United States of Am. v. Mill Street Trust, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Vermont District Court, Case No. 1:94-cv-00265-jgm

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barbara Lewis Rubin, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'neill, Michael J

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter W. Hall +1 802 951 6725
No Logo M. Leonard Lewis, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'neill, Michael J

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter W. Hall +1 802 951 6725
No Logo Mill Street Trust, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'neill, Michael J

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter W. Hall +1 802 951 6725
Office Brattleboro
Filed 9/13/1994
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $85000
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 33 U.S.C. § 1365 Environmental Matters
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Windham
Terminated 3/4/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ENE4, SuppressAnsRpt
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 46 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (amn)
    LREF
    Blank 45 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of 3rd-party Complaint against the Travelers Ins. Co., terminated party Travelers Ins Co Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (amn)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 File Transferred
      File sent to Burlington (wjf)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Order
        ENDORSED ORDER: granting [43-1] party dismiss/dismissal ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (wjf)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/7/1997 File Transferred
          File sent to Brattleboro at request of David from Chambers (law)
            LREF
            Blank 44 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER, brief deadline satisfied; , parties have submitted stipulation for dismissal of third-party complaint, case closed ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (wjf)
              LREF
              Blank 43 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997, Terminated: 3/10/1997 Notice of Dismissal (Party)
              STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL as to parties Barbara Lewis Rubin, United States, Mill Street Trust, M. Leonard Lewis (wjf) Modified on 03/05/1997
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 ENE Terminated
                (law)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 File Transferred
                  File sent to Burlington (wjf)
                    LREF
                    Blank 42 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of 3rd-party complaint against Patrick Reilly, terminated party Patrick Reilly ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (amn)
                      LREF
                      Blank 41 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: 2/11/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER: The parties are ordered to show cause by 2/28/97, why the stay should not be lifted and the 3rd-party action dismissed. brief deadline set for 2/28/97 ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (amn)
                        LREF
                        Blank 40 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997 Trial Calendar
                        TRIAL CALENDAR jury trial set for 2/11/97 as the # 1 case Cy to counsel (cab)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Order
                          ENDORSED ORDER: granting [39-1] motion for Reconsideration of [0-0] endorse order denying continuation ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (amn)
                            LREF
                            Blank 39 Filed: 12/26/1996, Entered: 12/26/1996, Terminated: 12/30/1996 Motion for Reconsideration
                            MOTION by defendant Mill Street Trust, plaintiff United States for Reconsideration of [0-0] endorse order denying continuation (jjj)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/24/1996, Entered: 12/24/1996 File Transferred
                              File sent to Brattleboro (amn)
                                LREF
                                Blank 38 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996, Terminated: 12/23/1996 Motion to Continue
                                MOTION (In Letter Form) by defendant M. Leonard Lewis, defendant Barbara Lewis Rubin to Continue case from Jan./97 trial calendar (amn)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996 Order
                                  ENDORSED ORDER: denying motion to Continue case from Jan./97 trial calendar [38-1] ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (amn)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 37 Filed: 12/20/1996, Entered: 12/20/1996 Motion to Continue
                                    MOTION by plaintiff United States to Continue jury draw (pjd)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: 12/20/1996 Order
                                      ENDORSED ORDER: denying motion to Continue jury draw [37-1] ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (pjd)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 36 Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: 12/11/1996 Trial Calendar
                                        TRIAL CALENDAR jury trial set for 1:00 1/13/97 as the # 8 case (cab)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 35 Filed: 11/22/1996, Entered: 11/22/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER re: [28-2] order setting deadlines is stayed, pending notification from parties as to settlement progress. Counsel to notify the court by 12/20/96, unless a settlement has been submitted for Court approval by that date. ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (wjf)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/19/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 File Transferred
                                            File sent to Rutland (amn)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 34 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER denying motion to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests [30-1] ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (amn)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 33 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/12/1996 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                MEMORANDUM by defendants M. Leonard Lewis, Mill Street Trust, Barbara Lewis Rubin in opposition to [30-1] motion to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests (pjd)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996 Certificate
                                                  GOOD FAITH CERTIFICATE by plaintiff United States (re: P#30) (cab)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                    MEMORANDUM by plaintiff United States in support of [30-1] motion to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests (cab)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996, Terminated: 11/18/1996 Motion to Compel
                                                      MOTION by plaintiff United States to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests (cab)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/27/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Order
                                                        ENDORSED ORDER: granting [29-1] requested, ENE session reset for 1:00 11/15/96 ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (law)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 9/25/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Request for Writ
                                                          REQUEST by plaintiff United States of Am. for the Court to modify its order to accommodate extenuating circumstances and allow the parties to schedule their ENE session for 11/15/96 (law)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 9/4/1996, Entered: 9/4/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [25-1] motion to modify order of 4/4/96: motion filing deadline set for 11/29/96; discovery deadline set for 10/31/96; ready for trial by 1/1/97; ENE session to be held on or before 10/15/96 ; Court does NOT lift stay currently in effect as to 3rd pty action (Chief Judge J. G. Murtha) Cy to parties (kac)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/4/1996 Order
                                                              ENDORSED ORDER: granting in part (see order filed 9/4/96) [27-1] motion to Modify [26-1] order; (Chief Judge J. G. Murtha) Cy to parties (kac)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996 Order
                                                                ENDORSED ORDER: granting in part, denying in part [27-1] motion to Modify [26-1] order; see order dated 8/28/96 as revised ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (cab)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 8/27/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996, Terminated: 8/28/1996 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                  MOTION by defendants Mill Street Trust, M. Leonard Lewis, Barbara Lewis Rubin to Modify [26-1] order ; (pjd)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/15/1996, Entered: 8/15/1996 Remark
                                                                    LETTER sent to counsel re: ene session, response due 8/29/96 (SEE LEFT SIDE OF FILE) (law)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER, motion filing deadline set for 10/15/96 discovery deadline set for 9/16/96 ready for trial by 12/1/96 ENE session set for on or before 8/1/96 ; ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (amn)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996, Terminated: 9/4/1996 Motion to Modify
                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff United States of Am. to modify order of 4/4/96 (pjd)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996 Letter
                                                                          LETTER by defendant Mill Street Trust Re: Status of Case. (amn)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996 Letter
                                                                            LETTER by plaintiff United States of Am. Re: Status of Case. (amn)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996 Letter
                                                                              LETTER by third-party defendant Travelers Ins. Co. Re: Status of Case. (amn)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER, motion filing deadline set for 9/1/96 discovery deadline set for 8/1/96 ready for trial by 9/15/96 ENE session to be held on or before 6/15/96 ; ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (amn)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Attorney Substitution
                                                                                  ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION terminating attorney Thomas D. Anderson for United States of America and substituting attorney Jonathan A. Marks (epr)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 Order
                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER: granting [19-1] motion to Continue Stay, case stayed , and the ENE notification from the Clerk's office dated 1/10/96 is vacated; counsel are instructed to file a joint written report on or before 4/1/96 as to the status of the Massachusetts action and whether the stay should be continued brief deadline set for 4/1/96 ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (law) Modified on 01/25/1996
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 Motion to Continue
                                                                                      MOTION (letter) by third-party defendant Travelers Ins. Co. to Continue Stay (law)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/10/1996, Entered: 1/10/1996 Remark
                                                                                        LETTER sent re: scheduling of ENE session; response due 124/96; (see letter on left side of file) (law)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995 File Transferred
                                                                                          File sent to Brattleboro (amn)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995 File Transferred
                                                                                            File sent to Rutland (wjf)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER, case reassigned to Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ( Judge Franklin S. Billings Jr. ) Cy to parties (amn)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER denying motion to Dismiss 3rd-party complaint [8-1], granting [8-2] motion to Stay all proceedings between 3rd-party Pltfs and 3rd-party Defts ( Judge Franklin S. Billings Jr. ) Cy to parties (wjf)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY: case stayed as to 3rd-party complaint (law)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995 Order
                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER: granting [11-1] motion for Paul J. Leikhim, Michael J. O'Neill to Appear Hac Vice (cab)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 1/25/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995, Terminated: 3/4/1997 Answer
                                                                                                      ANSWER to [1-1] complaint by third-party defendant Patrick Reilly (Attorney ) ; stipulated discovery schedule due 2/24/95 (cab)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by third-party plaintiff Mill Street Trust, third-party plaintiff M. Leonard Lewis, third-party plaintiff Barbara Lewis Rubin in opposition to [8-1] motion to Dismiss 3rd-party complaint (cab)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [5-1] motion for Mark D. Cahill, Theodore A. Lund to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Judge Franklin S. Billings Jr. ) Cy to parties (wjf)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                            Added for third-party plaintiff Barbara Lewis Rubin attorney Michael O'Neill (wjf)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 1/19/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Michael J. O'Neill by defendants Mill Street Trust, M. Leonard Lewis and Barbara Lewis Rubin re: [11-1] motion for Paul J. Leikhim, Michael J. O'Neill to Appear Hac Vice (law)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/19/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Paul J. Leikhim by defendants Mill Street Trust, M. Leonard Lewis, and Barbara Lewis Rubin re: [11-1] motion for Paul J. Leikhim, Michael J. O'Neill Appear Hac Vice (law)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/19/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995, Terminated: 1/30/1995 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                  MOTION with memorandum in support by defendants Mill Street Trust, M. Leonard Lewis, and Barbara Lewis Rubin for Paul J. Leikhim, Michael J. O'Neill to Appear Hac Vice (law)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Request for Writ
                                                                                                                    REQUEST by third-party defendant Travelers Ins. Co. for oral argument (amn)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by third-party defendant Travelers Ins. Co. in support of [8-1] motion to Dismiss 3rd-party complaint, [8-2] motion to Stay (amn)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995, Terminated: 3/2/1995 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                        MOTION by third-party defendant Travelers Ins. Co. to Dismiss 3rd-party complaint , or, in the alternative to Stay (amn)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Theodore A. Lund by third-party defendant Travelers Ins. Co. re: [5-1] motion for Mark D. Cahill, Theodore A. Lund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (amn)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Mark D. Cahill by third-party defendant Travelers Ins. Co. re: [5-1] motion for Mark D. Cahill, Theodore A. Lund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (amn)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995, Terminated: 1/23/1995 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                              MOTION by third-party defendant Travelers Ins. Co. for Mark D. Cahill, Theodore A. Lund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (amn)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/19/1994, Entered: 12/19/1994 ENE Evaluator Assigned
                                                                                                                                ENE LETTER sent re: ENE Evaluator Catherine Kronk assigned (mek)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/6/1994, Entered: 12/6/1994 ENE Potential Evaluators Letter Sent
                                                                                                                                  ENE LETTER re: potential evaluators sent; resp to ENE ltr due 12/27/94 (law)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994 Answer
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to [1-1] complaint and THIRD-PTY CMP by defendant Mill Street Trust, defendant M. Leonard Lewis, defendant Barbara Lewis Rubin; jury demand (Attorney Peter Welles Hall), against Patrick Reilly, Travelers Ins. Co. (amn)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994 ISSUED Summons
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS(ES) ISSUED for third-party defendant Patrick Reilly, third-party defendant Travelers Ins. Co. (amn)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/13/1994, Entered: 9/15/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT ; (Summon(es)/waiver(s) Issued) (amn)
                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?