USA v. Fraze et al
Criminal Case Alaska District Court, Case No. 3:05-cr-00089-RRB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Loeffler +1 907 271 5071 +1 907 271 1500 karen.loeffler@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Anchorage
Filed 9/21/2005
County Anchorage
Terminated 10/18/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344(2) BANK FRAUD
Count 7-12
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 FALSE STATEMENTS TO INFLUENCE BANK
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 4.F
Offense Level 4
184 MISPRISION OF FELONY
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007
ORDER granting [76] Motion for Return of Property as to Robert W. Lervaag (2) (JPS, COURT STAFF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007, Terminated: 7/2/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    MOTION for Return of Property by Robert W. Lervaag. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Tatter, Sue)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007
      ORDER as to Robert W. Lervaag re: passport in court's possession. Any party wishing to have said item returned, needs to file motion with proposed order on or before 08/01/2007 (LGK, COURT STAFF)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
        ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to Robert W. Lervaag re [65] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is GRANTED. This appeal is Dismissed. (TJG, COURT STAFF)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006
          USCA Case Number as to Robert W. Lervaag 06-30639 for [65] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Robert W. Lervaag,. (TJG, COURT STAFF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006
            Time Schedule ORDER as to Robert W. Lervaag re [65] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (TJG, COURT STAFF)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006
              Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet as to Robert W. Lervaag to US Court of Appeals re [65] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment cc: 9CCA, Appellant, Appellee (TJG, COURT STAFF)
                LREF
                Blank 68 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Court Filing
                PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ronald H. Fraze; Imposition of Sentence held on 10/18/2006 before Judge Ralph R. Beistline. Court Recorder: CME. This transcript is available for review in the Clerk's Office in Anchorage, Alaska. (SCL, COURT STAFF)
                  LREF
                  Blank 67 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Court Filing
                  PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Robert W. Lervaag; Imposition of Sentence held on 10/18/2006 before Judge Ralph R. Beistline. Court Recorder: CME. This transcript is available for review in the Clerk's Office in Anchorage, Alaska. (SCL, COURT STAFF)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006
                    ORDER denying [57] Motion for bail pending appeal as to Robert W. Lervaag (2). (JPS, COURT STAFF)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006, Terminated: 1/16/2007 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by Robert W. Lervaag re [62] Judgment Filing fee $ 455. (Tatter, Sue)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006
                        RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Robert W. Lervaag re [57] MOTION for Bail Pending Appeal (Loeffler, Karen)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                          JUDGMENT as to Robert W. Lervaag (2), Count(s) 7, 15 months incarceration; 5 years supervised release; $100.00 special assessment; $900,000.00 restitution. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/18/2006. (TJG, COURT STAFF)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                            JUDGMENT as to Ronald H. Fraze (1), Count(s) 1s, 5 years probation; $100.00 special assessment; $900,000.00 restitution. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/18/2006. (TJG, COURT STAFF)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Court Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline :Sentencing held on 10/18/2006 for Robert W. Lervaag (2), Count 7, 15 months incarceration; 5 years supervised release; $100.00 special assessment; $900,000.00 restitution. Government's oral motion to dismiss Counts 1-6 and 8-12 of the Indictment GRANTED (Court Recorder CME.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-Sue Ellen Tatter; USPO/PTS Officer-Scott Kelley. Defendant Present On Bond. CC: USM, USPO, Finance. (CME, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/2/2006 to reflect oral motion and ruling (NKD, COURT STAFF).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Court Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline :Sentencing held on 10/18/2006 for Ronald H. Fraze (1), Count 1 of the Information, 5 years probation; $100.00 special assessment; $900,000.00 restitution. The government's oral motion to dismiss Counts 1-12 of the Indictment GRANTED (Court Recorder CME.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-Ronald Offret; USPO/PTS Officer-Scott Kelley. Defendant Present On Bond. CC: USM, USPO, Finance. (CME, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/2/2006 to reflect oral motion and ruling (NKD, COURT STAFF).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006, Terminated: 10/31/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  MOTION for Bail Pending Appeal by Robert W. Lervaag. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Tatter, Sue)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006
                                    ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR SENTENCING as to Ronald H. Fraze. (JPS, COURT STAFF)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006
                                      ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR SENTENCING as to Robert W. Lervaag. (JPS, COURT STAFF)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Robert W. Lervaag (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit #1)(Loeffler, Karen)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Ronald H. Fraze (Loeffler, Karen)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                            SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Robert W. Lervaag (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Tatter, Sue)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Ronald H. Fraze (Offret, Ronald)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline :Final Pretrial Conference / Arraignment on Information / Entry of Plea Hearing as to Ronald H. Fraze held on 8/8/2006. Court and counsel heard re defendant pleading to Information being filed today by government; matter continued to 3:00 p.m. Copy of Information given to defendant. Defendant sworn and stated true name. Defendant advised of general rights, charges, and penalties. Waiver of Indictment FILED. Plea entered by Ronald H. Fraze (1) Guilty Count 1s of the Information; Government to dismiss Indictment at sentencing. Court accepted plea; referred to P.O. for presentence report. Sentencing set for 10/18/2006 01:30 PM before Ralph R. Beistline. Defendant's conditions of release remain as previously set. Trial by Jury previously set for 8/14/06 at 8:30 a.m. is VACATED.(Court Recorder AMK.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-Ronald Offret; USPO/PTS Officer-Scott Kelley. Defendant Present In Custody. cc: JC, USM, USPO.(AMK, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Ronald H. Fraze (TJG, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                                                    INFORMATION as to Ronald H. Fraze (1) count(s) 1s. (PRR, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                      Minute Entry for Change of Plea Hearing as to Robert W. Lervaag held on 8/7/20 before Judge Ralph R. Beistline. Defendant sworn. Defendant changed plea to guilty on count 7 of the Indictment. Trial by Jury set for August 14, 2006 and Final pretrial conferences set for August 8, 2006 vacated as to this defendant only. Sentencing set for 10/18/2006 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Remaining counts of the indictment to be dismissed at the Imposition of Sentence hearing. Defendant remains on the previously set conditions of release. NOTICE: No less than seven (7) days prior to the sentencing date, each party shall file a written sentencing memo pursuant to D.AK 32.1(d) and serve opposing counsel and the probation officer. (Court Recorder EKS.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-Sue Ellen Tatter; USPO/PTS Officer-Pamela Shaw. Defendant Present On Bond. cc: USM, USPO, Jury Clerk (EKS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006
                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to Robert W. Lervaag Change of Plea Hearing set for 8/7/2006 at 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. (JPS, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006
                                                          NOTICE OF INTENT TO CHANGE PLEA as to Robert W. Lervaag (Tatter, Sue)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline :Final Pretrial Conference/Hearing on Motion for Continuance of Trial (DKT #36) as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag held on 5/2/2006, Motions terminated as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag: [36] MOTION to Continue Trial (UNOPPOSED) filed by Robert W. Lervaag; Court GRANTED Motion to Continue Trial (DKT #36); Court finds excludable delay under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161 (h)(8)(A)(B) Continuance granted and (h)(8)(B)(ii) Case unusual or complex. Trial by Jury set for May 8, 2006 VACATED. Jury Trial set for 8/14/2006 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2006 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Defendants Lervaag and Fraze's conditions of release remain as previously set. CC: USM, USPO, Jury Clerk.(Court Recorder CME.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-Sue Ellen Tatter, Ronald Offret; Defendants Present and On Bond. (CME, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                              ORDER as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag. (JPS, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                                Set/Reset Hearing: [36] MOTION to Continue Trial (UNOPPOSED). Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2006 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. (JPS, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by Robert W. Lervaag [36] MOTION to Continue Trial (UNOPPOSED) filed by Robert W. Lervaag, (Tatter, Sue)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006, Terminated: 5/2/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                    MOTION to Continue Trial (UNOPPOSED) by Robert W. Lervaag. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Tatter, Sue)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [33] Motion to Travel as to Ronald H. Fraze (1) Signed by Judge Terrance W Hall on 3/24/2006. (TJG, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006
                                                                        ERRATA(proposed order) by Ronald H. Fraze re [33] MOTION to Travel filed by Ronald H. Fraze, (Offret, Ronald) Modified on 3/29/2006 to insert proposed order (TJG, ).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006, Terminated: 3/24/2006 Motion to Travel
                                                                          MOTION to Travel by Ronald H. Fraze. (Offret, Ronald)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006
                                                                            Docket Annotation as to Ronald H. Fraze: [33] MOTION to Travel filed by Ronald H. Fraze does not have a proposed order attached. Counsel is asked to file a proposed order as an attachment to an Errata for signature. (CPB, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [31] Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Ronald H. Fraze (1)Discovery due 02/28/2006,pretrial motions due 03/20/2006, oppositions due 03/31/2006 Signed by Judge Terrance W Hall on 02/07/2006. (TJG, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to Ronald H. Fraze: Discovery due by 2/28/2006. Motions due by 3/20/2006. (TJG, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006, Terminated: 2/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File pre-trial motions by Ronald H. Fraze. (Offret, Ronald)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline :Trial date setting conference/Pretrial Conference as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag held on 12/28/2005; Jury Selection set for 5/8/2006 08:30 AM; Jury Trial set for 5/8/2006 08:30 AM before Ralph R. Beistline; Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2006 09:00 AM before Ralph R. Beistline; trial by jury previously set for 1/3/06 at 8:30 AM is vacated; crt found excludable delay under 18:3161 (h)(8)(B)(ii). (Court Recorder RMC.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-M.J. Haden, Ronald Offret; Defendants Present On Bond. (RMC, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/18/2005, Entered: 12/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag re [28] granting MOTION to Continue filed by USA, Scheduling Conference set for 12/28/2005 08:45 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 12/16/05. (PLD, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Continue trial date by USA as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag. (PLD, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Terrance W Hall :Scheduling Conference as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag held on 11/22/2005. Pretrial motions due 2/10/06; opposition to pretrial motions due 2/28/06; report and recommendation due 3/31/06. Discovery due by 1/10/2006. (Court Recorder MD.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-Sue Ellen Tatter, Ron Offret; (EKS, ) .
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 ACMS Docket
                                                                                            Copy of ACMS docket. Click on the hyperlink to access docket entries 1-26 from prior ACMS system.(JAG).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 12/11/2005 Indictment Cover Sheet(s) and Signatures
                                                                                              Data Entry for Conversion; Indictment/counts entered (LSC).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Conversion Entry
                                                                                                All future filings will be in the CM/ECF System. All documents filed prior to January 3, 2006, are available for review at the Clerk's Office.(JAG, )
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?