Engesser v. City of Va. Beach, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:92-cv-00078
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Robert Benjamin Engesser, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo City Of Virginia Beach, Virginia, Defendant
No Logo John A. Lamm, Defendant
Attributes
Office Norfolk
Filed 1/30/1992
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Virginia Beach City
Terminated 6/11/1992
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 6/11/1992, Entered: 6/11/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing [1-1] complaint without prejudice; entered and filed on June 11, 1992 ( signed by Judge Robert G. Doumar ) Copy mailed to plaintiff on 6/11/92. o.b. (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/11/1992, Entered: 7/1/1992 Terminated Case
Case closed. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 4/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/1992 Status Report
STATUS REPORT by Robert Benjamin Engesser. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 2/14/1992, Entered: 3/5/1992 Docket Annotation
Letter on behalf of plaintiff. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 2/13/1992, Entered: 3/5/1992 Docket Annotation
Letter on behalf of plaintiff. (clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1992, Entered: 1/31/1992 Summons Issued
SUMMONS issued with two copies for City of Va. Beach and John A. Lamm; magistrate notice and order; delivered to counsel. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 1/30/1992, Entered: 1/31/1992 Complaint
COMPLAINT; $ 120.00 filing fee paid - Receipt # 02600 - Robert B. Engesser; jury demand. (clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 33 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?