Henderson v. Lester, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:95-cv-00005-RBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kenneth F. Henderson, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo D. Wilmouth, Defendant
No Logo G. S. Flint, Defendant
No Logo Layton Lester, Defendant
Office Norfolk
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Powhatan
Terminated 12/15/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Dismissing this action without prejudice to plaintiff's right to resubmit the case; advising plaintiff of appeal procedures; entered and filed 12/15/95 ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ); OB; Copies Mailed: 12/15/95 (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 10/31/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER directing plaintiff to submit a partial filing fee of $9.84 or objections and a copy of his completed questionnaire within 30 days, set Prisoner response due 11/29/95 ; granting plaintiff's request to add defendant Flint; advising plaintiff that failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this action; entered and filed 10/30/95 ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 10/30/95 (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
        Inmate account report form from Albermarle-Charlottesville Joint Security Complex. (ariv)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/18/1995, Entered: 7/18/1995 Docket Annotation
          Inmate account form requested from Albermarle-Charlottesville Joint Security Complex. (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/23/1995 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
            Inmate account report forms filed from Dillwyn Correctional Center and Stafford Correctional Center. (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/23/1995 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
              Inmate account report form filed from Powhatan Reception and Classification Center. (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/15/1995 Docket Annotation
                Inmate account forms (4) requested from Stafford Correctional Unit, Albemarle-Charlottesville Joint Security Complex, Powhatan Reception and Classification Center, and Dillwyn Correctional Center. (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/5/1995, Entered: 6/12/1995 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge
                  Consent to trial by Magistrate by Kenneth F. Henderson (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/5/1995, Entered: 6/12/1995 Amended Complaint
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by Kenneth F. Henderson amending [2-1] complaint conditionally filed (clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER beginning processing of plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; advising plaintiff that the Court will not accept any other motion, pleading, or request until any assessed filing fee has been paid; advising plaintiff to seek review of his claims through state administrative grievance procedures, if he has not already done so; advising plaintiff of certain procedural requirements; directing plaintiff to complete the questionnaire and provide answers to interrogatories within 30 days; set Prisoner response due 6/6/95 ; entered and filed 5/3/95 ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 05/03/95 (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995 Response to Order to Show Cause
                        PRISONER RESPONSE to order by Kenneth F. Henderson (afor)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/19/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995, Terminated: 12/15/1995 Response to Order to Show Cause
                          PRISONER RESPONSE to order by Kenneth F. Henderson (afor)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Affidavit
                            AFFIDAVIT by Kenneth F. Henderson Re: [2-1] motion by Kenneth F. Henderson to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Kenneth F. Henderson (afor)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                              MOTION by Kenneth F. Henderson to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (afor)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT, conditionally filed (afor)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER directing plaintiff to answer certain interrogatories within 20 days; set Prisoner response due 1/26/95 ; directing the clerk to conditionally file plaintiff's complaint; entered and filed 1/3/95; ( signed by Judge Rebecca B. Smith ) Copies Mailed: 1/3/95 (afor)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?