USA v. Sehm
Criminal Case Alaska District Court, Case No. 3:05-cr-00040-JKS-JDR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Crandon Randell +1 907 271 5104 +1 907 271 1500 crandon.randell@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Anchorage
Filed 4/20/2005
County Anchorage
Terminated 9/20/2005
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 LOAN AND CREDIT APPLICATIONS
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 LOAN AND CREDIT APPLICATIONS
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008
Appeal Record Returned by 9CCA on 1/25/08. (NXL, COURT STAFF)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
    JUDGMENT of 9CCA (certified copy) as to Brent A. Sehm re [46] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. The judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. (EKS, COURT STAFF)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
      MEMORANDUM to 9CCA Judgment as to Brent A. Sehm re [46] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (EKS, COURT STAFF)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 USCA Order
        ORDER of 9CCA (certified copy) as to Brent A. Sehm re [46] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment; appellant's motion for continuance is DENIED. This matter is ordered submitted without oral argument on 12/6/06. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 USCA Order
          9CCA ORDER as to Brent A. Sehm re [46] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Appellants motion to waive oral argument is denied. (PLD, COURT STAFF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006
            Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal as to Brent A. Sehm to US Court of Appeals re [46] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (RMC, COURT STAFF)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006
              9CCA ORDER as to Brent A. Sehm re [46] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment; granting ext of time to file opening brief; opening brief due 5/30/2006; answering brief due 6/29/2006; optional reply brief due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (DPM, ) Modified on 11/2/2006 to correct docket no. (DPM, COURT STAFF).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 55 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 11/2/2006 Docket Annotation
                ACMS dkt 56 USM return of amended judgment as to Brent A. Sehm executed 11/22/2006. (DPM, COURT STAFF)
                  LREF
                  Blank 55 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 11/2/2006 Docket Annotation
                  ACMS dkt 55; USM return of judgment as to Brent A. Sehm executed 11/22/2006. (DPM, COURT STAFF)
                    LREF
                    Blank 54 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Designation of Record on Appeal
                    USDC Certificate of Record on Appeal re [46] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (SMF)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 USCA Case Number
                      USCA Case Number as to Brent A. Sehm 05-30513for [46] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Brent A. Sehm,. (SMF)
                        LREF
                        Blank 53 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Proposed Change of Plea/Final Pretrial Conference as to Brent A. Sehm held on 6/20/05 before Judge Singleton. Court Reporter: Caroline Edmiston. (EKS, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 52 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Court Filing
                          Partial TRANSCRIPT of IOS as to Brent A. Sehm held on 9/19/05 before Judge Singleton. Court Reporter: Linda Christensen. (EKS, ) Modified on 12/6/2005 (EKS, ).
                            LREF
                            Blank 46 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005, Terminated: 11/13/2006 Terminated:
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Brent A. Sehm re [40]Amended Judgment (SMF).
                              LREF
                              Blank 40 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
                              AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Brent A. Sehm (1), Count(s) 1, 30 months imprisonment; 60 months Supervised Release w/conditions as stated in the judgment; $100 Special Assessment. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton on 09/22/05. (LSC, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 36 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005, Terminated: 9/21/2005 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [36] Motion to Correct Judgment and to Dismiss Ct 2 of Indt as to Brent A. Sehm (1) Signed by Judge James K. Singleton on 09/21/05. (LSC, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 37 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
                                  JUDGMENT as to Brent A. Sehm (1), Count(s) 1, 30 months imprisonment; 60 months Supervised Release w/conditions as stated in the judgment; $100 Special Assessment Signed by Judge James K. Singleton on 09/20/05. (LSC, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 36 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005, Terminated: 9/21/2005 Terminated:
                                    MOTION to Correct Judgment and to Dismiss Ct 2 of Indt by USA as to Brent A. Sehm. (LSC, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 35 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 SentencingCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James K. Singleton :Sentencing held on 9/19/2005 for Brent A. Sehm (1), Count(s) 1, 30 months imprisonment; 60 months Supervised Release w/conditions as stated in the judgment; $100 Special Assessment. Off Record: government counsel to file mot to dismiss Ct 2 of Indt (Court Recorder LSC.) Government Counsel-Crandon Randell; Defense Counsel-Kevin McCoy; USPO/PTS Officer-Pam Shaw. Defendant Present In Custody. (LSC, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 ACMS Docket
                                        Copy of ACMS docket. Click on the hyperlink to access docket entries 1-51 from prior ACMS system.(JAG)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Indictment Cover Sheet(s) and Signatures
                                          Data Entry for Conversion; Indictment/counts entered (LSC).
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Conversion Entry
                                            All future filings will be in the CM/ECF System. All documents filed prior to January 3, 2006, are available for review at the Clerk's Office.(JAG, )
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?