PATRIARCH, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00119-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Patriarch, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 3/7/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/15/2001
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
199-cv-00965-JFM None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Court Filing
    Decision of Sr. Judge James F. Merow SEE 99-965 C; Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Consolidate this case with case Nos. 99-965 C & 00-48 C. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000 Set/Clear Flags
          Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 99-cv-965 for further proceedings. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000, Terminated: 3/9/2000 Terminated:
            MOTION by PATRIARCH, INC. (Service: 3/7/00) to Consolidate Cases with case Nos.: 99-965 C & 00-48 C Response due: 3/24/00. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 Notice of Related Cases
              NOTICE by PATRIARCH, INC. of related cases: (99-965 C & 00-48 C). (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049212. Answer due on 5/8/00. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 40 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?