Haneef v. Bureau of Prisons, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:95-cv-00004-HCM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Louis A. Haneef, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Bruce Cox, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anita Kay Henry +1 757 441 6331 anita.henry@usdoj.gov
No Logo Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anita Kay Henry +1 757 441 6331 anita.henry@usdoj.gov
No Logo Charles A. Bender, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anita Kay Henry +1 757 441 6331 anita.henry@usdoj.gov
No Logo John Hahn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anita Kay Henry +1 757 441 6331 anita.henry@usdoj.gov
No Logo M. C. Thompson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anita Kay Henry +1 757 441 6331 anita.henry@usdoj.gov
No Logo Mr. Aaron, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anita Kay Henry +1 757 441 6331 anita.henry@usdoj.gov
No Logo Mrs. Pullen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anita Kay Henry +1 757 441 6331 anita.henry@usdoj.gov
Office Norfolk
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Petersburg City
Terminated 5/2/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 Judgment*
JUDGMENT that defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED; entered by the Clerk and filed 5/2/96 Copies Mailed: 5/2/96. ob. (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [15-2] motion for Summary Judgment; noting appeal process, entered and filed 5/2/96 (signed by Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr.) Copies Mailed: 5/2/96 (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 Terminated Case
      Case closed (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT that defendant Wolemdore is DISMISSED as a party to this action; entered by the Clerk 1/22/96; filed 1/23/96 (OB) Copies Mailed: 01/23/96 (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [24-1] motion by Louis A. Haneef to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, directing plaintiff to file his response within 30 days, set Prisoner response due 2/21/96 , Dismissing defendant Womeldore as a party to his action; entered 1/22/96; filed 1/23/96 ( signed by Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr. ); Copies Mailed: 01/23/96 (clerk) Modified on 01/29/1996
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: 1/18/1996, Terminated: 1/23/1996 Motion for Extension
            MOTION by Louis A. Haneef to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of Robert G. Danage in support of [15-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants, [15-2] motion for Summary Judgment by defendants (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 Notice
                NOTICE of Motion pursuant to Local Rule 11(M) by Bureau of Prisons, M. C. Thompson, Bruce Cox, Mrs. Pullen, John Hahn, Charles A. Bender, Mr. Aaron (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT by M. C. Thompson in support of [15-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants, [15-2] motion for Summary Judgment by defendants (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT by Mrs. Pullen in support of [15-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants, [15-2] motion for Summary Judgment by defendants (clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Affidavit
                      AFFIDAVIT by John Hahn in support of [15-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants, [15-2] motion for Summary Judgment by defendants (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Affidavit
                        AFFIDAVIT by Bruce Cox in support of [15-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants, [15-2] motion for Summary Judgment by defendants (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Affidavit
                          AFFIDAVIT by Charles A. Bender in support of [15-1] motion to Dismiss by defendantss, [15-2] motion for Summary Judgment by defendants (clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 16 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Affidavit
                            AFFIDAVIT by Mr. Aaron in support of [15-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants, [15-2] motion for Summary Judgment by defendants (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION with Memorandum in Support by Bureau of Prisons, M. C. Thompson, Bruce Cox, Mrs. Pullen, John Hahn, Charles A. Bender, Mr. Aaron to Dismiss , or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER directing plaintiff to provide an address for defendant Womeldore within 20 days, set Prisoner response due 11/28/95 , advising plaintiff that failure to do so will result in defendant Womeldore being dismissed from this action without prejudice; directing that any dispositive motions be filed within 30 days, set Motion Filing deadline to 12/8/95 ; entered and filed 11/8/95 ( signed by Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: 11/8/95 (clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint by M. C. Thompson, Bruce Cox, Mrs. Pullen, John Hahn, Charles A. Bender, Mr. Aaron (Attorney Anita Kay Henry), (clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995 Answer
                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Bureau of Prisons (Attorney Anita Kay Henry), (clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bruce Cox 9/6/95 Answer due on 11/6/95 for Bruce Cox (clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to M. C. Thompson 8/23/95 Answer due on 10/23/95 for M. C. Thompson (clerk) Modified on 09/18/1995
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                          Summons returned unexecuted as to Jack Womeldore (clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mrs. Pullen, John Hahn, Charles A. Bender, Mr. Aaron 8/9/95 Answer due on 10/10/95 for Mr. Aaron, for Charles A. Bender, for John Hahn, for Mrs. Pullen (clerk) Modified on 09/18/1995
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bureau of Prisons 8/7/95; on U. S. Attorney 7/24/95; and on Attorney General 8/8/95; Answer due on 9/22/95 for Bureau of Prisons (clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/10/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge
                                                Consent to trial by Magistrate by Louis A. Haneef (clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bureau of Prisons - United States Attorney served on 7/24/95 (clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER directing defendants to submit responsive pleadings to complaint within 60 days of this order; set Answer deadline to 9/20/95 for Mr. Aaron, for Charles A. Bender, for John Hahn, for Mrs. Pullen, for Jack Womeldore, for Bruce Cox, for M. C. Thompson, for Bureau of Prisons ;i directing Clerk to issue a summons in this action and deliver same to the Marshal for service; and setting forth directions for the Marshal to serve the defendants, entered 7/18/95 and filed 7/19/95, ( signed by Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: 7/19/95 (ariv)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 Summons Issued
                                                      SUMMONS, with 12 copies, issued for Bureau of Prisons, M. C. Thompson, Bruce Cox, Jack Womeldore, Mrs. Pullen, John Hahn, Charles A. Bender, Mr. Aaron, and delivered to Marshal for service. Mag. notice. (ariv)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/2/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 Filing Fee Received
                                                        Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 108.00; RECEIPT # 1671 (clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting plaintiff's request for an extension of time to pay the partial filing fee; directing him to pay $108 within 30 days, reset Prisoner response due 6/7/95 ; admonishing plaintiff that failure to comply will result in dismissal of this action; entered and filed 5/5/95 ( signed by Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: 05/05/95 (clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/1/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                            RESPONSE to order (request for extension of time to pay) by Louis A. Haneef (clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER directing plaintiff to submit $108.00 partial filing fee or objections to same within 30 days, reset Prisoner response due 4/24/95 , entered and filed 3/21/95, ( signed by Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: 3/21/95 (ariv)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                                                Inmate account report form filed. (ariv)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                  RESPONSE to order with answers to Court's interrogatories by Louis A. Haneef (ariv)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT, conditionally filed. (ariv)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER conditionally filing complaint; beginning processing plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis by directing plaintiff to answer Court's interrogatories within 20 days; set Prisoner response due 1/26/95 ; advising plaintiff of certain procedural information; and advising plaintiff that the Court will not accept any pleadings for filing or consideration (other than those directed to the determination of pauperis status) until the assessed filing fee is paid or forma pauperis is granted, entered and filed 1/3/95, ( signed by Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: 1/3/95 (ariv)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?