Potwin v. Townsend, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Vermont District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00362-jgm

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Annette Potwin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Plante & Hanley, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Hanley +1 802 295 3151 +1 802 295 5281 mfhanley@plantehanley.com
v.
No Logo David McCullough, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McNeil, Leddy & Sheahan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy G. Sheahan +1 802 863 4531 nsheahan@mcneilvt.com
No Logo James Townsend, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McNeil, Leddy & Sheahan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy G. Sheahan +1 802 863 4531 nsheahan@mcneilvt.com
No Logo John Dumville, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McNeil, Leddy & Sheahan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy G. Sheahan +1 802 863 4531 nsheahan@mcneilvt.com
No Logo Joshua Powers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McNeil, Leddy & Sheahan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy G. Sheahan +1 802 863 4531 nsheahan@mcneilvt.com
CB Richard Ellis Group CB Richard Ellis Group, Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard Ellis"

Toggle Switch Represented by McNeil, Leddy & Sheahan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy G. Sheahan +1 802 863 4531 nsheahan@mcneilvt.com
No Logo Robert Hull, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McNeil, Leddy & Sheahan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy G. Sheahan +1 802 863 4531 nsheahan@mcneilvt.com
No Logo Royalton, Vermont, Town of, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McNeil, Leddy & Sheahan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy G. Sheahan +1 802 863 4531 nsheahan@mcneilvt.com
Office Brattleboro
Filed 12/6/1995
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Orange
Terminated 2/26/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ENE3
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) for Royalton, Vermont, Joshua Powers, David McCullough, Robert Hull, John Dumville, Richard Ellis, James Townsend against Annette Potwin , case closed Notice to Lignants - Appeal to be filed by 3/28/97 Cy to parties (wjf)
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Summary Judgment, Remainder of Plaintiff's complaint DISMISSED. ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (wjf)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 File Transferred
      File sent to Burlington (wjf)
        LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER, case reassign to Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ( Chief Judge J. G. Murtha ) Cy to parties (cab)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/14/1997, Entered: 2/14/1997 File Transferred
          File sent to Brattleboro (pjd)
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 1/9/1997, Entered: 1/9/1997 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE for plaintiff Annette Potwin by Michael Frederick Hanley (pjd)
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 12/3/1996, Entered: 12/4/1996 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER directing pltf to obtain substitute counsel or enter appearance pro se within 30 days or risk dismissal of case, brief deadline set for 1/3/97 ( Judge William K. Sessions III ) Cy to parties (copy sent to pltf at: Maplewood Terrace West, Apt. 3, White River Jct. VT 05001) (pjd) Modified on 12/04/1996
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996 Order
                ENDORSED ORDER: granting [27-1] motion for R. Peter Decato to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Roger Peter Decato for Annette Potwin ( Judge William K. Sessions III ) Cy to parties (pjd) Modified on 11/26/1996
                  LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 11/21/1996, Entered: 11/21/1996, Terminated: 11/26/1996 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                  MOTION by plaintiff Annette Potwin for R. Peter Decato to Withdraw as Attorney (pjd)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/19/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996 Order
                    ENDORSED ORDER: granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time by 30 days to respond to supplemental motion for summary judgment, brief deadline set for 12/19/96 ( Judge William K. Sessions III ) Cy to parties (pjd)
                      LREF
                      Blank 26 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/8/1996, Terminated: 11/19/1996 Motion to Extend Time
                      MOTION by plaintiff Annette Potwin to Extend Time by 30 days to respond to supplemental motion for summary judgment (pjd)
                        LREF
                        Blank 25 Filed: 10/16/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY (entitled Supplemental) by all defendants to response to [19-1] motion for Summary Judgment (law)
                          LREF
                          Blank 24 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Discovery Certificate
                          DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE: answer to first set of interrogatories and requests to produce filed by defendants James Townsend, Richard Ellis (pjd)
                            LREF
                            Blank 23 Filed: 9/23/1996, Entered: 9/23/1996, Terminated: 2/26/1997 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE by plaintiff Annette Potwin to [19-1] motion for Summary Judgment (pjd)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/23/1996, Entered: 9/24/1996 Order
                              ENDORSED ORDER: granting [20-1] motion to Extend Period of Time to Answer Request For Admissions to date of filing this motion ( Judge William K. Sessions III ) Cy to parties (pjd)
                                LREF
                                Blank 22 Filed: 9/13/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996, Terminated: 2/26/1997 Response to Motion
                                RESPONSE by all defendants to [20-1] motion to Extend Period of Time to Answer Request For Admissions (law)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 9/10/1996, Entered: 9/10/1996 Discovery Certificate
                                  DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE answers to dfts' request for admissions by pltf Annette Potwin (kac)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 9/10/1996, Entered: 9/10/1996, Terminated: 9/23/1996 Motion to Extend Time
                                    MOTION by plaintiff Annette Potwin to Extend Period of Time to Answer Request For Admissions (law)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 8/26/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996, Terminated: 2/26/1997 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                      MOTION with memorandum in support (statement of facts incorporated) by all defendants for Summary Judgment (pjd)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 8/22/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996 Discovery Certificate
                                        DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE: 1st set of interrogatories & request to produce by plaintiff Annette Potwin to dfts James Townsend and Royalton, Vermont (jam) Modified on 08/23/1996
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Report of ENE
                                          ENE REPORT by evaluator Peter B. Joslin no settlement reached (law)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 Discovery Certificate
                                            DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE: request for admissions by all defendants (pjd)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Discovery Certificate
                                              DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE: pltf's answers to defts' first set of interrogatories & request to produce (kac)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 Stipulated Discovery Schedule/OrderCourt Filing
                                                STIPULATED DISCOVERY ORDER setting ENE session set for 9/3/96 ; Discovery cutoff 12/2/96 ; Deadline for filing of all motions 11/15/96 ; ready for trial by 12/2/96 ( Judge William K. Sessions III ) Cy to parties (pjd)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/12/1996 Stipulated Discovery Letter Sent
                                                  LETTER SENT re: no stipulated discovery schedule filed; case will be placed on the master calendar unless stipulated schedule is filed within 14 days; Stipulated Discovery Schedule due 4/26/96 (gmg)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/12/1996 Miscellaneous Document
                                                    LOCAL RULES MAILED to Roger Decato, Esq. of New Hampshire representing plaintiff Annette Potwin (gmg)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 ENE Evaluator Assigned
                                                      ENE LETTER sent re: ENE Evaluator Peter B. Joslin assigned (law)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 Remark
                                                        LETTER sent to counsel re: ENE Letter 1; response due 3/20/96 or Court to select an evaluator (law)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE by defendant Royalton, Vermont by request dated 12/11/95 (pjd)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE by defendant Joshua Powers by request dated 12/11/95 (pjd)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE by defendant David McCullough by request dated 12/11/95 (pjd)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE by defendant Robert Hull by request dated 12/11/95 (pjd)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE by defendant John Dumville by request dated 12/11/95 (pjd)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE by defendant Richard Ellis by request dated 12/11/95 (pjd)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE by defendant James Townsend by request dated 12/11/95 (pjd)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996 ENE Potential Evaluators Letter Sent
                                                                        ENE LETTER re: potential evaluators sent; resp to ENE ltr due 2/26/96 (law)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 Discovery Certificate
                                                                          DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE: interrogatories propounded by all defendants to plaintiff Annette Potwin (law)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996, Terminated: 2/26/1997 Answer
                                                                            ANSWER to [1-1] complaint by dfts James Townsend, Richard Ellis, John Dumville, Robert Hull, David McCullough, Joshua Powers, Royalton, Vermont; jury demand; stipulated discovery schedule due 3/6/96 (law)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE for dfts James Townsend, Richard Ellis, John Dumville, Robert Hull, David McCullough, Joshua Powers, Royalton, Vermont by Nancy Goss Sheahan (law)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/7/1995 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT; jury demand; filing fee $ 120.00 receipt # 02377 (Summon(es)/waiver(s) Issued) (law)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/7/1995 File Transferred
                                                                                  File sent to Burlington (law)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 185 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?