ELLINGSON LUMBER CO. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00091-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ELLINGSON LUMBER CO., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saltman and Stevens PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Irving Saltman +1 202 452 2140 +1 202 775 8217 asaltman@saltmanandstevens.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/24/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $157000
Nature of Suit -
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/13/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
DUPLICATE ENTRY FOR STATISTICAL USE ONLY. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001
    Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by ELLINGSON LUMBER CO. and USA. Filed by leave of the judge. Original stipulation is located in the file for case 99-448C. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (AB)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001
      Case closed (AB)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service : 4/5/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000
          NOTICE by ELLINGSON LUMBER CO. of related cases: (99-448 C and 99-869 C). (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Court Filing
            Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000
              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049141. Answer due on 4/24/00. (FE)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 47 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?