USA v. Fraze et al
Criminal Case Alaska District Court, Case No. 3:05-cr-00089-RRB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2019 at 8:28 PM ST (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Loeffler +1 907 271 5071 +1 907 271 1500 karen.loeffler@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Anchorage
Filed 9/21/2005
County Anchorage
Terminated 10/18/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344(2) BANK FRAUD
Count 7-12
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 FALSE STATEMENTS TO INFLUENCE BANK
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 4.F
Offense Level 4
184 MISPRISION OF FELONY
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Release of Funds
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None PFD Writ Returned
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 68 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Court Filing
        PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ronald H. Fraze; Imposition of Sentence held on 10/18/2006 before Judge Ralph R. Beistline. Court Recorder: CME. This transcript is available for review in the Clerk's Office in Anchorage, Alaska. (SCL, COURT STAFF)
          LREF
          Legal Document 60 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
          JUDGMENT as to Ronald H. Fraze (1), Count(s) 1s, 5 years probation; $100.00 special assessment; $900,000.00 restitution. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/18/2006. (TJG, COURT STAFF)
            LREF
            Legal Document 58 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Court Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline :Sentencing held on 10/18/2006 for Ronald H. Fraze (1), Count 1 of the Information, 5 years probation; $100.00 special assessment; $900,000.00 restitution. The government's oral motion to dismiss Counts 1-12 of the Indictment GRANTED (Court Recorder CME.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-Ronald Offret; USPO/PTS Officer-Scott Kelley. Defendant Present On Bond. CC: USM, USPO, Finance. (CME, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/2/2006 to reflect oral motion and ruling (NKD, COURT STAFF).
              LREF
              Legal Document 56 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006
              ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR SENTENCING as to Ronald H. Fraze. (JPS, COURT STAFF)
                LREF
                Legal Document 51 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Ronald H. Fraze (Loeffler, Karen)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 49 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                  SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Ronald H. Fraze (Offret, Ronald)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline :Final Pretrial Conference / Arraignment on Information / Entry of Plea Hearing as to Ronald H. Fraze held on 8/8/2006. Court and counsel heard re defendant pleading to Information being filed today by government; matter continued to 3:00 p.m. Copy of Information given to defendant. Defendant sworn and stated true name. Defendant advised of general rights, charges, and penalties. Waiver of Indictment FILED. Plea entered by Ronald H. Fraze (1) Guilty Count 1s of the Information; Government to dismiss Indictment at sentencing. Court accepted plea; referred to P.O. for presentence report. Sentencing set for 10/18/2006 01:30 PM before Ralph R. Beistline. Defendant's conditions of release remain as previously set. Trial by Jury previously set for 8/14/06 at 8:30 a.m. is VACATED.(Court Recorder AMK.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-Ronald Offret; USPO/PTS Officer-Scott Kelley. Defendant Present In Custody. cc: JC, USM, USPO.(AMK, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Ronald H. Fraze (TJG, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                        INFORMATION as to Ronald H. Fraze (1) count(s) 1s. (PRR, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 39 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Court Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline :Final Pretrial Conference/Hearing on Motion for Continuance of Trial (DKT #36) as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag held on 5/2/2006, Motions terminated as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag: [36] MOTION to Continue Trial (UNOPPOSED) filed by Robert W. Lervaag; Court GRANTED Motion to Continue Trial (DKT #36); Court finds excludable delay under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161 (h)(8)(A)(B) Continuance granted and (h)(8)(B)(ii) Case unusual or complex. Trial by Jury set for May 8, 2006 VACATED. Jury Trial set for 8/14/2006 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2006 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Defendants Lervaag and Fraze's conditions of release remain as previously set. CC: USM, USPO, Jury Clerk.(Court Recorder CME.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-Sue Ellen Tatter, Ronald Offret; Defendants Present and On Bond. (CME, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                            ORDER as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag. (JPS, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                              Set/Reset Hearing: [36] MOTION to Continue Trial (UNOPPOSED). Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2006 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. (JPS, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [33] Motion to Travel as to Ronald H. Fraze (1) Signed by Judge Terrance W Hall on 3/24/2006. (TJG, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006
                                  ERRATA(proposed order) by Ronald H. Fraze re [33] MOTION to Travel filed by Ronald H. Fraze, (Offret, Ronald) Modified on 3/29/2006 to insert proposed order (TJG, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006, Terminated: 3/24/2006 Motion to Travel
                                    MOTION to Travel by Ronald H. Fraze. (Offret, Ronald)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006
                                      Docket Annotation as to Ronald H. Fraze: [33] MOTION to Travel filed by Ronald H. Fraze does not have a proposed order attached. Counsel is asked to file a proposed order as an attachment to an Errata for signature. (CPB, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [31] Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Ronald H. Fraze (1)Discovery due 02/28/2006,pretrial motions due 03/20/2006, oppositions due 03/31/2006 Signed by Judge Terrance W Hall on 02/07/2006. (TJG, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to Ronald H. Fraze: Discovery due by 2/28/2006. Motions due by 3/20/2006. (TJG, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006, Terminated: 2/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File pre-trial motions by Ronald H. Fraze. (Offret, Ronald)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 30 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline :Trial date setting conference/Pretrial Conference as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag held on 12/28/2005; Jury Selection set for 5/8/2006 08:30 AM; Jury Trial set for 5/8/2006 08:30 AM before Ralph R. Beistline; Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2006 09:00 AM before Ralph R. Beistline; trial by jury previously set for 1/3/06 at 8:30 AM is vacated; crt found excludable delay under 18:3161 (h)(8)(B)(ii). (Court Recorder RMC.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-M.J. Haden, Ronald Offret; Defendants Present On Bond. (RMC, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/18/2005, Entered: 12/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                ORDER as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag re [28] granting MOTION to Continue filed by USA, Scheduling Conference set for 12/28/2005 08:45 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 12/16/05. (PLD, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                  Joint MOTION to Continue trial date by USA as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag. (PLD, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Terrance W Hall :Scheduling Conference as to Ronald H. Fraze, Robert W. Lervaag held on 11/22/2005. Pretrial motions due 2/10/06; opposition to pretrial motions due 2/28/06; report and recommendation due 3/31/06. Discovery due by 1/10/2006. (Court Recorder MD.) Government Counsel-Karen Loeffler; Defense Counsel-Sue Ellen Tatter, Ron Offret; (EKS, ) .
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 ACMS Docket
                                                      Copy of ACMS docket. Click on the hyperlink to access docket entries 1-26 from prior ACMS system.(JAG).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 12/11/2005 Indictment Cover Sheet(s) and Signatures
                                                        Data Entry for Conversion; Indictment/counts entered (LSC).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Conversion Entry
                                                          All future filings will be in the CM/ECF System. All documents filed prior to January 3, 2006, are available for review at the Clerk's Office.(JAG, )
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 353 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?