United States v. Whitney
Criminal Case Vermont District Court, Case No. 2:08-cr-00087-wks

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 10:11 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William B. Darrow +1 802 951 6725 +1 802 951 6540 bill.darrow@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Deborah Lynn Whitney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bergeron, Paradis & Fitzpatrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas G. Kallen +1 802 863 1191 dkallen@burlington.bpflegal.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Burlington
Filed 7/22/2008
County Lamoille
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-27
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341.F FRAUDS AND SWINDLES - scheme to defraud and to obtain money and property by means of false and fraudulent representations and promises from bookkeeping customers and others, using the money for personal expenses and to continue the scheme
Count 28
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1957-7600.F
Offense Level 4
181957 and 2.F ENGAGING IN MONETARY TRANSACTIONS - money laundering
Count 29-32
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206C.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1).F DECLARE UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY - false income tax returns
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Probation Form 12B
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
    UNOPPOSED MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Deborah Lynn Whitney. (Kallen, Douglas)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Receipt for Passport
      RECEIPT for Surrender of Passport as to Deborah Lynn Whitney issued by USA. Copy USPO. (gmg)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 CJA 20 Appointment
        CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Douglas G. Kallen for Deborah Lynn Whitney. (law)
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Pretrial Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          CRIMINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER as to Deborah Lynn Whitney. Motions due by 10/27/2008. Speedy Trial Time Excluded: 7/25/08-10/27/08. Signed by Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier on 7/28/08. (jjj)
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
            ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Deborah Lynn Whitney. Signed by Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier on 7/25/08. (jjj)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier. Arraignment as to Deborah Lynn Whitney held on 7/25/2008. Deft present without counsel and William Darrow, AUSA present for Govt. Court enters not guilty plea to Cts 1-32 on deft's behalf. ORDERED: Court will appoint counsel on deft's behalf. Deft to be released on PR with conditions and pretrial motions are to be filed by 10/25/2008. (Court Reporter: taped) (jjj)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Deborah Lynn Whitney. (Document image is sealed) (jjj)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order on Motion to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [10] Motion to Seal [9] Indictment and Arrest Warrant as to Deborah Lynn Whitney (1). Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 7/22/2008. (law)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008, Terminated: 7/22/2008 Motion to Seal Case
                    MOTION to Seal [9] Indictment and Arrest Warrant by USA as to Deborah Lynn Whitney. (law)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Indictment
                      INDICTMENT as to Deborah Lynn Whitney (1) count(s) 1-27, 28, 29-32. (law)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Warrant Returned Executed
                        Search WARRANT RETURNED executed as to 63 Mountain View Road, Eden, Vermont, which is a one story gray manufactured home with blue shutters and a dark gray roof and various outbuildings on 05/10/07 in case as to Deborah Lynn Whitney. (jlh)[2:07-mj-00044-jjn *SEALED*]
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Warrant Returned Executed
                          Search WARRANT RETURNED executed on 05/11/07 in case as to Deborah Lynn Whitney. (jlh)[2:07-mj-00044-jjn *SEALED*]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Application/Affidavit for Search Warrant
                            APPLICATION/AFFIDAVIT for Search Warrant as to Safety Deposit Box Numbers 100320 and 100729 located within Union Bank, 20 Lower Main Street, Morrisville, Vermont as to Deborah Whitney. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment B) (law)[2:07-mj-00044-jjn *SEALED*]
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [4] Motion to Seal as to Deborah Whitney (1). Signed by Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier on 5/11/2007. Copy to AUSA. (law)[2:07-mj-00044-jjn *SEALED*]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007, Terminated: 5/11/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                MOTION to Seal [6] APPLICATION/AFFIDAVIT for Search Warrant by USA as to Deborah Whitney. (law)[2:07-mj-00044-jjn *SEALED*]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [2] Motion to Seal as to Deborah Whitney (1). Signed by Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier on 5/9/2007. Copy to AUSA. (law)[2:07-mj-00044-jjn *SEALED*]
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007, Terminated: 5/9/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                    MOTION to Seal [1] APPLICATION/AFFIDAVIT for Search Warrant by USA as to Deborah Whitney. (law)[2:07-mj-00044-jjn *SEALED*]
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Application/Affidavit for Search Warrant
                                      APPLICATION/AFFIDAVIT for Search Warrant as to 63 Mountain View Road, Eden, Vermont, which is a one story gray manufactured home with blue shutters and a dark gray roof and various outbuildings as to Deborah Whitney. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A# (2) Attachment B) (law)[2:07-mj-00044-jjn *SEALED*]
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 649 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?