Vincent v. Peed, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:95-cv-00001-RGD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cedric Vincent, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Carl R. Peed, Defendant
No Logo Corporal Brodbent, Defendant
No Logo Corporal Tyson, Defendant
No Logo Della P. Wood, Defendant
No Logo Doctor Abbit, Defendant
No Logo Lt. Henderson, Defendant
No Logo M. P. Jackson, Defendant
Office Norfolk
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $9999000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Fairfax City
Terminated 2/23/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing plaintiff's action without prejudice to his right to resubmit the case; cautioning plaintiff that the statute of limitations continues to run; advising plaintiff of appeal procedures; entered and filed February 23, 1995 (signed by Judge Robert G. Doumar) Copies Mailed: 02/23/95 O.B. (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
      COMPLAINT, conditionally filed (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER conditionally filing the complaint; further ordering plaintiff to respond to interrogatories within 20 days of the date of this order, set Prisoner response due 1/23/95 ; advising plaintiff of court procedures re filing of documents; entered and filed January 3, 1995 (signed by Judge Robert G. Doumar) Copies Mailed: 01/03/95 (clerk)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 35 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?