USA v. Stockham
Criminal Case Vermont District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00027-wks

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Burlington
Filed 2/20/2003
County Chittenden
Terminated 8/30/2004
Reopened
Magistrate Case
202-mj-00056
Citation
Offense Level
knowingly deposit a letter to be delivered by the USPS containing a threat to injure the person of another [ 202-m -56 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 876.F
Offense Level 4
18876.F MAILING THREATENING COMMUNICATIONS - mailed a threat to Veterans Center to injure Mr. Forehand
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 876.F
Offense Level 4
18876.F MAILING THREATENING COMMUNICATIONS - mailed a threat addressed to George Troutman at the Veterans Center in South Burlington
Count 3-4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 844E.F
Offense Level 4
18844(e).F PENALTIES - threat by telephone to use explosives
Count 1s-2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 876.F
Offense Level 4
18876.F MAILING THREATENING COMMUNICATIONS - mailed a letter containing a threat to injure a person
Count 3s-4s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 844E.F
Offense Level 4
18844(e).F PENALTIES - used a telephone to threatened to kill, injure, or intimidate individuals or to damage a building
Count 5s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871.F THREATS AGAINST PRESIDENT AND SUCCESSORS TO PRESIDENT - made an oral threat to take the life of the President of the United States
Count 1ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 876.F
Offense Level 4
18876.F MAILING THREATENING COMMUNICATIONS - mailed threat to injure Fred Forehand @ Veterans Center on Dorset Street in South Burlington, VT
Count 2ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 876.F
Offense Level 4
18876.F MAILING THREATENING COMMUNICATIONS - mailed threat to injure to George Troutman at the Veterans Center on Dorset Street in South Burlington, VT
Count 3ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 844E.F
Offense Level 4
18844(e).F PENALTIES - telephoned a reporter at the Burlington Free Press in Burlington, VT that he planted explosive devices which would result in news that would be bigger than anything the reporter had seen
Count 4ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 844E.F
Offense Level 4
18844(e).F PENALTIES - called the Veterans Administration Center in White River Junction, VT that he placed a bomb on the premises
Count 5ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871.F THREATS AGAINST PRESIDENT AND SUCCESSORS TO PRESIDENT - made a threat to murder the President
Count 6ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1513.F
Offense Level 4
181513(b)(1).F RETALIATING AGAINST WITNESS, VICTIM - threatened to harm Fred Forehand in realiation against him for a documented produced by him in an official proceeding
Count 7ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 876.F
Offense Level 4
18876.F MAILING THREATENING COMMUNICATIONS - wrote a letter to J. Garvan Murtha, US District Judge in the District of Vermont to injure him
Count 8ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1513.F
Offense Level 4
181513(b)(1).F RETALIATING AGAINST WITNESS, VICTIM - threatened bodily hart to Dustin Adams with intent to retaliate against him for information relating to the commission to law enforcement officer
Def Custody Status
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER OF CONDITIONAL RELEASE as to Roger Stockham . Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 23rd day of August, 2005. Cy to USPO & certified cy to USM. (law)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Docket Annotation
    COPY of Doc. No. 58-1 sent to counsel. (law )
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Summons Returned Executed
      RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED on 05/19/2005 as to Roger Stockham re: Disposition Order. (law, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 OrderCourt Filing
        DISPOSITION ORDER as to Roger Stockham . Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 05/02/2005. (law, ) Cy to counsel, USPO, USM.
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 55 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III:Status Conference as to Roger Stockham held on 4/29/2005. Dft present w/ counsel T. Zonay; W. Darrow present for govt. Civil commitment discussed. Court makes findings; dft has not met hhis burden in proving that he would not pose a risk; dft is committed to the custody of the atty general to immediately begin developing a program for release; the Court specifically recommends that he receive treatment in a facility other than VA hospitals given this dft's history and that his aftercare include reliable monitoring to assure continuation of meds; that he refrains from the use of controlled substances and alcohol and that he participate in residential or non-residential therapy as deemed necessary. Ptys to submit proposed order to Court accordingly. (Court Reporter Nichols.) (jam, )
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Response
            RESPONSE by United States of America as to Roger Stockham to [53] Hearing Memorandum. (law, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Trial Memorandum
              HEARING MEMORANDUM by Roger Stockham. (law, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Roger Stockham Status Conference set for 4/29/2005 10:30 AM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before William K. Sessions III. (law, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                  MINUTES: before Chief Judge William K. Sessions III (Ct Rptr: Nichols) status hearing held on 11/29/04 as to dft Stockham. Dft present w/ counsel T. Zonay; W. Darrow present for govt. Recommedation of report from medical center discussed. Dft has no object to civil committment where conditional release where be established however requests brief continuance to allow futher discussions with counsel. ORDERED: continuance granted; ptys to inform court with decision on how they wish to proceed and proposed order to be submitted or further hearing to be held. (jam)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                    NOTICE OF HEARING ; status hearing set for 10:30 11/29/04 for Roger Stockham Cy to affected parties, USPO (jam)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER the Court hereby orders the dft committed to a mental facility; the Court orders a psychiatric exam; a report addressing these issues is to be filed within 30 days; dft is committed to custody of the Atty Genl for placement; by Chief Judge William K. Sessions III (cc: all counsel, USPO, USM) (cls) Modified on 09/01/2004
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Plea Agreement
                        PLEA AGREEMENT as to Roger Stockham (cls)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                          MINUTES: before Chief Judge William K. Sessions III (Ct Rptr: Masse) change of plea hearing held on 8/30/04 as to dft Stockham. Dft present pro se and w/ advisory counsel T. Zonay; W. Darrow present for govt. Clerk swears dft & Court makes inquiries. Dft pleads not guilty by reason of insanity per the plea agreement entered into. Court informs dft of rights and proceedings. Court makes findings; finding Roger Stockham (1) count(s) 8ss, 7ss, 6ss, 5ss, 4ss, 3ss, 2ss, 1ss not guilty by reason of insanity. , dismissing counts as to Roger Stockham (1) count(s) 1, 1s -2s , 2 , 3 -4 , 3s -4s , 5s . Dismissed pursuant to filing of superseding indictments , jury draw of 9/7/04 cancelled on 8/30/04 , case terminated. Dft remanded to the custody of the atty general pursuant to 18:4243. Mr. Zonay appointed to represent dft in full from this point forward. (jam)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                            NOTICE OF HEARING change of plea hearing set for 1:00 8/30/04 for Roger Stockham Cy to affected parties, USPO (law)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                              NOTICE OF HEARING ; jury draw set for 9/7/04 for Roger Stockham as the No.15 criminal case. Cy to affected parties, USPO (jam)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                MINUTES: before Chief Judge William K. Sessions III (Ct Rptr: Nichols) Status Conference held in chambers as to dft Stockham. T. Zonay present for dft; W. Darrow present for govt. Court informs counsel that psych evaluation has been received; dft is competent to stand trial but has to be constantly reviewed; report not clear as to insanity at time of offense. Mr. Zonay to inform govt as to whether or not Mr. Stockham will allow them to interview doctors and then counsel to advise the court if stipulation re: sanity at time of the offense will be submitted. Hearing with doctors will also be set up to assist the Court in sentencing. Case is added to the 9/7/04 trial calendar. (jam) Modified on 08/12/2004
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Response to Motion
                                  OPPOSITION by USA to [44-1] motion to Return Deft to District (law)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                    AMENDED ORDER by Chief Judge William K. Sessions III, amending [43-2] Order granting [38-1] motion for Psychiatric or Psychological Evaluation (cc: all counsel, USPO) (cls)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004, Terminated: 8/30/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      MOTION to Return Deft to District by Roger Stockham (wjf)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Chief Judge William K. Sessions III granting [38-1] motion for Psychiatric or Psychological Evaluation examination ordered for Roger Stockham excludable Competency Exam, time excluded from 05/06/04 to date dft is returned to this District (cc: all counsel, USPO) (cls)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                          MINUTES: before Chief Judge William K. Sessions III (Ct Rptr: J. Masse) Conference in chambers. W. Darrow, AUSA for Govt. T. Zonay, Esq. for Deft Stockham. Court expresses concern about the deft's mental condition after reviewing the psychological report. Statements by counsel re: the report and need for further evaluation. ORDERED: Further evaluation is ordered. ; jury draw continued to 6/04 for Roger Stockham (wjf)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Proposed Voir Dire
                                            REQUESTS FOR VOIR DIRE by Roger Stockham as to Roger Stockham (cls)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Psychiatric Report +
                                              PSYCHIATRIC EXAMINATION (SEALED) received for Roger Stockham (law)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                MINUTES: before Chief Judge William K. Sessions III (Ct Rptr: Masse) status hearing held on 4/23/04 as to dft Stockham. Dft present w/ counsel T. Zonay; W. Darrow present for govt. Question of reliability of Dr. Patnaude's psy evaluation. Statements by counsel & Mr. Stockham. ORDERED: govt to contact BOP to determine status of Dr. Patnaude's employment with them & their concerns and send letter to the Court by Mon. 4/23/04; dft to submit copy of Dr. Linder's report to the Court by Mon. 4/23/04 at which point a further hearing will be scheduled; if dft is determined to be competent to stand trial, draw will be held on 5/4/04 and trial will be held last week in May. (jam)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Memorandum in Support
                                                  MEMORANDUM by Roger Stockham in opposition to govt's [38-1] motion for Psychiatric or Psychological Evaluation (cls)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ; status hearing set for 10:00 4/23/04 for Roger Stockham Cy to affected parties, USPO (jam)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004, Terminated: 5/6/2004 Motion for Psychiatric Exam
                                                      MOTION for Psychiatric or Psychological Evaluation by USA as to Roger Stockham (law)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                        MINUTES: before Chief Judge William K. Sessions III (Ct Rptr: Nichols) status hearing held on 12/18/03 as to dft Stockham. Dft present pro se w/ advisory counsel T. Zonay; W. Darrow present for govt. Defense informs Court of withdrawl of motion for pretrial services report. ORDERED: withdrawing motion Pretrial Services Report [37-1]. Statements re: status of psy evalution. Court encourages completion of final rpt as soon as possible. Case will be added to a trial calendar once that report is received. Scheduling discussed. (jam) Modified on 12/19/2003
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003 Notice of Hearing.
                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ; status hearing set for 3:30 12/18/03 for Roger Stockham Cy to affected parties, USPO (jam)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                            MOTION for Pretrial Services Report by Roger Stockham (jam) Modified on 12/19/2003
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                              MINUTES: before Chief Judge William K. Sessions III (Ct Rptr: Nichols) status hearing held on 10/6/03 as to dft Stockham. Dft present pro se w/ advisory counsel T. Zonay; W. Darrow present for govt. Statements by counsel. ORDERED: further status conference to be conducted in 60 days to allow time for psyche evaluation to be completed & motions to be filed; speedy trial time excluded under the ends of justice excludable; excludable XT, time excluded from 10/06/03 to 12/06/03. (jam) Modified on 10/07/2003
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ; status hearing set for 11:30 10/6/03 for Roger Stockham Cy to affected parties, USPO (jam)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Motion for Hearing
                                                                  MOTION for Hearing for the purpose of upgrading charges from Threats to Terrorism by Roger Stockham (law) Modified on 10/06/2003
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by dft Roger Stockham (mailed copy to USAO) (law)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Order
                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting [31-1] SEALED DOCUMENT ( Chief Judge William K. Sessions III )Cy to movant only (no image available) (law)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT (cab) Modified on 08/05/2003
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003, Terminated: 8/6/2003 Motion to Seal
                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT (cab) Modified on 08/05/2003
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                            MINUTES: before Chief Judge William K. Sessions III (Ct Rptr: Nichols) status hearing held on 7/28/03 as to dft Stockham. Dft present pro se and w/ advisory counsel T.Zonay; W. Darrow present for govt. Dft requests 60 day continuance to allow for a psy evaluation to be completed to establish competency & sanity and to file motions. No objection by govt. ORDERED: continuance granted; pretrial motions due 9/30/03 for Roger Stockham , excludable XT , time excluded from 07/28/03 to 09/30/03. (jam)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING status hearing set for 4:00 7/28/03 for Roger Stockham Cy to affected parties, USPO (law)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                MINUTES: before Chief Judge William K. Sessions III (Ct Rptr: Nichols) arraignment on superseding indictment and hearing on motion to withdraw held on 6/27/03 as to dft Stockham. Dft present w/ counsel Thomas Zonay; William Darrow present for govt. Clerk swears dft & Court makes inquiries. Dft pleads not guilty to cts 1ss-8ss. Statements re: atty withdrawal. ORDERED: granting [26-1] motion for Thomas Zonay to Withdraw as Attorney, dft to represent himself at this point however Mr. Zonay will remain as advisory counsel until further status hearing is held. Speedy trial clock to start over as a result of added counts and new motion filing ddl; excludable XT , time excluded from 02/20/03 to 07/28/03 , pretrial motions due 7/28/03 for Roger Stockham , status hearing set for 4:00 7/28/03 for Roger Stockham. Dft remains detained pending trial. (jam) Modified on 07/29/2003
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING arraignment & motion hearing set for 9:30 6/27/03 for Roger Stockham [26-1] motion for Thomas Zonay to Withdraw as Attorney Cy to affected parties, USPO (law)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by District Judge J. G. Murtha case reassigned to Chief Judge William K. Sessions III (cc: all counsel) (amn)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 File Transferred
                                                                                      File sent to Burlington as to defendant Roger Stockham (amn)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Order
                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot motion to extend motion filing date to 9/17/03 [25-1], denying as moot motion to continue jury draw until after 9/17/03 [25-2] A 2nd superseding indictment was filed on 6/9/03. A motions-filing ddl and trial date will be established at the time of arraignment. ( District Judge J. G. Murtha to parties (See referenced doc. for image) (amn)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Indictment
                                                                                          SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT by USA; counts filed against Roger Stockham (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss, 8ss Cy to counsel, USPO (law) Modified on 06/10/2003
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003, Terminated: 6/27/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                            MOTION for Thomas Zonay to Withdraw as Attorney by Roger Stockham (cab)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003, Terminated: 6/13/2003 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend motion filing date to 9/17/03 and to continue jury draw until after 9/17/03 by Roger Stockham (cab) Modified on 05/23/2003
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING jury draw set for Brattleboro 6/17/03 for Roger Stockham Cy to affected parties, USPO (cab)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                  CJA Form 20 (Appointment of Counsel) as to Roger Stockham Attorney Thomas Zonay (law)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                    MINUTES: In Court before District Judge J. G. Murtha (Ct Rptr: Anne Coughlin). W. Darrow, AUSA, for the Govt. R. McDowell, Esq., with deft STOCKHAM for ARRAIGNMENT ON SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT. Rogert Stockham, sworn by the Clerk, was arraigned and pled not guilty as to cts. 1, 2, 3 and 4 of the Superseding Indictment. Court entered a plea of not guilty as to ct 5 of the Superseding Indictment. HEARING ON DEFT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE. Statements made by Mr. McDowell, Mr. Stockham and Mr. Darrow. ORDERED: Motion denied. HEARING ON DEFT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE LEGAL COUNSEL. Statements made by Mr. Stockham. ORDERED: Motion granted. Court appoints Thomas Zonay, Esq., to represent Mr. Stockham and Mr. McDowell will be released as counsel for deft. denying motion for reconsideration of [16-1] Setting Conditions of Release [19-1] granting [20-1] motion to determine legal counsel, Terminate attorney Robert J. McDowell for Roger Stockham Attorney added as to Roger Stockham Thomas A Zonay (cab) Modified on 04/23/2003
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003, Terminated: 8/30/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by USA to [19-1] motion for reconsideration of [16-1] Setting Conditions of Release (law)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Indictment
                                                                                                        SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT by USA; counts filed against Roger Stockham (1) count(s) 1s-2s, 3s-4s, 5s; Cy to counsel, USPO (law)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE, motion(s) hearing set 2:00 4/22/03 in Brattleboro as to: Roger Stockham, re: (20-1) Determine Legal Counsel, (19-1)Reconsider COR before District Judge J. G. Murtha (wjf)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            MOTION to determine legal counsel by Roger Stockham (cls)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                              MOTION for reconsideration of [16-1] Setting Conditions of Release by Roger Stockham (cls)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER by District Judge J. G. Murtha granting [17-1] motion to Enlarge Time to Submit Pre-trial Motions ; pretrial motions due 5/9/03 for Roger Stockham , excludable ends of justice , time excluded from March 24, 2003 to May 9, 2003 (cc: all counsel) (cab)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003, Terminated: 3/26/2003 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION to Enlarge Time to Submit Pre-trial Motions by Roger Stockham (law)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    DETENTION ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier as to Roger Stockham cc: all counsel, USPO, USM (law)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                      MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier (Ct Rptr: taped) Dft present with Robert McDowell, AFPD and William Darrow, AUSA present for gov't detention hearing held on 3/3/03 Statements by counsel. ORDERED: granting [13-1] motion to detain pending trial. (law)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Pretrial Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        CRIMINAL PRETRIAL ORDER setting Motion Filing deadline for 3/24/03 & Jury Draw set for 4/7/03 for Roger Stockham ( Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier ) (cc: all counsel) (law)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Order of Temporary DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier as to Roger Stockham (cc: all counsel, USM, USPO) ; detention hearing set for 11:00 3/3/03 for Roger Stockham (law)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 motion for detention
                                                                                                                            MOTION to detain by USA as to Roger Stockham (jjj)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                              MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier (Ct Rptr: taped) dft Roger Stockham arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney Robert McDowell present; William Darrow, AUSA for Govt. Govt moves for detention and deft requests continuation of hrg.ORDERED: detention hearing set for 11:00 3/3/03 for Roger Stockham (jjj)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued
                                                                                                                                WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM ISSUED as to Roger Stockham (law)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Indictment
                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT by USA Counts filed against Roger Stockham (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4; Cy to counsel, USPO (law)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 File Transferred
                                                                                                                                    File sent to Brattleboro as to defendant Roger Stockham (law)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ; preliminary exam set for 11:00 2/24/03 for Roger Stockham ; bail hearing set for 11:00 2/24/03 for Roger Stockham Cy to affected parties, USPO [ 2:02-m -56 ] (jjj)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Psychiatric Report +
                                                                                                                                        PSYCHIATRIC EVALUATION (SEALED) received for Roger Stockham [ 2:02-m -56 ] (jjj)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier extending period of psychiatric examination to 1/14/03 (cc: all counsel) [ 2:02-m -56 ] (pjd)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Search Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                            SEARCH WARRANT returned 10/10/02 as to 44 Congress Street, Unit 3, St. Albans, VT, 05478 [ 2:02-m -56 ] (law)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Notice of Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE for Roger Stockham by Attorney Robert J. McDowell and terminating attorney FPD for Roger Stockham [ 2:02-m -56 ] (law)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                ARREST WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED as to defendant Roger Stockham ; defendant arrested on 10/10/02 [ 2:02-m -56 ] (pjd)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER for Mental Competence Exam and Evaluation by Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier (cc: all counsel) [ 2:02-m -56 ] (jjj)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Application/Affidavit for Search Warrant
                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION/AFFIDAVIT for Search Warrant by USA Paul J. Van de Graaf (reviewed by 10BA on 10/10/02) [ 2:02-m -56 ] (jjj)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002, Terminated: 10/11/2002 Motion for Psychiatric Exam
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for mental competency exam and psychiatric evaluation by USA as to Roger Stockham [ 2:02-m -56 ] (pjd)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier (Ct Rptr: taped) initial appearance of Roger Stockham w/Barbara O'Connor, AFPD present;Paul Van de Graff, AUSA for Govt. Deft advises the court that he will allow FPD to act as co-counsel for today's proceeding and that is name is Hen Ahadin. Govt moves for detention and mental competence exam. ORDERED: granting [3-1] motion for mental competency exam and psychiatric evaluation examination ordered for Roger Stockham. Deft to be detained pending exam. [ 2:02-m -56 ] (jjj)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                          ARREST of defendant Roger Stockham on 10/10/02 [ 2:02-m -56 ] (jjj)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Order Appointing Public Defender
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF APPOINTMENT as to Roger Stockham Attorney FPD [ 2:02-m -56 ] (jjj)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Search Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                              SEARCH WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier [ 2:02-m -56 ] (jjj)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Roger Stockham by USA John-Claude Charbonneau [ 2:02-m -56 ] (law)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT ISSUED for Roger Stockham by Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier [ 2:02-m -56 ] (law)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 File Transferred
                                                                                                                                                                    File sent to Burlington as to defendant Roger Stockham [ 2:02-m -56 ] (law)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?