USA v. Petersen
Criminal Case Vermont District Court, Case No. 2:05-cr-00136-wks

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Van de Graaf, AUSA +1 802 951 6725 paul.van.de.graaf@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Burlington
Filed 12/14/2005
County Windham
Terminated 10/16/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 FRAUDS AND SWINDLES - executed a scheme to obtain money from Conseco Finance Servicing Corporation by forging Steven Petersen's name
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 LOAN AND CREDIT APPLICATIONS GENERALLY - falsely represented that the person appearing at the signing was Steven Petersen when in truth the person was an imposter
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Notice of Release of Lien
NOTICE OF RELEASE OF LIEN by USA as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen (Tomasi, Timothy)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
    RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of criminal debt in the amount of $10,760.00, receipt # 4682001239. (gmg)
      LREF
      Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
      OPINION AND ORDER denying [29] Motion for Relief from Restitution Order as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen (1). Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 02/19/2008. (law)
        LREF
        Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Response to Motion
        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen re [29] MOTION for Relief From Restitution Order (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A# (2) Certificate of Service)(Tomasi, Timothy)
          LREF
          Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007, Terminated: 2/20/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          MOTION for Relief from Restitution Order by Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment (IMAGE IS SEALED))(law)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
            RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of criminal debt in the amount of $600.00, receipt # 4682000336. (law)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
              RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of criminal debt in the amount of $600.00, receipt # 4682000217. (gmg)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
                RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of criminal debt in the amount of $600.00, receipt # 4682000120. (gmg)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Receipt for Payment
                  RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of Criminal Debt in the amount of $600.00, receipt #4682000016 (kac)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
                    RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of restitution in the amount of $600.00, receipt # 04517. (law)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
                      RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of Restitution in the amount of $600.00, receipt # 04392. (kac)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
                        RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of Restitution in the amount of $600.00, receipt # 04267. (kac)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
                          RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of Restitution in the amount of $600.00, receipt # 4161. (jlh)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
                            RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of Restitution in the amount of $600.00, receipt # 04056. (kac)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
                              RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of Restitution in the amount of $600.00, receipt # 24458. (kac)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
                                RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of Restitution in the amount of $600.00, receipt # 24423. (jlh)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Receipt for Payment (SA/fine/rest/bail)
                                  RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. Payment of Special Assessment in the amount of $100.00, receipt # 24343. (kac, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of Lien for Fine and/or Restitution Imposed by USA as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. (law, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                                      JUDGMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen (1), Count(s) 1, Probation for a term of 1 year w/ special conditions including: restitution payments, no new credit charges or lines of credit w/o approval; permit USPO access to financial info; sign a lien that any settlement funds be immediately turned over to victim towards payment of restitution; mandatory drug testing condition suspended; Count(s) 2, Dismissed upon motion by govt . Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/16/2006. Copy to USPO, Certified copy to USMS (jam)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 26 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 SentencingCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III: Sentencing held on 10/16/2006 for Cheryl Gilbert Petersen (1). Dft present w/ counsel J. Mabie; E. Woodcock present for govt. Statements re: outstanding issues and dft's mtn for downward departure. Statements by victims. Statements by dft prior to imposition of sentence. Court makes findings; dft's motion for downward departure denied. SENTENCE: Count(s) 1, Probation for a term of 1 year w/ special conditions including: make restitution payments in accordance with current agreement w/ Greentree Servicing, no new credit charges or lines of credit w/o approval; permit USPO access to financial info; sign a lien that any settlement funds be immediately turned over to victim towards payment of restitution; mandatory drug testing condition suspended; Count(s) 2, Dismissed upon motion by govt. Fines wvd; S/A of $100 imposed. Restitution in the total amt of $39,471.24 is imposed; payment of any outstanding balance shall become a condition of probation. Dft notified of right to appeal. ORDERED: as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen: [25] SEALED MOTION to Seal Document GRANTED; MOTION by dft for departure DENIED. (Court Reporter Nichols.) (jam)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Sentencing Memorandum
                                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. (law)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                            PROCEDURAL AND SCHEDULING ORDER as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen Sentencing set for 10/16/2006 01:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before William K. Sessions III.. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 6/9/06. Cy parties & USPO (jam, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen Sentencing set for 10/16/2006 01:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before William K. Sessions III. Cy parties(jam, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III:Change of Plea Hearing as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen held on 6/9/2006. Dft present w/ counsel J. Mabie; P. Van de Graaf present for govt. Clerk swears dft & Court makes inquiries. Court informs dft of maximum penalties. Plea entered by Cheryl Gilbert Petersen (1) Guilty Count 1. Plea agreement reviewed. Statement of facts by govt. Court makes findings; accepts guilty plea; acceptance of plea agreement deferred; PSR to be completed by USPO. Sentencing set for 10/16/2006 01:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before William K. Sessions III. Dft remains released pending sentencing. (Court Reporter Nichols.) (jam, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Plea Agreement
                                                  PLEA AGREEMENT as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen (jam, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen Change of Plea Hearing set for 6/9/2006 11:30 AM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before William K. Sessions III. Cy parties(jam, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting as unopposed [16] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen (1). Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 04/27/06. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006, Terminated: 4/27/2006 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                        MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release with Consent (to allow travel within 48 states for employment & other lawful purposes) by Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. (law) Modified on 5/4/2006 (jse, ). Modified on 5/4/2006 (jse, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [14] Motion to Continue All Deadlines with Consent as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen (1). Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 30th day of March, 2006. (law )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006, Terminated: 3/30/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                            MOTION to Continue All Deadlines with Consent by USA filed by Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(law) Modified on 3/30/2006 (jse, ). Modified on 3/30/2006 (jse, ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting as unopposed [12] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen (1). Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 03/30/06. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006, Terminated: 3/30/2006 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (to allow dft to reside temporarily in South Haven, Michigan) by Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. (law)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Notice of Docket Entry Correction
                                                                  NOTICE of Docket Text or Event Modification as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen re: [11] Warrant Returned Executed. The orignal document number [11] has been deleted from the system. The returned warrant was docketed in the incorrect case. (jse, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER denying as moot [3] Motion to Quash as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen (1). Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/18/06. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 1/4/2006 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                      WARRANT FOR ARREST Returned Executed on 12/29/2005 in case as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. (law)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen . Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on December 29, 2005. Cy to counsel, USPO, USMS. (law)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Pretrial Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          CRIMINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER as to Cheryl Gilbert Petersen Motions due by 3/30/2006. Time excluded from 12/29/2005 - 03/30/2006. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 29th day of December, 2005. Cy to counsel, USPO. (law)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge J. Garvan Murtha; Arraignment as to Cheryl Petersen held on 12/29/2005. Dft present w/counsel John Mabie, Esq. Elizabeth Woodcock, AUSA present by videoconference. Dft is sworn and court makes inquiries. Dft waives reading of indictment and pleads NOT GUILTY, Counts 1 and 2. Motions due 3/30/2006 ORDERED: Dft released on PR with conditions pending trial. (Court Reporter Dothan) (kak)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Notice of Appearance - Defendant
                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John Carl Mabie appearing for Cheryl Gilbert Petersen. (law)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Cheryl Gibert Petersen Arraignment set for 12/29/2005 09:15 AM in Brattleboro Courtroom before Hon. J. Garvan Murtha. Counsel for the Govt will participate by video from Rutland. Cy to AUSA, Atty Mabie, USPO.(wjf, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005, Terminated: 1/18/2006 Motion to Quash
                                                                                  MOTION to Quash Arrest Warrant and to Issue a Summons by USA as to Cheryl Gibert Petersen. (law)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Indictment
                                                                                    INDICTMENT as to Cheryl Gibert Petersen (1) count(s) 1, 2. Cy to USPO, USAO. (law )
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 457 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?