Minetree v. Harper, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:92-cv-00270-RBS
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Robert Glenn Minetree, Jr., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Harper, Defendant

Represented by Office of the City Attorney - Virginia Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Douglas Stiles +1 757 385 4531 +1 757 385 5687 mstiles@vbgov.com

Represented by WILLCOX & SAVAGE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Conrad Moss Shumadine +1 757 628 5500 +1 757 628 5566 cshumadine@wilsav.com
No Logo Snyder, Defendant

Represented by Office of the City Attorney - Virginia Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Douglas Stiles +1 757 385 4531 +1 757 385 5687 mstiles@vbgov.com

Represented by WILLCOX & SAVAGE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Conrad Moss Shumadine +1 757 628 5500 +1 757 628 5566 cshumadine@wilsav.com
No Logo Turner, Defendant

Represented by Office of the City Attorney - Virginia Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Douglas Stiles +1 757 385 4531 +1 757 385 5687 mstiles@vbgov.com

Represented by WILLCOX & SAVAGE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Conrad Moss Shumadine +1 757 628 5500 +1 757 628 5566 cshumadine@wilsav.com
Attributes
Office Norfolk
Filed 4/8/1992
Jury Demand None
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Petersburg City
Terminated 1/4/1994
Origin 4
Reopened 12/2/1992
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: 6/17/1994 Appeal Record Returned
Record on Appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [43-1] appeal by Robert Glenn Minetree, Jr. (mgra)
LREF
Blank 46 Filed: 6/9/1994, Entered: 6/14/1994 USCA Judgment
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) affirming the judgment of the District Court, Re: [43-1] appeal by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. o.b. (mgra)
LREF
Blank 45 Filed: 6/9/1994, Entered: 6/14/1994 USCA Mandate
Opinion of USCA re: [43-1] appeal by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. (mgra)
LREF
Blank 44 Filed: 5/20/1994, Entered: 5/20/1994 USCA Mandate
Opinion of USCA re: [43-1] appeal by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. (mgra)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/27/1994, Entered: 1/28/1994 Initial Paper Record Transmitted to 4CCA
Certified and transmitted Record on Appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [43-1] appeal by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. (bwin)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/18/1994, Entered: 1/18/1994 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment and docket sheet to USCA: [43-1] appeal by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 43 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: 1/18/1994 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. received January 14, 1994, and filed as of January 13, 1994. Docketing statement form mailed to appellant 1/18/94. Copies of notice of appeal mailed to Mark D. Stiles and Conrad Moss Shumadine 1/18/94. (clerk)
LREF
Blank 42 Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 1/6/1994 Judgment*
JUDGMENT order dismissing this action, entered and filed January 4, 1994. o.b. Copies Mailed: 1/4/94 (rlam)
LREF
Blank 41 Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 1/6/1994 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying [31-1] motion by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. for Summary Judgment, granting [26-1] motion by Snyder, Turner, Harper for Summary Judgment; outlining procedures for noting an appeal, entered and filed January 4, 1994 (signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith) Copies Mailed: 1/4/94 (rlam)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 1/6/1994 Terminated Case
Case closed (rlam)
LREF
Blank 40 Filed: 11/16/1993, Entered: 11/24/1993 Miscellaneous Document
Letter MOTION by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. for Settlement hearing (rlam)
LREF
Blank 39 Filed: 10/13/1993, Entered: 10/20/1993 Miscellaneous Document
Letter MOTION by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. for Settlement (rlam)
LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 7/29/1993, Entered: 8/4/1993 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. Re: [37-1] opposition memorandum by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 37 Filed: 7/29/1993, Entered: 8/4/1993 Memorandum in Opposition
MEMORANDUM by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. in opposition to [26-1] motion by Snyder, Turner, Harper for Summary Judgment by Snyder, Turner, Harper, received. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 36 Filed: 7/16/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, directing plaintiff to resubmit his submissions with a certificate of service within 20 days; resetting Prisoner response due 8/9/93 , entered and filed July 16, 1993 ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 7/16/93 (rlam)
LREF
Blank 35 Filed: 6/28/1993, Entered: 6/29/1993 Response in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE (conclusion to facts) by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. in opposition to [29-1] affidavit by Turner, [28-1] affidavit by Snyder, filed subject to defect. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 34 Filed: 6/28/1993, Entered: 6/29/1993 Memorandum in Opposition
MEMORANDUM by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. in opposition to [29-1] affidavit by Turner, received, subject to defect. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 6/28/1993, Entered: 6/29/1993 Memorandum in Opposition
MEMORANDUM by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. in opposition to [28-1] affidavit by Snyder, received, subject to defect. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 32 Filed: 6/28/1993, Entered: 6/29/1993 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. in support of [31-1] motion by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. for Summary Judgment by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr., received, subject to defect. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 6/28/1993, Entered: 6/29/1993, Terminated: 1/4/1994 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. for Summary Judgment , filed subject to defect. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 6/21/1993, Entered: 6/21/1993 Docket Annotation
Letter to the court, on behalf of Minetree. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 6/18/1993, Entered: 6/21/1993 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by Turner Re: [27-1] support memorandum by Snyder, Turner, Harper (rlam)
LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 6/18/1993, Entered: 6/21/1993 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by Snyder Re: [27-1] support memorandum by Snyder, Turner, Harper (rlam)
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 6/17/1993, Entered: 6/21/1993 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM by Harper, Turner, Snyder in support of [26-1] motion by Snyder, Turner, Harper for Summary Judgment by Snyder, Turner, Harper, received. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 26 Filed: 6/17/1993, Entered: 6/21/1993 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION by Snyder, Turner, Harper for Summary Judgment (rlam)
LREF
Blank 25 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: 6/9/1993, Terminated: 1/4/1994 Answer
ANSWER and Conclusion by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 24 Filed: 5/28/1993, Entered: 6/4/1993 Judgment*
JUDGMENT in a civil case that the court grants defendants' motion to dismiss as to plaintiff's medical claim and dismisses the Medical Staff of the Petersburg City Jail as a defendant in this case, entered and filed by the Clerk May 28, l993. Copies Mailed: 5/28/93 o.b. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 5/28/1993, Entered: 5/28/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER terminating [20-1] motion by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. against Dismissal, granting in part, denying in part [17-1] motion by Harper, Turner, Snyder, Medical Staff to Dismiss,; granting defendant's motion to dismiss as to plaintiff's medical claim, and dismissing the Mmedical Staff of the Petersburg City Jail as a defendant in this case; directing the defendants to file responsive pleadings to plaintiff's surviving claim, or any further dispositive motions within 20 days; resetting Answer deadline to 6/22/93 for Harper, for Turner, for Snyder , and Dismissing Medical staff as a defendant ; if none of the parties has moved for summary judgment by that date, this case will be scheduled for an evidentiary hearing as soon as possible thereafter, entered and filed May 28, 1993 ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 5/28/93 (rlam)
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: 5/18/1993 Docket Annotation
Letter to the Court, on behalf of Robert Minetree. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 3/15/1993, Entered: 3/15/1993, Terminated: 1/4/1994 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. to [17-1] motion by Harper, Turner, Snyder, Medical Staff to Dismiss (mwin)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: 3/5/1993, Terminated: 5/28/1993 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION with Memorandum in Support by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. against Dismissal (rlam)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: 3/5/1993, Terminated: 1/4/1994 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: 3/5/1993, Terminated: 1/4/1994 Response to Order to Show Cause
RESPONSE to order by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: 3/5/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, directing the plaintiff to respond to defendants' motion with a legal brief supporting his view; resetting Prisoner response due 3/29/93 ; reminding and advising plaintiff, etc., entered and filed March 5, 1993 ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 3/5/93 (rlam)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 2/19/1993, Entered: 2/22/1993 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM by Medical Staff, Snyder, Turner, Harper in support of [17-1] motion by Harper, Turner, Snyder, Medical Staff to Dismiss by Harper, Turner, Snyder, Medical Staff, received. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 2/19/1993, Entered: 2/22/1993 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by Harper, Turner, Snyder, Medical Staff to Dismiss (rlam)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 2/19/1993, Entered: 2/22/1993 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by Medical Staff, Snyder, Turner, Harper (Attorney Conrad Moss Shumadine, Mark Douglas Stiles), (rlam)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 1/27/1993, Entered: 1/27/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that the plaintiff remitted the partial filing fee, accordingly the complaint is ordered filed; directing the defendants to file responsive pleadings within 23 days; setting Answer deadline to 2/23/93 for Medical Staff, for Snyder, for Turner, for Harper , entered and filed January 27, 1993 ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 1/27/93 (rlam)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/22/1992, Entered: 12/22/1992 Filing Fee Received
Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 21.55 RECEIPT # 4553 (rlam)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 12/2/1992, Entered: 12/2/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [12-1] motion by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. for Reconsideration of [11-1] judgment order, [10-1] order Dismissing this action without prejudice, directing plaintiff to pay $21.55 within 30 days; resetting Prisoner response due 1/2/93 , entered and filed December 2, 1992 ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 12/2/92 (rlam)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/2/1992, Entered: 12/2/1992 Case Reopened
Case reopened (rlam)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 10/29/1992, Entered: 10/30/1992 Docket Annotation
Objection to partial filing fee, on behalf of the petitioner. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 10/19/1992, Entered: 10/30/1992, Terminated: 12/2/1992 Motion for Reconsideration
MOTION by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. for Reconsideration of [11-1] judgment order, [10-1] order Dismissing this action without prejudice (rlam)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 9/25/1992, Entered: 9/25/1992 Judgment*
JUDGMENT order dismissing this action, entered by the Clerk 9/24/92 and filed 9/25/92. o.b. Copies Mailed: 9/25/92 (rlam)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 9/25/1992, Entered: 9/25/1992 Terminated Case
Case closed (rlam)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 9/24/1992, Entered: 9/25/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, Dismissing this action without prejudice ; outlining procedures for noting an appeal, entered and filed September 24, 1992. ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 9/25/92 (rlam)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/1992, Entered: 8/17/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [8-1] motion by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. for relief from judgment under Rule 60(b) FRCivP.; directing the Clerk to reopen this case and reinstate it on the active docket; directing plaintiff to pay a partial filing fee of $2l.55 or etc., within 20 days, setting Prisoner response due 9/1/92 , entered and filed August 6, 1992 ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 8/7/92 (rlam)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/6/1992, Entered: 8/17/1992 Case Reopened
Case reopened (rlam)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 7/28/1992, Entered: 8/17/1992, Terminated: 8/6/1992 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. for relief from judgment under Rule 60(b) FRCivP. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 6/19/1992, Entered: 6/26/1992 Judgment*
JUDGMENT order dismissing this action, entered by the Clerk 6/18/92 and filed June 19, l992. O.B. Copies Mailed: 6/19/92 (rlam)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/19/1992, Entered: 6/26/1992 Terminated Case
Case closed (rlam)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 6/18/1992, Entered: 6/26/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing [2-1] complaint without prejudice; outlining procedures for noting an appeal, entered and filed June 18, 1992. ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 6/19/92 (rlam)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 5/19/1992, Entered: 5/20/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER directing plaintiff to pay $21.55 within 20 days setting Prisoner response due 6/11/92 , entered and filed May 19, 1992 ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 5/20/92 (rlam)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 5/8/1992, Entered: 5/14/1992 Docket Annotation
Inmate account report form - Petersburg City Jail (rlam)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 4/24/1992, Entered: 4/28/1992 Response to Order to Show Cause
RESPONSE to order by Robert Glenn Minetree Jr. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 4/8/1992, Entered: 4/16/1992 Complaint
COMPLAINT (conditionally filed). (rlam)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 4/8/1992, Entered: 4/16/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, conditionally filing the comlaint pending payment of any assessed filing fee; directing plaintiff to answer interrogatories within 20 days setting Prisoner response due 5/1/92 ; advising plaintiff, etc., entered and filed April 8, 1992. ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 4/8/92 (rlam) Modified on 04/16/1992
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 49 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?