Mallory et al v. Dillard's, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-01003-MEF-CSC
District Judge Mark E. Fuller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Hollis Casey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BADHAM & BUCK LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Percy Badham, III +1 205 521 0036 +1 205 521 0037 pbadham@badhambuck.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of WILLIAM B WAHLHEIM , JR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick C. Cooper +1 205 254 1000 +1 205 254 1999 darceneaux@maynardcooper.com
Space Jessica S Grover +1 205 254 1000 jgrover@maynardcooper.com
Space Kemberli L Marks +1 205 254 1983 +1 205 254 1999 kmarks@maynardcooper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maynard, Cooper & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert W. Tapscott, Jr. +1 205 254 1000 +1 205 254 1999 rtapscott@maynardcooper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MORRIS HAYNES & HORNSBY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall S. Haynes +1 256 392 2000 +1 256 329 2015 rhaynes@mhhlaw.net
v.
Dillards Dillards, Defendant
Officially listed as "Dillard's , Inc."

Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Office Montgomery
Filed 11/14/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Montgomery
Terminated 2/25/2008
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 7:05cv305-TMP[USDC Northern District - Western Division]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that pursuant to [26] Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and expenses; that the clerk is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/25/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, ) Deadlines terminated: 06/05/2008 Pretrial Conference and 07/07/2008 Jury Trial
    LREF
    Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dillard's, Inc.. (Bostick, Brian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Court Filing
      PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT granting [24] MOTION for Entry of Judgment; that pursuant to the agreement of the parties, all claims by Patricia Mallory, Vaughan Thomas and Vanessa Jones against Defendant Dillard's Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and with each party bearing his, her or its own costs with respect to those claims; that pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b), the Court finds that there is no just reason for delaying the entry of final judgment on said claims, therefore, with respect to those claims and consistent with the settlement agreement by the parties, final judgment is ENTERED on the claims of Plaintiff Patricia Mallory, Vaughan Thomas and Vanessa Jones against Defendant Dillard's Inc.; that nothing in this order is intended to affect the claims of Plaintiff Hollis Casey, which claims remain pending; that the clerk is directed to enter this document on the civil docket sheet as a Partial Final Judgment with respect to the claims of Patricia Mallory, Vaughan Thomas and Vanessa Jones against Defendant Dillard's Inc., pursuant to Rule 58 of Fed.R.Civ.P.Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/5/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008
        STIPULATION of Dismissal CORRECTED by Dillard's, Inc.. (Bostick, Brian)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Terminated:
          Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment by Vanessa Jones, Dillard's, Inc., Patricia Mallory, Vaughn Thomas. See [24] Corrected Joint Stipulation of Dismissal for pdf document for this entry. (cc, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
            STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dillard's, Inc.. (Bostick, Brian)
              LREF
              Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 Court Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2008 before Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller, chambers A-300, US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; Jury Trial set for 7/7/2008 before Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller, in Montgomery, AL; setting Amended Pleadings due by 3/10/2007; setting Discovery due by 5/22/2008; setting dispositive Motions due by 3/10/2008; Mediation Notice due by 4/5/2008, as further set out in order. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/26/07. Furnished to YG, HC, & KG.(djy, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007
                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bostick, Brian)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [18] Motion for Admission of A. Craig Cleland Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/13/2007. (cc, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Filing Fee Received
                    Filing fee for [18] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice: $ 20.00, receipt number 4602001434 (cc, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007, Terminated: 12/13/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dillard's, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Timothy)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                        Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Dillard's, Inc.. (Palmer, Timothy)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                          Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Vaughn Thomas. (Marks, Kem)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                            Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Vanessa Jones. (Marks, Kem)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                              Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patricia Mallory. (Marks, Kem)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                                Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hollis Casey. (Marks, Kem)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007
                                  Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement as to Dillard's, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/30/2007. (cc, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007
                                    Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement as to plaintiffs Patricia Mallory, Hollis Casey, Vanessa Jones and Vaughn Thomas; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/30/2007. (cc, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Court Filing
                                      RULE 26(f) ORDER that Rule 26 Meeting Report is due by 12/19/2007. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/20/2007. (cc, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                        Case transferred in from Northern District of Alabama; Case Number 7:05cv305-TMP. Certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.Some of the pdf documents filed in Northern District were received in this office on a cd which is available in the Clerk's office. (Attachments: # (1) Docket Sheet)(cc, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Docket Annotation
                                          Order of Severance and Transfer entered USDC, Northern District of Alabama that the claims of plaintiffs Vaughn Thomas, Hollis Casey,Vanessa Jones, and Patricia Mallory are SEVERED and TRANSFERRED to the United StatesDistrict Court for the Middle District of Alabama. (cc, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 11/16/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                            ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint by Dillard's, Inc.(cc, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 11/16/2007 Amended Complaint
                                              THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dillard's, Inc. filed by Vanessa Jones, Patricia Mallory, Vaughn Thomas, Hollis Casey.(cc, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 11/16/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Dillard's, Inc.(cc, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 11/16/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dillard's, Inc.adding plaintiffs Vanessa Jones, Patricia Mallory, Vaughn Thomas, Hollis Casey.(cc, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 11/16/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Dillards, Inc.(cc, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 11/16/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dillards, Inc. with Jury Demand.(cc, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 11/16/2007 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT against Dillards, Inc. (cc, )
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?