USA v. Jordan
Criminal Case Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:07-cr-00285-MHT-TFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 23, 2017 at 2:43 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew O. Schiff +1 334 223 7280 +1 334 223 7135 andrew.schiff@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Tommy Jordan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of DEREK E YARBROUGH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Everett McRae Urech +1 334 598 4455 +1 334 598 2076 daleattyeu@graceba.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Montgomery
Filed 11/16/2007
County Montgomery
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES - NMT $250,000[*]; NMT 5Y; B; NMT 3Y SUP REL; G-LNS; VWPA; $100 SA
Count 2-27
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(2) and 182 FRAUD AND FALSE STATEMENTS/AIDING and ABETTING - NMT $250,000[*]; NMT 5Y; B; NMT 3Y SUP REL; G-LNS; VWPA; $2600 SA
Def Custody Status Released
Flags 27BH, AG, MHT-ClerkA
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008
            ORDER as to Tommy Jordan setting a Pretrial Conference for 12/19/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Terry F. Moorer. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 9/4/08. (ajr, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008
              ORDER granting [23] Motion to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Tommy Jordan (1) and adds as a condition of release that the defendant not engage in the business of tax preparation. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 8/26/2008. (ag, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008
                OPINION AND ORDER incorporating Ends of Justice as to Tommy Jordan (Time excluded from 9/22/2008 until 1/5/2009) granting [22] Second MOTION to Continue filed by Tommy Jordan and resetting Jury Selection & Trial now set for 9/22/08 to 1/5/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2FMJ before Honorable Myron H. Thompson. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 8/26/2008. (ag, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008, Terminated: 8/26/2008 Motion to Continue
                  Second MOTION to Continue by Tommy Jordan. (Urech, Everett)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
                    PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER as to Tommy Jordan: Jury Selection & Jury Trial (ETT 6 Days) set for 9/22/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2FMJ before Honorable Myron H. Thompson; Voir Dire due by 9/15/2008; Proposed Jury Instructions due by 9/15/2008; Motions in Limine due by 9/15/2008; Notice of Intent to Change Plea due by noon on 9/10/2008. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 8/4/2008. (ag, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Court Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Honorable Terry F. Moorer:Pretrial Conference as to Tommy Jordan held on 7/29/2008 (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time 11:03 - 11:06.) (jct, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008
                        Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Motion Hearing set for 7/29/08) as to Tommy Jordan pursuant to e-mail from YG. (ag, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008
                          RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Tommy Jordan re [15] Supplemental MOTION for Discovery Tax Return Information (Schiff, Andrew)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
                            ORDER as to Tommy Jordan re [15] Supplemental MOTION for Discovery Tax Return Information filed by Tommy Jordan: That the United States file a reply to the motion on or before 7/11/08; Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Terry F. Moorer, directing the clerk to provide a court reporter for this proceeding, if the defendant is in custody, the US Marshal shall arrange for the defendant's appearance at this proceeding. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 7/7/2008. (ag, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008
                              ORDER as to Tommy Jordan: Pretrial Conference now set for 7/28/08 at 11:00 a.m. is reset to 7/29/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Terry F. Moorer, if the defendant is in custody, the US Marshal shall arrange for the defendant's appearance at this proceeding. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 7/3/2008. (ag, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008, Terminated: 7/16/2008 Motion for Discovery
                                Supplemental MOTION for Discovery Tax Return Information by Tommy Jordan. (Urech, Everett)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008
                                  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Jury Selection 6/23) as to Tommy Jordan Set/Reset Hearings as to Tommy Jordan: Jury Selection set for 9/22/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2FMJ before Honorable Myron H. Thompson. (ag, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008
                                    ORDER as to Tommy Jordan granting [13] MOTION to Continue filed by Tommy Jordan and setting Pretrial Conference for 7/28/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Terry F. Moorer. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 5/16/2008. (ag, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008, Terminated: 5/16/2008 Motion to Continue
                                      MOTION to Continue by Tommy Jordan. (Urech, Everett)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
                                        OPINION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Tommy Jordan; Time excluded from 6/23/08 until 9/22/08; granting [11] MOTION to Continue trial filed by Tommy Jordan; Jury Trial set for 6/23/08 is RESET for 9/22/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2FMJ before Honorable Myron H. Thompson. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/2/08. (ajr, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008, Terminated: 5/2/2008 Motion to Continue
                                          MOTION to Continue by Tommy Jordan. (Urech, Everett)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Court Filing
                                            CJA 20 as to Tommy Jordan: Appointment of Attorney Everett McRae Urech for Tommy Jordan.. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/3/2008. (ag, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Court Filing
                                              ORDER ON ARRAIGNMENT incorporating ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Tommy Jordan (Time excluded from 4/3/2008 until 6/23/2008) setting Pretrial Conference for 5/19/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Terry F. Moorer; Jury Selection & Trial set for 6/23/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2FMJ before Honorable Myron H. Thompson; Proposed Jury Instructions due by 6/16/2008; Voir Dire due by 6/16/2008; Pretrial Motions due by 5/15/2008; Government discovery due on or before 4/3/08 with defendant's Discovery due by 4/10/2008. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/3/2008. (ag, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Court Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Terry F. Moorer :Initial Appearance as to Tommy Jordan held on 4/3/2008 ; Arraignment as to Tommy Jordan (1) Counts 1,2-27 held on 4/3/2008 ; Plea entered by Tommy Jordan (1) Not Guilty on counts 1, 2-27. (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time FTR: 11:11 - 11:39.) (ws, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                                                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Tommy Jordan (ws, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                                                    ORAL ORDER APPOINTING PANEL ATTORNEY Everett McRae Urech for Tommy Jordan. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/3/08. (ws, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                                                      Arrest of Tommy Jordan (ws, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER as to Tommy Jordan : Initial Appearance set for 4/3/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Terry F. Moorer. Arraignment set for 4/3/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Terry F. Moorer. If the defendant is in custody, the United States Marshal or the person having custody of the defendant shall produce the defendant for the proceeding. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/1/08. (ws )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008
                                                          INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Tommy Jordan pursuant to order entered in 07cm1234. (ajr, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Sealed Warrant Issued
                                                            Arrest WARRANT Issued as to Tommy Jordan. (ag, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Indictment -Sealed
                                                              INDICTMENT as to Tommy Jordan (1) count(s) 1, 2-27. (ag, ) Modified on 4/1/2008 (ws, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                Attorney update in case as to Tommy Jordan. Attorney Everett McRae Urech for Tommy Jordan added pursuant to Order in Cr Misc No 07cm1346. (ag, )
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?