Rivers v. Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00104-MHT-TFM
District Judge Myron H. Thompson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Nathaniel Rivers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Bush & Faulk, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Brady Lewis +1 334 263 7733 +1 334 832 4390 j-lewis@jaylewislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by STATUS: OTHER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith Anderson Nelms +1 334 351 1770 +1 334 351 1774 andynelms@andersonnelms.com
v.
No Logo Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beverly Poole Baker +1 205 986 1022 +1 205 328 6000 beverly.baker@odnss.com
Space Veronica L Merritt +1 205 328 1900 +1 205 328 6000 veronica.merritt@odnss.com
Office Montgomery
Filed 2/6/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Lowndes
Terminated 10/10/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to the [15] Stipulation of Dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this cause is dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/10/2007. (furn: yg, hc, ag, sc)(term: PTC 02/20/2008 ; JT 03/31/2008)(Attachments: # (1) civil appeals checklist)(wcl, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
    NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re [15] Stipulation of Dismissal to reflect as filed on behalf of all parties. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (wcl, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/8/2007, Entered: 10/8/2007
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC.. (Merritt, Veronica) Modified on 10/9/2007 to reflect as filed on behalf of all parties (wcl, ).
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Court Filing
        ORDER denying [12] Motion to Quash, as further set out; directing that since plf failed to attend the deposition on 9/26/07 and did not provide the Court or defense counsel adequate time to address the motion to quash, the deposition shall be taken at defense counsel's office in Birmingham, Alabama or other location chosen by defense counsel. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/27/07. (djy, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007, Terminated: 9/27/2007 Motion to Quash
          MOTION to Quash Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion to Quash by Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-E)(Merritt, Veronica)
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007, Terminated: 9/27/2007 Motion to Quash
            MOTION to Quash by Nathaniel Rivers. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Nelms, Keith)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Response in Opposition
              RESPONSE in Opposition to plf's[12] MOTION to Quash by Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket Entry [13], erroneously docketed as a motion). (djy, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Court Filing
                ORDER denying [10] Motion to Extend Deadline, as further set out in order. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/9/2007. (wcl, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007, Terminated: 5/9/2007 for Extension of Deadline
                  MOTION for Extension of Deadline to Amend Pleadings by Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC.. (Merritt, Veronica)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Court Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Final Pretrial Conference for 2/20/2008 before Honorable Myron H. Thompson; Jury Trial set for 3/31/2008 before Honorable Myron H. Thompson; setting Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2007; setting Discovery due by 10/22/2007; setting Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2007; setting Mediation Notice due by 12/18/2007, as further set out in order. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/4/2007. (furn: yg, hc, ag, sc)(wcl, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baker, Beverly)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Court Filing
                        ORDER directing the parties file the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/27/2007. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/6/2007. (wcl, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
                          NOTICE of Correction re [4] Answer to Complaint to attach the correct main PDF document. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected main document to docket entry [4])(wcl, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC.. (Merritt, Veronica)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007
                              ANSWER to Complaint by Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC.. (Attachments: # (1) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement)(Merritt, Veronica) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2007 to attach the correct main PDF document (wcl, ).
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                ***Attorney Beverly Poole Baker for Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC. added pursuant to [4] Answer. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (wcl, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Return Receipt Card
                                  Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by K. Brown for Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC. served on 2/9/2007, answer due 3/1/2007. (sl, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Summons Issued
                                    Summons Issued as to Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC. mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint. (sl, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT against Arvinmeritor Sejong, LLC. (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113018.), filed by Nathaniel Rivers.(sl, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Jury Demand
                                        DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Nathaniel Rivers. (sl, )
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?