USA v. Taylor
Criminal Case Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:06-cr-00209-MHT-CSC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Verne H. Speirs +1 334 223 7280 +2237 223 223 7560 verne.speirs@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Montgomery
Filed 8/15/2006
County Montgomery
Terminated 1/24/2007
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344A.F-BANK FRAUD; NMT $1,000,000 [*]; NMT 30Y, B, NMT 5Y SUP REL; G-LINES; VWPA; $100 AF
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014.F-LOAN AND CREDIT APPLICATIONS GENERALLY; NMT $1,000,000 [*]; NMT 30Y, B, NMT 5Y SUP REL; G-LINES; VWPA; $100 AF
Def Custody Status Custody Other Jurisdiction
Flags CLOSED, MHT-ClerkA
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008, Terminated: 7/15/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Pro-Se MOTION for ruling by Bridget Y. Taylor. (ag, ) Modified on 7/21/2008 (TERMINATED, FILED IN ERROR) (ag, ).
    LREF
    Legal Document 48 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
    Judgment Returned Executed as to Bridget Y. Taylor, defendant delivered by bus to FMC at Forth Worth, TX on 8/15/2007. (ag, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Court Filing
      ORDER denying [46] Motion to Amend/Correct sentence as to Bridget Y. Taylor (1). Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/18/2007. (sql, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007, Terminated: 7/18/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
        MOTION to Amend Sentence by Bridget Y. Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment No. 1# (2) Attachment No. 2)(ag, )
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 Court Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Change of Plea (PDF available for court use only) as to Bridget Y. Taylor held on 10/10/2006 before Judge Charles S. Coody. Court Reporter: Mitchell Reisner. (ag, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 Court Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing Proceedings (PDF available for court use only) as to Bridget Y. Taylor held on 1/22/2007 before Judge Myron H. Thompson. Court Reporter: Mitchell Reisner. (ag, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Docket Annotation
              "Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (28:2255) as to Bridget Y. Taylor filed in CA NO. 2:07cv404-MHT." (ag, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Court Filing
                ORDER denying [42] Motion transfer to boot camp as to Bridget Y. Taylor (1). Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/22/2007. (sql, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007, Terminated: 2/22/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  PRO-SE MOTION (permission) to transfer to the Boot Camp Facility for Women in the State of Texas by Bridget Y. Taylor. (ag, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Court Filing
                    ORDER denying [40] Motion for Reconsideration as to Bridget Y. Taylor (1). Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/8/2007. (ag, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007, Terminated: 2/8/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                      (Pro-Se) MOTION for Reconsideration re [35] Judgment, by Bridget Y. Taylor. (ag, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Court Filing
                        ORDER denying [36] Motion for Reconsideration as to Bridget Y. Taylor (1). Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/26/2007. (ag, )
                          LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                          AMENDED PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Sealed) as to Bridget Y. Taylor (ag, )
                            LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                            PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Sealed) as to Bridget Y. Taylor (ag, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007, Terminated: 1/26/2007 Terminated:
                              (PRO-SE) MOTION for Reconsideration re [35] Judgment by Bridget Y. Taylor. (ag, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Judgment*Court Filing
                                JUDGMENT as to Bridget Y. Taylor (1), Count(s) 1, 30 Mos Imp (conc w/Ct 2 and with Montg. Co. CC Nos. CC98-94,CC98-581, CC98-1572, CC00-04, 05, 06, 07 & 08, CC01-704, CC01-703, CC01-503, CC02-1299 and CC04-1029); 5 Yrs Sup Rel (conc w/Ct 2); $100 SA; $9,042.32 Rest. (total); Count(s) 2, 30 Mos Imp (conc w/Ct 1 and with Montg. Co. CC Nos. CC98-94,CC98-581, CC98-1572, CC00-04, 05, 06, 07 & 08, CC01-704, CC01-703, CC01-503, CC02-1299 and CC04-1029); 5 Yrs Sup Rel (conc w/Ct 1); $100 SA; $9,042.32 Rest. (total) . Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/24/2007. (ag, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 SentencingCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for Sentencing held before Judge Myron H. Thompsonon 1/22/2007 as to Bridget Y. Taylor. (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.) (Attachments: # (1) Witness List) (ag, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Oral Order
                                    ORAL ORDER denying ORAL MOTION for Downward Departure as withdrawn by Bridget Y. Taylor . Entered by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/22/2007. (ag, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Terminated:
                                      ORAL MOTION to Withdraw ORAL MOTION for Downward Departure by Bridget Y. Taylor. (ag, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Terminated:
                                        ORAL MOTION for Downward Departure for Personal Family Circumstances by Bridget Y. Taylor. (ag, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Court Filing
                                          ORDER as to Bridget Y. Taylor resetting Sentencing for 1/22/2007 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2FMJ before Honorable Myron H. Thompson. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/19/2007. (ag, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Court Filing
                                            ORDER as to Bridget Y. Taylor continuing generally sentencing set for 1/22/07 . Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/19/07. (ajr, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007
                                              Case as to Bridget Y. Taylor reassigned to Judge Myron H. Thompson. Judge William Keith Watkins no longer assigned to the case. (ajr, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [26] Motion to withdraw motion to continue; denying as moot [24] Motion to Continue sentencing; granting [25] Motion for extension of time to file objections to PSI Report; extending the deadline for filing objections from 12/27/06 to 1/17/07; Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/16/07. (ajr, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006, Terminated: 1/16/2007 Motion to Vacate
                                                  MOTION to Vacate Motion to Continue Sentencing (Doc. No. 24) by Bridget Y. Taylor. (Butler, Kevin)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006, Terminated: 1/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI Report (UNOPPOSED) by Bridget Y. Taylor. (Butler, Kevin)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006, Terminated: 1/16/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                      MOTION to Continue Sentencing (UNOPPOSED) by Bridget Y. Taylor. (Butler, Kevin)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER as to Bridget Y. Taylor: Sentencing set for 1/22/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2F before Honorable William Keith Watkins. That on or before 12/27/06, counsel for parties shall communicate in writing to the Probation Officer any objections they have to the presentence report; That Unless excused in writing by the Chief U.S. Probation Officer, counsel for parties shall be available for a conference with the Probation Officer on 1/3/07 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss issues contained in the presentence report. Any motion for downward departure shall be filed on or before the conference date with the Probation Officer, unless based on unknown and unforseen circumstances arising after the date, in which case the motion must be filed promptly upon discovery of such circumstances.. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/16/06. (ws, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles S. Coody :Change of Plea Hearing as to Bridget Y. Taylor held on 10/10/2006, Plea entered by Bridget Y. Taylor (1) Guilty to Counts 1 and 2 of the Indictment. (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.) (ws, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                                                            PLEA AGREEMENT as to Bridget Y. Taylor (ws, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                              Consent to Enter Guilty Plea before U. S. Magistrate Judge as to Bridget Y. Taylor (ws, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Bridget Y. Taylor: (ws, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                                                                  ORAL ORDER Accepting Guilty Plea as to Bridget Y. Taylor and Adjudicating the defendant guilty as to Count(s) 1 and 2 of the Indictment . Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/10/06. (ws, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER as to Bridget Y. Taylor setting Change of Plea Hearing for 10/10/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Honorable Charles S. Coody; directing the clerk to provide a court reporter for this proceeding; Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/5/06. (ajr)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006
                                                                      NOTICE OF INTENT TO CHANGE PLEA by Bridget Y. Taylor (Butler, Kevin)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER ON ARRAIGNMENT as to Bridget Y. Taylor Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2006 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Honorable Charles S. Coody. Jury Trial set for 10/16/2006 before Honorable William Keith Watkins. Pretrial Motions due by 9/22/2006. Discovery due from the government by 9/27/06 and from the defendant by 10/4/2006. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/3/06. (ajr)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                          Arrest Warrant Returned Executed in case as to Bridget Y. Taylor. Defendant arrested on 9/22/06. (ajr)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson :Arraignment as to Bridget Y. Taylor (1) Counts 1,2 held on 9/27/2006, Initial Appearance as to Bridget Y. Taylor held on 9/27/2006, Plea entered by Bridget Y. Taylor (1) Counts 1,2 - Not Guilty on counts 1, 2. (Recording Time FTR: 11:10 - 11:16.) (war, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [13] Motion to file financial affidavit under seal; Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/25/06. (ajr)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006
                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin L. Butler appearing for Bridget Y. Taylor (Butler, Kevin)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER as to Bridget Y. Taylor (incorporating ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Bridget Y. Taylor. Federal Defender for Bridget Y. Taylor appointed. Appointed counsel shall file a written notice of appearance with this court. Counsel is DIRECTED to file a financial affidavit not later than ten (10) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/14/06. (ws, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006
                                                                                    Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Bridget Y. Taylor for Arraignment set on 9/27/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Honorable Vanzetta P. McPherson. (ajr)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [8] Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Bridget Y. Taylor (1), directing the clerk to issue a WHCAP addressed to the Warden, Tutwiler Prison for Women for defendant's appearance on 9/27/06 at 10:00 a.m. and directing the USMS to return the prisoner to said official when the court has finished with her; Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/7/06. (ajr)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006, Terminated: 9/7/2006 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
                                                                                        MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Bridget Y. Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Speirs, Verne)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                                                                                          Defendant's FOURTH Pro Se NOTICE of Request for Speedy Trial by Bridget Y. Taylor(ajr)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006, Terminated: 9/14/2006 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                            MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and THIRD pro se NOTICE of Request for Speedy Trial by Bridget Y. Taylor(ajr)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                              Defendant's SECOND Pro Se NOTICE of Request for Speedy Trial by Bridget Y. Taylor (snc)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006
                                                                                                Defendant's NOTICE of speedy trial request as to Bridget Y. Taylor (ajr)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006
                                                                                                  Case unsealed as to Bridget Y. Taylor pursuant to notice from USMS that a detainer has been placed with AL DOC - Tutwiler (ajr)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006
                                                                                                    INDICTMENT as to Bridget Y. Taylor (1) count(s) 1, 2. (war, )
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?