3, Probation: five (5) years; Special Assessment: $100.00; Restitution: $14,014.25. (Court Reporter Gloria Smith, OCR.) (mgra)
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Position on Sentencing
            Position of Defendant with Respect to Sentencing Factors by Sarah Diane Kistner. (kgri, )
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Position on Sentencing
              Government's Position with Respect to Sentencing Factors in the Presentence Report as to Sarah Diane Kistner. (kgri, )
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [21] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Sarah Diane Kistner (1). Deft. may travel to the Atlanta GA area for the purpose of visiting with her son's paternal grandparents, and shall imm. return to her home in Mass. Signed by Judge Tommy E. Miller and filed on 8/17/05; Copies mailed 8/17/05. (kgri, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005, Terminated: 8/17/2005 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                  MOTION for Permission to Allow Defendant to Temporarily Leave the State of Massachusetts by Sarah Diane Kistner. (kgri, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Sentencing Procedures OrderCourt Filing
                    Sentencing Procedures Order as to Sarah Diane Kistner, entered & filed in open court. Signed by Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 6/24/2005. (mgra,)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Statement of Facts
                      Statement of Facts as to Sarah Diane Kistner (mgra,)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Plea Agreement
                        PLEA AGREEMENT as to Sarah Diane Kistner (mgra,)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Plea Agreement Hearing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rebecca Beach Smith: Stephen W. Haynie, AUSA, & Larry M. Dash, AFPD, present. Deft present on bond.Plea Agreement Hearing as to Sarah Diane Kistner held on 6/24/2005. Plea entered by Sarah Diane Kistner (1). Guilty: Count 3. Continued for PSR. Court explained to deft. that by pleading guilty she waived her right of appeal, pursuant to plea agreement. Sentencing set for 11/8/2005, at 10:00 AM before Honorable District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith. The deft. shall not have any contact with Jamil Ali Hameed and William Joseph Brown.(Court Reporter Gloria Smith, OCR.) (mgra,)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                            Set/Reset Hearings as to Sarah Diane Kistner: Plea Agreement Hearing set for 6/24/2005 at 10:00 AM before Honorable District Rebecca Beach Smith. (kgri, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                              Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Sarah Diane Kistner, Jamil Ali Hameed: Susp. deadline for trial date to be set. (kgri, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Arraignment
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 5/4/2005:Defts. both prev. arrgned. (Sarah Diane Kistner (1) on Counts 1-3,4,5-7 and Jamil Ali Hameed (2) on Counts 1-3). Defts. did not appear as they had prev. waived app. Court set following dates: Motions due by 5/16/2005. Responses due by 5/27/2005; Jury Trial set for 7/6/2005 at 11:00 AM before Honorable District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith. (Court Reporter Gloria Smith; AUSA Sherri Capotosto; AFPD Larry Dash for Deft. Kistner; William O'Brien, ret. cnsl. for Deft. Hameed) Defts. do not wish to app. at PT hrgs. Court hours: 9:00-9:18 a.m. (kgri, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
                                  ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Sarah Diane Kistner on 4/22/05. (kgri)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Sarah Diane Kistner; ent. 4/22/05; filed 4/25/05 (Signed by Mag Judge Tommy E. Miller ) Copies Mailed: 4/25/05 (they)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Bond
                                      Unsecured BOND entered by Sarah Diane Kistner in the amount of $10,000.00 (popo)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Agreed Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                        Agreed Discovery Order by Sarah Diane Kistner, USA (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller on 4/22/05) & filed on 4/22/05. Copies dist. (popo)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                          WAIVER OF RIGHT to be Present at Hearings on Motions Prior to Trial executed as to Sarah Diane Kistner, filed in open Court (popo)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Arrest
                                            ARREST of Sarah Diane Kistner (kgri)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                              Arraignment as to Sarah Diane Kistner before Mag Judge F. B. Stillman contd. to 9:00 a.m. on 5/4/05. (kgri)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                Arraignment as to Sarah Diane Kistner held before Mag Judge Tommy E. Miller (FTR). USA appeared through: Steve Haynie, AUSA. Dft. present appeared through: Larry Dash, AFPD. Copy of Indictment furnished to dft. Court explained charge. Dft. waived formal arraignment. Dft. plead not guilty. Jury demanded. Trial date to be set on 5/4/05 at 9:00 a.m. Court stated that dft. must be present at prel. hearings unless she exec. & filed waiver of appearance form. Waiver of Appearance form executed by dft. Bond set at $10,000 Unsecured with standard and special conditions of release. (In court time for i.a. & arr. 2:30-2:44) (popo)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Initial Appearance
                                                  Initial appearance as to Sarah Diane Kistner held before Mag Judge Tommy E. Miller (FTR). USA appeared through: Steve Haynie, AUSA. Dft. present appeared through: Larry Dash, AFPD. (Defendant informed of rights.) (popo)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Indictment
                                                    INDICTMENT RETURNED & FILED IN OPEN COURT as to Sarah Diane Kistner (1) counts 1-3, 4 & 5-7 & Jamil Ali Hameed (2) counts 1-3. On motion of the Govt, Court dir. warrant be issued for Sarah Kistner & Jamil Hameed. (popo)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Initial Appearance
                                                      Initial appearance as to Sarah Diane Kistner set for 2:30 on 4/22/05 (popo)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                        CASE REFERRED to Mag Judge Tommy E. Miller (popo)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Warrant Issued
                                                          Arrest WARRANT issued as to Sarah Diane Kistner & Jamil Ali Hameed (popo)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/21/2005 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER Appointing Federal Public Defender for Sarah Diane Kistner Public Defender is Larry Mark Dash (signed by Mag Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 4/25/02) & filed on 4/26/02. (popo)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/21/2005 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                              CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT For Appointing Counsel by Sarah Diane Kistner (popo)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?