Decipher, Inc., et al v. Lipman Organization, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:96-cv-00547-RGD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Decipher Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis Thomas Lewandowski +1 757 624 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaufman & Canoles, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Edward Noona +1 757 624 3239 +1 757 624 3169 senoona@kaufcan.com
Space Stephen Evans Story +1 757 624 3000 sestory@kaufcan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vandeventer Black LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Hooper Ottinger +1 757 446 8600 +1 757 446 8670 rottinger@vanblk.com
v.
No Logo Armory (Europe) Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pender & Coward PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Hoyt Matthews +1 757 490 3000 +1 757 497 1914
No Logo Roy Lipman Organization, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradford Dale Bimson +1 757 499 8800
Space Craig L. Mytelka +1 757 499 8800 +4730 473 473 0395 cmytelka@williamsmullen.com
No Logo Max Lipman, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig L. Mytelka +1 757 499 8800 +4730 473 473 0395 cmytelka@williamsmullen.com
Office Norfolk
Filed 6/4/1996
Jury Demand None
Demand $1200000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Norfolk City
Terminated 9/8/1997
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 2:97-cv-00141 1[USDC-Norfolk], L96-1788[Norfolk Circuit]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, LEAD
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 66 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997 OrderCourt Filing
DISMISSAL ORDER Dismissing Second Amended Complaint, agreed ; and this Court retains jurisdiction for the limited purpose of enforcing the provisions of the Settlement Agreement, entered and filed 9/8/97 (signed by Judge Robert G. Doumar) OB. Copies Mailed: 9/8/97 (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997 Disposable Record
    Disposable Record (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997 Terminated Case
      Case closed (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
        CASE assigned to Judge Robert G. Doumar (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 65 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/21/1997 Docket Annotation
          JOINT REQUEST for approval to use laptop computers during the trial of this case set for 9/4/97, by all parties. (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 64 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/20/1997 Transcript
            TRANSCRIPT for dates of August 14, 1997 before the Honorable Robert G. Doumar. (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 63 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER for Glen M. Robertson to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Glen Michael Robertson for Max Lipman, attorney Glen Michael Robertson for Roy Lipman Organization,Inc. , agreed, entered and filed 8/18/97 (signed by Judge Robert G. Doumar) Copies Mailed: 8/15/97 (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 62 Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER denying [54-1] motion by Roy Lipman Organization, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment without prejudice to its being renewed after more evidence is presented, entered and filed 8/15/97 (signed by Judge Robert G. Doumar) Copies Mailed: 8/15/97 (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 61 Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER setting settlement conference on 8/21/97 at 11:00 a.m.; by 3:00 p.m. on the day preceding the settlement conference, the parties will submit to the Court a brief letter setting forth the parties' positions regarding settlement. The parties may submit documents for the Court to view. These submissions will be held in confidence by the Court and may be telefaxed to (757) 441-3626 or delivered directly to the undersigned and should not be submitted to the Clerk, entered and filed 8/15/97 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 8/15/97 (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 60 Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER ON FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, held in the presence of counsel, the parties intend to file a short supplemental final pretrial order setting out several additional exhibits, said order to be entered by 8/29/97, entered and filed 8/15/97 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) (clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Settlement Conference set at 11:00 a.m. on 8/21/97 (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Pretrial Conference - Final
                        Final Pre-Trial Conference held (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/14/1997 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                          Minute entry: COURT PROCEEDINGS - RGD, Judge. Sue Ash, Reporter. Counsel appeared. Matter came on motion for partial summary judgment of Lipman Organization. Argument of counsel heard. Court reserves ruling at this time. Court adjourned. (rlam)
                            LREF
                            Blank 59 Filed: 8/7/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                            REPLY by Roy Lipman Organization, Inc. to response to [54-1] motion by Roy Lipman Organization, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment, received. (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 58 Filed: 8/4/1997, Entered: 8/5/1997 Memorandum in Opposition
                              MEMORANDUM by Decipher, Inc. in opposition to [54-1] motion by Roy Lipman Organization, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment, received. (clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 57 Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting motion to extend time and filing answer to second amended complaint by Roy Lipman Organization, Inc. lodged on 6/11/97, agreed, entered and filed 8/1/97 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 8/1/97 (clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 56 Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Transcript
                                  TRANSCRIPT for dates of March 13, 1997 before the Honorable William T. Prince. (clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 55 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997 Memorandum in Support
                                    MEMORANDUM in support of [54-1] motion by Roy Lipman Organization, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment, received. (clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 54 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997, Terminated: 8/15/1997 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                      MOTION by Roy Lipman Organization, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Suspense Deadline
                                        **Suspense 8/11/97 for order allowing late filing of Roy Lipman's answer to second amended complaint. (clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 53 Filed: 6/18/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [51-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Extend Expert Disclosure; time extended for Decipher, Inc. to 6/26/97, for defendants to 7/18/97, and rebuttal evidence by Decipher, Inc. to 7/25/97, agreed, entered and filed 6/18/97 (signed by Magistrate Judge William T. Prince) Copies Mailed: 6/18/97 (clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 52 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 Memorandum in Support
                                            MEMORANDUM in support of [51-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Extend Expert Disclosure, received. (clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 51 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997, Terminated: 6/18/1997 Motion for Extension
                                              MOTION by Decipher, Inc. to Extend Expert Disclosure (clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997 Suspense Deadline
                                                **Suspense 7/15/97, order to file answer by Roy Lipman Organization to second amended complaint (clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                  ANSWER by Roy Lipman Organization to second amended complaint. Filed Subject To Defect (not timely). FILED PER ORDER ENTERED 8/1/97. (clerk) Modified on 08/04/1997
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997, Terminated: 9/8/1997 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                    ANSWER by Armory (Europe), Ltd. to second amended complaint (clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Decipher, Inc., filed per Judge Prince at hearing of 5/23/97 and received 3/26/97. (clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                        COURT PROCEEDINGS, WTP, USMJ. Sue Ash, reporter. Counsel present. Come on re: motions to amend and compel. Argument. Court GRANTED motion to amend (#33) and ordered that the complaint be filed. No ruling required on motion to compel because parties are in agreement and will comply. Court adjourned. (clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Motion Hearing
                                                          Motion hearing held re: [37-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Compel (Various Matters), [33-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Amend Complaint (clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [45-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Extend Discovery Cutoff, discovery cutoff for all parties extended to 7/25/97, all other deadlines as determined by the Order on Initial Pretrial Conference remain the same, entered and filed 5/22/97 (signed by Magistrate Judge William T. Prince) Copies Mailed: 5/22/97 (clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 5/21/1997, Entered: 5/21/1997 Memorandum in Support
                                                              MEMORANDUM in support of [45-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Extend Discovery Cutoff, received. (clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 5/21/1997, Entered: 5/21/1997, Terminated: 5/22/1997 Motion for Extension
                                                                MOTION by Decipher, Inc. to Extend Discovery Cutoff (clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/14/1997 ObjectionCourt Filing
                                                                  OBJECTION by defendant Roy Lipman Organization to [39-1] letter of request regarding the taking of depositions in the United Kingdom, by Decipher, Inc., approved 4/23/97 by Judge John A. MacKenzie (clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: motion to compel and to amend complaint, by plaintiff. (clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Motion Hearing
                                                                      Motion hearing re: [37-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Compel (Various Matters) set at 11:30 a.m. 5/23/97, [33-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Amend Complaint set at 11:30 a.m. 5/23/97 (clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 5/8/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                        REPLY by Decipher, Inc. to response to [37-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Compel (Various Matters), received. (clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 5/8/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          AMENDMENT TO STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER that in connnection with the discovery in this action and the trial of this action, the full benefits and burdens contained in the Stipulated Protective Order, in full and without limitation, shall apply to and be enforceable by Armory (Europe) Limited, entered and filed 5/8/97 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies mailed: 5/8/97 (clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Lipman Organization in opposition to [37-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Compel (Various Matters), received. (clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: 4/29/1997 Suspense Deadline
                                                                              **Suspense for 5/15/97, hearing set on motion to amend? (clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 4/25/1997 Docket AnnotationCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER OF REQUEST regarding the taking of depositions in the United Kingdom, by Decipher, Inc., approved 4/23/97 by Judge John A. MacKenzie, 2 certified copies delivered to Mr. Ottinger on 4/24/97. (clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 4/21/1997, Entered: 4/21/1997 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in support of [37-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Compel (Various Matters), received. (clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 4/21/1997, Entered: 4/21/1997, Terminated: 5/23/1997 Motion to Compel
                                                                                    MOTION by Decipher, Inc. to Compel (Various Matters) (clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Docket Annotation
                                                                                      REQUEST FOR HEARING on motion to amend complaint, by defendant Roy Lipman Organization, Inc. (clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Suspense Deadline
                                                                                        **Suspense for 4/25/97. Has hearing been set on Motion To Amend. (clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 4/8/1997, Entered: 4/8/1997 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Armory (Europe) in opposition to [33-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Amend Complaint, received. (clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: 4/8/1997 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Lipman Organization in opposition to [33-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Amend Complaint, received. (clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 3/27/1997 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                              MOTION with Memorandum in Support by Decipher, Inc. to Amend Complaint . Amended complaint attached to this motion. (clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/13/1997 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                COURT PROCEEDINGS, WTP, USMJ. Sue Ash, reporter, Matter came on third-party objection to subpoena duces tecum and motion to quash subpoena; also plaintiff's motion to compel. Argument. Court sustained defendant's motion to quash. Court denied plaintiff's motion to compel. Court adjourned. (clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/13/1997 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                  Motion hearing held re: [25-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Compel Max Lipman to produce documents requested in items 1-8 of subpoena served upon him (clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                    REPLY by Decipher, Inc. to response to [25-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Compel Max Lipman to produce documents requested in items 1-8 of subpoena served upon him, received. (clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 3/11/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Max Lipman in opposition to [25-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Compel Max Lipman to produce documents requested in items 1-8 of subpoena served upon him, received. (clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 3/11/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Max Lipman by Glen Michael Robertson and Craig Mytelka (added on 3/10/97). (clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Order on Initial Pretrial Conference setting Trial date 10:00 a.m. 9/4/97; proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law to be received by 8/27/97; Final Pretrial conference set for 9:00 a.m. 8/15/97; all de bene esse depositions to be concluded by 7/25/97; defendant discovery cutoff 7/11/97; plaintiff discovery cutoff 6/11/97; CONSOLIDATING this action with Civil Action No. 2:97cv141; plaintiff's contemplated motion to amend complaint shall be filed on or before 3/26/97; briefs in opposition shall be received on or before 4/8/97, if no hearing arranged by 4/10/97, the clerk shall refer te file on 4/14/97 to one of the judges for decision; and establishing the deadlines for the disclosure of expert testimony, entered 3/6/97 and filed 3/10/97 (signed by Magistrate Judge William T. Prince) Copies Mailed: 3/10/97 (clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Suspense Deadline
                                                                                                            **Suspense for 3/26/97 for plaintiff's motion to amend complaint. (clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                              Consolidated Lead Case (clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                Initial pretrial conference held (clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                  COPY of objection of Max Lipman to subpoena, said objection is an exhibit to memorandum in support of motion to compel filed by plaintiff on 2/28/97. (motion and objection are set for hearing on 3/13/97 at 2:00 p.m.) (clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 Affidavit
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Foreign Service on Amory (Europe) Limited, by Decipher, Inc. (clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Armory (Europe) on 1/22/97 (clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                        Motion hearing re: [25-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Compel Max Lipman to produce documents requested in items 1-8 of subpoena served upon him set at 2:00 p.m. 3/13/97 (clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: 2/28/1997 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in support of [25-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Compel Max Lipman to produce documents requested in items 1-8 of subpoena served upon him, received. (clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: 2/28/1997 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: on objection of Max Lipman to subpoena, motion to quash subpoena and motion to compel, by plaintiff. (clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: 2/28/1997, Terminated: 3/13/1997 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                              MOTION by Decipher, Inc. to Compel Max Lipman to produce documents requested in items 1-8 of subpoena served upon him (clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Set Hearing Deadline for 2:00 p.m. 3/13/97 on objection to subpoena duces tecum by a third-party. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                  Initial pretrial conference set at 2:30 p.m. 3/6/97 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/18/1997 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                    Referred for initial pretrial conference. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: 2/18/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Armory (Europe) Limited (Attorney Richard Hoyt Matthews), (clerk)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [17-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Continue Trial; trial continued indefinitely; all dates established in the initial pretrial order are set aside; plaintiff is to file a status report by 12/6/96 to inform Court of progress made in securing service of process on Amory (Europe) Limited; and counsel should continue conducting their discovery, entered and filed 10/24/96 (signed by Magistrate Judge William T. Prince) Copies Mailed: 10/24/96 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER extending discovery deadlines, agreed, plaintiff's extended to 12/13/96 and defendant's to 12/20/96, Reset Plaintiff's discovery cutoff to 12/13/96 , and Reset Defendant's discovery cutoff to 12/20/96 , entered and filed 10/22/96 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 10/22/96 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996, Terminated: 9/8/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Lipman Organization to [17-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Continue Trial (clerk)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 10/16/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: motion for continuance, by plaintiff. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/16/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                Motion hearing re: [17-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Continue Trial set at 2:00 p.m. 10/24/96 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/15/1996 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: motion to extend discovery cutoff, by plaintiff. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/15/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in support of [17-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Continue Trial, received. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/15/1996, Terminated: 10/24/1996 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Decipher, Inc. to Continue Trial (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Armory (Europe) 10/3/96 Answer due on 10/23/96 for Armory (Europe) (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/10/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by Roy Lipman Organization to amended complaint (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/10/1996, Entered: 10/10/1996 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                            Motion hearing re: [12-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Extend Discovery Cutoff set at 2:00 p.m. 10/24/96 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth terms of confidentiality of information produced during discovery process, see order for specifics, agreed, entered and filed 10/8/96 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 10/8/96 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in support of [12-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Extend Discovery Cutoff, received. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Motion for Extension
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Decipher, Inc. to Extend Discovery Cutoff (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (3 separate packages), with 1 copy, 2 copies for Secretary of the Commonwealth, issued for Armory (Europe) Limited and delivererd to counsel. Magistrate notice. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit for service of process on the Secretary of the Commonwealth for Armory (Europe) Limited, by plaintiff. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by Decipher, Inc. amending complaint (motion for judgment in state court) against Armory (Europe) Limited (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/29/1996, Entered: 8/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Order on Initial Pretrial Conference setting Trial date 10:00 a.m. 1/28/97; Final Pretrial conference for 9:30 a.m. 1/10/97; all de bene esse depositions to be concluded by 12/20/96; Discovery cutoff for defendant 12/6/96; Discovery cutoff for plaintiff 11/6/96; plaintiff may file an amended complaint to add a party on or before 9/30/96; and establishing the deadlines for the disclosure of expert testimony, entered and filed 8/29/96 (signed by Magistrate Judge E. Miller) Copies Mailed: 8/29/96 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/29/1996, Entered: 8/30/1996 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                            Initial pretrial conference held (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/16/1996 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                              Initial pretrial conference set at 2:15 p.m. 8/29/96 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/14/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                OPINION AND ORDER denying [3-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Remand, entered and filed 8/14/96 (signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller) Copies mailed: 8/14/96 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/14/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                  Referred for initial pretrial conference. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/6/1996 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                    COURT PROCEEDINGS, TEM, USMJ. Diane Gray, reporter. Counsel present. Matter came on re: motion to remand. Argument of counsel heard. Court will prepare an Opinion and Order. Court adjourned. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/6/1996 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion hearing held re: [3-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Remand (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/30/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: motion to remand, by plaintiff. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/29/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion hearing re: [3-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Remand set at 2:00 p.m. 8/6/96 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 7/18/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by Decipher, Inc. to response to [3-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Remand, received. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/18/1996 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Lipman Organization in opposition to [3-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Remand, received. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/2/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Decipher, Inc. in support of [3-1] motion by Decipher, Inc. to Remand by Decipher, Inc. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/2/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996, Terminated: 8/14/1996 Motion to Remand
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Decipher, Inc. to Remand (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Initial pretrial conference set at 2:15 p.m. 7/25/96 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/26/1996, Entered: 6/26/1996 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Referred for initial pretrial conference. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 6/10/1996, Entered: 6/12/1996 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Roy Lipman Organization, Inc. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Norfolk Circuit Court by Lipman Organization; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 11825 (clerk) Modified on 08/27/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate notice to all counsel. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?