WILSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00089-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOHN L. WILSON, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Doris Susan Finnerman +1 202 307 0300 +1 202 305 7643 dorie.finnerman@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/23/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/4/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated March 5, 2001 affirmed [18-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [19-1] appeal by JOHN L. WILSON CAFC NUMBER: 00-5132 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000, Terminated: 3/5/2001 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by JOHN L. WILSON. Copy to Defendant, Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT #050369. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000 Court Filing
          ORDER granting defendant's [8-1] motion to Dismiss. No costs. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000
            Case closed (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
              MOTION by JOHN L. WILSON (Service : 7/10/00 ) for production of documents. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/27/00 (reply to response to motion included) (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                REPLY by JOHN L. WILSON to response to [12-1] motion to Compel Defendant to amend Plaintiff's administrative record. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/10/00 (motion for production of documents included) (JT) Modified on 07/21/2000
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                  REPLY by JOHN L. WILSON to [13-1] motion reply by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/7/00 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 Terminated:
                    MOTION by JOHN L. WILSON (Service : 6/28/00 ) to Dismiss Defendant's motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for judgment upon the administrative record. Response due: 7/31/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/26/00 ) to [12-1] motion to Compel Defendant to amend Plaintiff's administrative record. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/10/00 (reply to response to motion included) (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                        REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss, [8-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/26/00 (response to motion included) (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/19/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                          MOTION by JOHN L. WILSON (Service : 6/12/00 ) to Compel Defendant to amend Plaintiff's administrative record. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 6/29/00 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                            COUNTER STATEMENTS filed by JOHN L. WILSON. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/8/00 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for judgment upon the administrative record. Plaintiff's Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 6/13/00, [8-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record reset to 6/13/00. signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000, Terminated: 6/5/2000 Terminated:
                                MOTION by JOHN L. WILSON (Service : 5/25/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for judgment upon the administrative record [until June 13, 2000]. Response due: 6/12/00 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000, Terminated: 8/4/2000 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 5/8/00 ) to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or, in the alternative, for Judgment upon the administrative record filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 6/8/00 (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 Administrative Record
                                    Administrative record, consisting of one volume, filed by USA [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of filing the administrative record by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 5/8/00 (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000 Order
                                        ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 5/8/00 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000, Terminated: 4/19/2000 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 4/18/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. (to May 8, 2000) (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Doris Susan Finnerman. Service : 3/10/00 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049139. Answer due on 4/24/00. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?