Banks v. Angelone
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:95-cv-00003-HCM-JEB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aubrey Banks, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Ronald J. Angelone, Respondent
Office Norfolk
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Chesapeake City
Terminated 3/21/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 Judgment*
JUDGMENT on decision by the Court that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED without prejudice to Petitioner's right to proceed properly in the Virginia State Courts, entered by the Clerk and filed 3/21/95. ob Copies Mailed: 3/21/95 (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER deeming petition amended to substitute as sole respondent Ronald J. Angelone, Director of the Virginia Department of Corrections Dismissing the petition without prejudice to petitioner's right to proceed properly in Virginia State Courts ; noting appeal procedures; and declining to issue a certificate of probable cause for appeal, entered and filed 3/21/95 (signed by Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr.) Copies Mailed: 3/21/95 (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 3/14/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 Response to Order to Show Cause
        RESPONSE to order by Aubrey Banks (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER directing petitioner to show cause why the petition should not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254(b) within 30 days from the date of this order, Reset Prisoner response due 4/12/95 , entered 3/3/95 and filed 3/6/95 ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry ) Copies Mailed: 3/9/95 (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 Filing Fee Received
            Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 5.00 RECEIPT # 1008 (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 2/10/1995, Entered: 2/10/1995 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
              Inmate account report form filed. (Indian Creek Correctional Center). (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 2/10/1995, Entered: 2/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER denying [4-1] supplemental amended motion by Aubrey Banks to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, denying [2-1] motion by Aubrey Banks to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, directing petitioner to submit $5.00 filing fee, extension request, or explanation within 30 days, Set Prisoner response due 3/15/95 , advising that failure to comply will result in dismissal, conditionally filing petition, entered 2/9/95 and filed 2/10/95 ( signed by Magistrate Judge James Bradberry ) Copies Mailed: 2/10/95 (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995, Terminated: 2/10/1995 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                  Supplemental MOTION by Aubrey Banks to Proceed in Forma Pauperis referring to: [2-1] motion by Aubrey Banks to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (mwin)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                    AMENDED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus on 28:2254 form; conditionally filed (mwin)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                      MOTION by Aubrey Banks to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (in petition) (mwin)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                        PETITION for writ of habeas corpus (on complaint form); conditionally filed (mwin)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER construing action as habeas under 28:2254; directing petitioner to submit within 30 days original and 2 copies of amended petition on proper 28:2254 habeas forms (setting Amended Pleadings deadline to 2/6/95) ; advising failure to comply will result in dismissal; warning that if state court remedies not exhausted, action may be subject to dismissal in any event; entered and filed 1/3/95 ( signed by Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: 1/3/95 to petitioner w/habeas forms as directed (mwin) Modified on 01/10/1995
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                            CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James E. Bradberry (mwin)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 36 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?