Oxford House, Inc., et al v. Virginia Beach

Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:92-cv-00980-REP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Oxford House, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Barkai Pershing +1 804 644 8022 +02965092 029 965 0920

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF FRANK FEIBELMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Morris Feibelman +1 804 355 1300 +3554 355 355 4684 frank@feibelman.com
No Logo Oxford House-Chicks Beach, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Barkai Pershing +1 804 644 8022 +02965092 029 965 0920

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF FRANK FEIBELMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Morris Feibelman +1 804 355 1300 +3554 355 355 4684 frank@feibelman.com
No Logo Oxford House-Lake Shores, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Barkai Pershing +1 804 644 8022 +02965092 029 965 0920

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF FRANK FEIBELMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Morris Feibelman +1 804 355 1300 +3554 355 355 4684 frank@feibelman.com
No Logo Oxford House-Tidewater, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Barkai Pershing +1 804 644 8022 +02965092 029 965 0920

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF FRANK FEIBELMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Morris Feibelman +1 804 355 1300 +3554 355 355 4684 frank@feibelman.com
No Logo Oxford House-Virginia Beach, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Barkai Pershing +1 804 644 8022 +02965092 029 965 0920

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF FRANK FEIBELMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Morris Feibelman +1 804 355 1300 +3554 355 355 4684 frank@feibelman.com
v.
No Logo City Of Virginia Beach, Virginia, Defendant

Represented by Office of the City Attorney - Virginia Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Matthew MacAli +1 757 427 4531

Represented by Sykes Bourdon Ahern & Levy, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Steven Emmert +1 757 499 8971 emmert@virginia-appeals.com
Attributes
Office Norfolk
Filed 11/4/1992
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Fair Housing Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Virginia Beach City
Terminated 7/7/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 7/7/1993, Entered: 7/8/1993 Judgment*
JUDGMENT granting motion of City of Virginia Beach, Virginia to dismiss, and dismissing this action without prejudice; entered by the clerk 7/6/93; filed 7/7/93. Copies Mailed: 7/7/93. O.B. (mwin)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1993, Entered: 7/8/1993 Terminated Case
Case closed (mwin)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1993, Entered: 7/8/1993 Case Assigned/Reassigned
CASE assigned to Judge Robert E. Payne (mwin)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 7/6/1993, Entered: 7/8/1993 OrderCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting [2-1] motion by Virginia Beach to Dismiss; dismissing this action without prejudice to plaintiffs' right to challenge the City's zoning decision subsequently if their applications for conditional use permits are denied or if the conditions imposed give rise to a claim; entered 7/2/93; filed 7/6/93 ( signed by Judge Robert E. Payne ) Copies Mailed: 7/6/93 (mwin)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 7/6/1993, Entered: 7/8/1993 Docket Annotation
Copy of City Zoning Ordinance, City of Virginia Beach, with amendment (mwin)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 3/11/1993 Memorandum in Opposition
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Oxford-Tidewater, Oxford-Lake Shores, Oxford-Chicks Beach, Oxford-Va. Beach, Oxford House, Inc. in opposition to [2-1] motion by Virginia Beach to Dismiss by Virginia Beach, received. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 3/2/1993, Entered: 3/3/1993 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM by Virginia Beach on actual case or controversy and standing issues, received. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 3/2/1993, Entered: 3/3/1993 Memorandum in Opposition
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Virginia Beach in opposition to [3-1] support memorandum by Virginia Beach, [2-1] motion by Virginia Beach to Dismiss by Virginia Beach, received. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 2/16/1993, Entered: 2/17/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that the parties shall submit further briefs addressing, as to each of the statutes on which plaintiffs' assert a claim, whether there currently exists an actual case or controversy sufficient to confer jurisdiction upon this court, etc.; setting Brief deadline addressing these issues shall be filed on or before 3/2/93 ; reply briefs, if any, shall be filed on March 9, 1993, entered and filed February 16, 1993 ( signed by Judge Robert E. Payne ) Copies Mailed: 2/16/93 (rlam)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 1/19/1993, Entered: 1/21/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part, denying in part [6-1] motion by Virginia Beach for Protective Order (see order for specifics), entered and filed January 19, 1993 ( signed by Judge Robert E. Payne ) Copies Mailed: 1/19/93 (rlam)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/19/1993, Entered: 1/21/1993 Minutes-Miscellaneous
COURT PROCEEDINGS - REP, Judge. Sharon Borden, Reporter. Counsel appeared - Matter came on for hearing on motion to dismiss and for protective order. Argued. Minute entry: granting in part, denying in part [6-1] motion by Virginia Beach for Protective Order, [2-1] motion by Virginia Beach to Dismiss under advisement. Court adjourned. (rlam) Modified on 01/21/1993
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 1/11/1993, Entered: 1/15/1993, Terminated: 1/19/1993 Motion for Protective Order
MOTION by Virginia Beach for Protective Order (rlam)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/11/1993, Entered: 1/11/1993 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing re: [2-1] motion by Virginia Beach to Dismiss set at 11:00 a.m. on 1/19/93. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 12/30/1992, Entered: 1/6/1993 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Virginia Beach 11/9/92 (rlam)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 12/17/1992, Entered: 12/29/1992 Memorandum in Opposition
MEMORANDUM by Oxford House, Inc., Oxford-Va. Beach, Oxford-Chicks Beach, Oxford-Lake Shores, Oxford-Tidewater in opposition to [3-1] support memorandum by Virginia Beach, [2-1] motion by Virginia Beach to Dismiss by Virginia Beach, received. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 11/30/1992, Entered: 12/29/1992 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM by Virginia Beach in support of [2-1] motion by Virginia Beach to Dismiss by Virginia Beach, received. (rlam)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 11/30/1992, Entered: 12/29/1992, Terminated: 7/6/1993 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by Virginia Beach to Dismiss (rlam)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 11/4/1992, Entered: 11/4/1992 Complaint
COMPLAINT; Filing Fee $ 120.00 paid by American Civil Liberties Union of Virginia; Receipt # 4261 (mwin)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 11/4/1992, Entered: 11/4/1992 Summons Issued
SUMMONS with one copy issued for City of Virginia Beach, Virginia, and mailed to Stephen B. Pershing, Esq. Magistrate Judge notice. (mwin)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 92 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?