Melton et al v. National Dairy Holdings, L.P. et al (CONSENT)
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00174-TFM
District Judge Terry F. Moorer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 11:26 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo DeWayne Melton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bobbie Shaw Crook +3346 718 062 Ext1 +1 334 677 2872 bcrook100@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggins Childs Quinn & Pantazis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Carroll Robertson +1 205 314 0534 +2541 254 254 1500 acr@wcqp.com
Space Temple DeAnna Trueblood +1 205 314 0514 +1 205 254 1500 tdt@wcqp.com
No Logo Henry Cody, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bobbie Shaw Crook +3346 718 062 Ext1 +1 334 677 2872 bcrook100@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggins Childs Quinn & Pantazis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Carroll Robertson +1 205 314 0534 +2541 254 254 1500 acr@wcqp.com
Space Temple DeAnna Trueblood +1 205 314 0514 +1 205 254 1500 tdt@wcqp.com
No Logo J. T. Brooks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bobbie Shaw Crook +3346 718 062 Ext1 +1 334 677 2872 bcrook100@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggins Childs Quinn & Pantazis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Carroll Robertson +1 205 314 0534 +2541 254 254 1500 acr@wcqp.com
Space Temple DeAnna Trueblood +1 205 314 0514 +1 205 254 1500 tdt@wcqp.com
No Logo Larry Amos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bobbie Shaw Crook +3346 718 062 Ext1 +1 334 677 2872 bcrook100@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggins Childs Quinn & Pantazis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Carroll Robertson +1 205 314 0534 +2541 254 254 1500 acr@wcqp.com
Space Temple DeAnna Trueblood +1 205 314 0514 +1 205 254 1500 tdt@wcqp.com
No Logo Pierre Harvey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bobbie Shaw Crook +3346 718 062 Ext1 +1 334 677 2872 bcrook100@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggins Childs Quinn & Pantazis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Carroll Robertson +1 205 314 0534 +2541 254 254 1500 acr@wcqp.com
Space Temple DeAnna Trueblood +1 205 314 0514 +1 205 254 1500 tdt@wcqp.com
v.
No Logo Dairy Fresh Of Alabama, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian R Bostick +1 205 328 1900 +1 205 328 6000 brian.bostick@odnss.com
Space Veronica L Merritt +1 205 328 1900 +1 205 328 6000 veronica.merritt@odnss.com
Space Timothy A. Palmer +1 615 254 1900 +1 615 254 1908 Tim.Palmer@ogletreedeakins.com
Space Sandra B Reiss +3286 328 328 6000 sandra.reiss@odnss.com
No Logo Nationaldairyholdings, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian R Bostick +1 205 328 1900 +1 205 328 6000 brian.bostick@odnss.com
Space Veronica L Merritt +1 205 328 1900 +1 205 328 6000 veronica.merritt@odnss.com
Space Timothy A. Palmer +1 615 254 1900 +1 615 254 1908 Tim.Palmer@ogletreedeakins.com
Space Sandra B Reiss +3286 328 328 6000 sandra.reiss@odnss.com
No Logo The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 991, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GARDNER MIDDLEBROOKS FLEMING GIBBONS & KITTRELL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Vance McCrary +1 251 433 8100 +1 251 433 8181 vmccrary@gmlegal.com
Space Mary Elizabeth Olsen +1 251 433 8100 +1 251 433 8181 molsen@gmlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Gardner Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Cecil Gardner +1 251 433 8100 +1 251 433 8181 cgardner@thegardnerfirm.com
Office Dothan
Filed 3/12/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Houston
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CONSENT
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
RESPONSE in Support re [46] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(c) filed by National Dairy Holdings, L.P., Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC. (Reiss, Sandra)
    LREF
    Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008
    RESPONSE in Opposition re [46] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(c) filed by Larry Amos, Henry Cody, J. T. Brooks, DeWayne Melton, Pierre Harvey. (Trueblood, Temple)
      LREF
      Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008
      ORDER re [46] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to FRCP 12(c), it is ORDERED that the Plfs shall file a response on or before 8/26/2008; Dft shall have until 9/2/2008 to file any reply they wish to file; The motion shall be taken under submission on that day for determination without oral argument, as further set out in order; Motion Submission Deadline set for 9/2/2008. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 8/5/2008. (wcl, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
        MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(c) by National Dairy Holdings, L.P., Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC. (Reiss, Sandra)
          LREF
          Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008
          ORDER denying as moot [43] Motion to Quash, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 8/1/08. (djy, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the [43] Response in Opposition to Rule 45 Subpoena and Motion to Quash should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 8/1/2008. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 7/25/2008. (wcl, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008, Terminated: 8/1/2008 Motion to Quash
              MOTION to Quash by J. B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc.. (Rodgers, Christopher)
                LREF
                Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
                AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 7/17/2008. (wcl, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008
                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [39] MOTION MOTION TO REQUIRE PLAINTIFFS TO REPLEAD THEIR COMPLAINT IN COMPLIANCE WITH FED. R. CIV. P. 10(b) re [1] Complaint filed by Larry Amos, Henry Cody, J. T. Brooks, DeWayne Melton, Pierre Harvey. (Trueblood, Temple)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
                    ORDERED that Plfs show cause on or before 7/9/2008 why this [39] Motion to Require Plfs to Replead Their Complaint should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 7/9/2008. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 7/1/2008. (wcl, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008
                      MOTION TO REQUIRE PLAINTIFFS TO REPLEAD THEIR COMPLAINT IN COMPLIANCE WITH FED. R. CIV. P. 10(b) re [1] Complaint by The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 991. (Olsen, Mary)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008
                        First Amended ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC.(Reiss, Sandra)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008
                          First Amended ANSWER to [1] Complaint by National Dairy Holdings, L.P..(Reiss, Sandra)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008
                            UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER setting Final Pretrial Conference for 10/2/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Terry F. Moorer; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/25/2009; Jury Selection set for 11/2/2009 at 10:00 AM in Dothan, Alabama before Honorable Terry F. Moorer; Jury Trial set for 11/2/2009 at 10:00 AM in Dothan, Alabama before Honorable Terry F. Moorer; setting Amended Pleadings for Plf due by 8/1/2008 and for Dft due by 9/1/2008; setting Discovery due by 8/2/2009; setting Dispositive Motions due by 7/2/2009; setting Mediation Notice due by 7/30/2009, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/25/2008. (furn: yg, hc, sl)(wcl, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008
                              ORDER granting [32] Motion for Leave to Amend the Answer of Dft, Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC; granting [33] Motion for Leave to Amend the Answer of Dft, National Dairy Holdings, L.P.. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/25/2008. (wcl, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008
                                NOTICE of Correction re [31] Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to attach a corrected PDF document to include the electronic signatures for all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry [31])(wcl, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008, Terminated: 6/25/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct [22] Answer to Complaint by National Dairy Holdings, L.P.. (Attachments: # (1) Tab A proposed Amended Answer)(Reiss, Sandra)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008, Terminated: 6/25/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct [21] Answer to Complaint by Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Tab A Proposed Amended Answer)(Reiss, Sandra)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008
                                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reiss, Sandra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2008 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the electronic signatures for all parties: # (1) main document) (wcl, ).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008
                                        ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2008. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/17/2008. (wcl, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Court Filing
                                          CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Larry Amos, Henry Cody, J. T. Brooks, DeWayne Melton, Pierre Harvey. (wcl, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Court Filing
                                            CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for National Dairy Holdings, L.P., Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC. (wcl, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Court Filing
                                              CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 991. (wcl, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Court Filing
                                                ORDER DIRECTING Counsel for the parties to execute and send to the Clerk, for receipt not later than 6/16/2008, either the attached form for consent to the Magistrate Judge's exercise of jurisdiction or the attached form for reassignment of this case to the District Judge. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/2/2008. (wcl, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008
                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 991. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (wcl, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008
                                                    Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 991 re [24] Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Olsen, Mary)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008
                                                      Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 991; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/23/2008. (Attachments: # (1) standing order & format)(djy, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008
                                                        ANSWER to [1] Complaint by The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 991.(Olsen, Mary)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                          ***Attorney Jesse Cecil Gardner and Michael Vance McCrary for The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 991 added pursuant to [23] answer (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (djy, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008
                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by National Dairy Holdings, L.P..(Reiss, Sandra)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008
                                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC.(Reiss, Sandra)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                ***Attorney Brian R. Bostick for National Dairy Holdings, L.P. and Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC added pursuant to answers [21] & [22] (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008
                                                                  Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC. (Reiss, Sandra)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008
                                                                    Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by National Dairy Holdings, L.P.. (Reiss, Sandra)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Beth Reiss on behalf of National Dairy Holdings, L.P., Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC (Reiss, Sandra)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008
                                                                        Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by J. T. Brooks re [11] Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Trueblood, Temple)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008
                                                                          Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Henry Cody re [11] Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Trueblood, Temple)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008
                                                                            Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Larry Amos re [11] Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Trueblood, Temple)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008
                                                                              Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Pierre Harvey re [11] Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Trueblood, Temple)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008
                                                                                Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by DeWayne Melton re [11] Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Trueblood, Temple)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; National Dairy Holdings, L.P. answer due 5/8/2008; Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC answer due 5/8/2008. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/31/2008. (wcl, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008
                                                                                    Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to DeWayne Melton, Pierre Harvey, Larry Amos, Henry Cody, J. T. Brooks; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(wcl, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008
                                                                                      Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to National Dairy Holdings, L.P., Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(wcl, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008
                                                                                        NOTICE of Correction re [8] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint to attach a corrected PDF document to include a certificate of service page. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry [8])(wcl, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008
                                                                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for National Dairy Holdings, L.P., Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (wcl, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint by National Dairy Holdings, L.P., Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC. (Merritt, Veronica) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2008 to attach a corrected PDF document to include a certificate of service page (wcl, ).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008
                                                                                              NOTICE of Error re [6] Return Receipt Card which is hereby STRICKEN as an erroneous docket entry. This was docketed in the wrong case number. (wcl, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008, Terminated: 3/28/2008 Return Receipt Card
                                                                                                (STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY-DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE NUMBER) Return Receipt Card showing service of Show Cause Order [40] signed by Alonzo Austin served on 3/26/2008. (wcl, ) Modified on 3/28/2008 (wcl, ).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008
                                                                                                  Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and complaint signed by L. Rockett for National Dairy Holdings, L.P. served on 3/19/2008, answer due 4/8/2008. (wcl, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                    ***Attorney Timothy A. Palmer for National Dairy Holdings, L.P. and Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC added pursuant to [8] Motion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (wcl, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008
                                                                                                      Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and complaint signed by Judy Chaps for The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 991 served on 3/19/2008, answer due 4/8/2008. (wcl, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Return Receipt Card
                                                                                                        Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and complaint signed by The Corporation Company for Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC served on 3/18/2008, answer due 4/7/2008. (wcl, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to National Dairy Holdings, L.P., Dairy Fresh of Alabama, LLC, The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 991 and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint. (wcl, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Larry Amos, Henry Cody, J. T. Brooks, DeWayne Melton, Pierre Harvey. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (wcl, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602004292.), filed by Larry Amos, Henry Cody, J. T. Brooks, DeWayne Melton, Pierre Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Receipt)(wcl, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Larry Amos, Henry Cody, J. T. Brooks, DeWayne Melton, Pierre Harvey. (NO PDF ATTACHED-SEE DOCKET ENTRY [1]) (wcl, )
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?