Ballinger, et al v. Koceja, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:95-cv-00090-RAJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles R. Ballinger, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo M. Koceja, Defendant
No Logo Norfolk City Jail, Defendant
Office Norfolk
Filed 1/1/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Norfolk City
Terminated 3/20/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice to plaintiff's right to resubmit the case; cautioning plaintiff that the statute of limitations continues to run; advising plaintiff of appeal procedures; entered March 17, 1995 and filed March 20, 1995 (signed by Judge Raymond A. Jackson) Copies Mailed: 03/20/95 O.B. (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting plaintiff Dunn's request to separate these two plaintiffs and vacating its previous order assessing the filing fee; directing plaintiff Dunn to pay a partial filing fee of $99.26 and plaintiff Ballinger to pay a partial filing fee of $39.30 or their objection to that fee within 30 days; reset Prisoner response due 2/27/95 ; further directing the clerk to divide this matter into two cases, so that each file contains a complete record of the proceedings thus far; entered 1/20/95; filed 1/23/95; ( signed by Judge Raymond A. Jackson ) Copies Mailed: 1/23/95 (afor)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Response to Order to Show Cause
        PRISONER RESPONSE to order by Phillip J. Dunn (afor)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 ~Motion to Sever
          MOTION by Phillip J. Dunn to Sever (afor)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER overruling plaintiffs' objections to payment of the $120.00 filing fee; directing plaintiff to pay a $120.00 filing fee within 30 days; set Prisoner response due 2/6/95 ; entered and filed 1/4/95; ( signed by Judge Raymond A. Jackson ) Copies Mailed: 1/5/95 (afor)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994, Terminated: 3/20/1995 Response to Order to Show Cause
              PRISONER RESPONSE/OBJECTION to order by Phillip J. Dunn, Charles R. Ballinger (afor)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 12/9/1994, Entered: 12/12/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER denying [5-1] motion by Charles R. Ballinger to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, denying [3-1] motion by Phillip J. Dunn to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; directing plaintiffs to pay the statutory filing fee of $120.00 or their objection to payment of that fee within 30 days; set Prisoner response due 1/12/95 ; entered and filed 12/9/94; ( signed by Judge Raymond A. Jackson Copies Mailed: 12/9/94 (afor)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/8/1994, Entered: 12/8/1994 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                  Inmate account report form filed as to Phillip J. Dunn from Norfolk City Jail. (afor) Modified on 12/12/1994
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 12/8/1994, Entered: 12/8/1994 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                    Inmate account report form filed as to Charles R. Ballinger from Norfolk City Jail (afor) Modified on 12/12/1994
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 12/2/1994, Entered: 12/5/1994 Motion to Amend/Correct
                      MOTION by Charles R. Ballinger, Phillip J. Dunn to Amend [4-1] complaint (afor) Modified on 12/12/1994
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/2/1994, Entered: 12/5/1994 Docket Annotation
                        Inmate account form requested from Norfolk City Jail (afor)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: 12/12/1994 Response to Order to Show Cause
                          PRISONER RESPONSE to order by Phillip J. Dunn, Charles R. Ballinger (afor)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/22/1994, Terminated: 12/9/1994 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                            MOTION by Charles R. Ballinger to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (afor)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/22/1994 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT, conditionally filed, on behalf of Charles R. Ballinger (afor)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/22/1994, Terminated: 12/9/1994 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                MOTION by Phillip J. Dunn to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (afor)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/22/1994 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT, conditionally filed, on behalf of Phillip J. Dunn. (afor)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/22/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER conditionally filing plaintiffs' complaint pending payment of any assessed filing fee; ordering plaintiffs to respond to certain interrogatories within 20 days; set Prisoner response due 12/15/94 ; advising plaintiffs of court's procedures regarding payment of filing fee and filing of documents, etc.; noting that both plaintiffs must sign every docyument submitted to the court regarding this complaint; entered and filed 11/22/94; ( signed by Judge Raymond A. Jackson ) Copies Mailed: 11/22/94 (afor)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?