MCSHERRY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00109-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PATRICK MCSHERRY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by williamcassara.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Emil Cassara +1 706 860 5769 bill@williamcassara.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Paul Schroeder +1 202 305 7788 +1 202 305 3291 richard.schroeder@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/2/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 11/23/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. Service: 11/23/2005.(mb2, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 36 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Paul Schroeder for USA Service: 2/4/04.(hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 35 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [34-1] motion to Stay Proceedings pending a decision by the C.A.F.C. in "Gabriel Martinez v. United States", No. 99-5163 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001, Terminated: 12/4/2001 Terminated:
          MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service: 11/27/01) to Stay Proceedings pending a decision by the C.A.F.C. in "Gabriel Martinez v. United States", No. 99-5163 . Response due: 12/14/01 (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 33 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time to file the response to the Motion to Dismiss . Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 11/7/01 ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 32 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001, Terminated: 9/19/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
              MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service: 9/1/01) to Extend Time to file the response to the Motion to Dismiss until 11/7/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 31 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to motion to dismiss Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 9/7/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 30 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001, Terminated: 7/31/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                  MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service: 7/1/01) to Extend Time to file response to motion to dismiss , (until September 7, 2001). [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 29 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss. reset to 7/9/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 28 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001, Terminated: 6/27/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                      MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service: 6/2/01) to Extend Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss until 7/7/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 6/19/01. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 27 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 6/7/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001, Terminated: 5/11/2001 Terminated:
                          MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service: 5/1/01) to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss (until 6/7/01). Response due: 5/18/01 (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 5/7/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001, Terminated: 4/17/2001 Terminated:
                              MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service: 3/28/01) to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss (until 05/07/01). Response due: 4/16/01. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service: 3/5/01) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss , (until April 7, 2001). [by leave of the Judge] (FE) Modified on 03/16/2001
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                  MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service: 2/5/01) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss , (until March 7, 2001). [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 2/7/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 20 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001, Terminated: 1/24/2001 Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                      MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service: 1/6/01) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss , (until February 7, 2000 [sic.]), filed by leave of the Judge. due: (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 1/7/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000, Terminated: 12/13/2000 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service : 12/5/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [until January 7, 2000]. Response due: 12/22/00 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 12/7/00 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000, Terminated: 11/20/2000 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service : 11/3/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [until December 7, 2000]. Response due: 11/20/00 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 11/7/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000, Terminated: 10/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service : 10/3/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [until November 7, 2000]. Response due: 10/20/00 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 10/10/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000, Terminated: 9/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service: 9/1/00) to Extend Time to file response to motion to dismiss , (until October 7, 2000). (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 9/7/00 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/3/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000, Terminated: 8/9/2000 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by PATRICK MCSHERRY (Service : 8/1/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [until September 7, 2000]. Response due: 8/18/00 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 Administrative Record
                                                            Administrative record filed by USA. (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File the administrative record. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000, Terminated: 7/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/5/00 ) for Leave to File the administrative record. Response due: 7/24/00 (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 7/5/00 ) to Dismiss. Response due: 8/7/00 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 7/3/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000, Terminated: 5/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/27/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until July 1, 2000]. Response due: 5/15/00 (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/27/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joseph Trautwein. Service : 3/22/00 (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 Court Filing
                                                                          Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000
                                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049176. Answer due on 5/1/00. (FE)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?