Chilean Nitrate Corp v. Florida Favorite, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:91-cv-00677
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Chilean Nitrate Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Dekalb Kelley, Jr. +1 757 687 7515

Represented by Office of the City Attorney - Virginia Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Douglas Stiles +1 757 385 4531 +1 757 385 5687 mstiles@vbgov.com
v.
No Logo Asbind Holdings S. A. Luxembourg, Defendant
No Logo Florida Favorite Fertilizers, Inc., Defendant
Attributes
Office Norfolk
Filed 10/16/1991
Jury Demand None
Demand $276000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Norfolk City
Terminated 11/5/1991
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/5/1991, Entered: 11/5/1991 Terminated Case
Case closed (clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 10/28/1991, Entered: 11/5/1991 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT for service of process on the Secretary of the Commonwealth as to Florida Favorite returned executed. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 10/28/1991, Entered: 11/5/1991 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT for service of process on the Secretary of the Commonwealth as to Asbind Holdings returned executed. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 10/22/1991, Entered: 11/5/1991 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Florida Favorite and Asbind Holdings by mailing to Sec. of Commonwealth on 10/18/91. (clerk) Modified on 11/05/1991
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 10/21/1991, Entered: 11/5/1991 Stipulation
STIPULATION of dismissal. o.b. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 10/16/1991, Entered: 11/5/1991 Docket Annotation
Affidavit for service of process on the Secretary of the Commonwealth. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 10/16/1991, Entered: 11/5/1991 Docket Annotation
Affidavit for service of process on the Secretary of the Commonwealth. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 10/16/1991, Entered: 11/5/1991 Complaint
COMPLAINT; $ 120.00 filing fee paid - Receipt # 01962 - Willcox & Savage. (clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 36 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?