TERRY EAGLE LIMITED, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00148-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Glamorgan Coal Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo TERRY EAGLE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/23/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $211000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 9/22/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Joint Status Report
    JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/25/2005.(mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/25/2005. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Joint Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 01/21/05.(mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER issued to parties who have filed claims for refund of excise taxes on coal productions. Attorneys asked to respond no later than 2/21/05. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (eph, )
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Joint Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 1/30/2004.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel will advise the court whether they have resolved this case, or whether they intend to file stipulations of dismissal. If settlement discussions are continuing, they should advise the court of the status of these negotiations and the likelihood that they will be successful in the near future. The parties may file a Joint Status Report no later than 1/30/2004, or they may file independently. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Court Filing
                Notice of reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001
                  AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by USA : amends [4-1] answer by USA. Service: 8/30/01. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Leave to file the separately submitted amended answer (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by USA to response to [10-1] motion for Leave to file the separately submitted amended answer. Service: 9/21/01. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Response to Motion
                        RESPONSE by TERRY EAGLE LIMITED (Service: 9/17/01) to [10-1] motion for Leave to file the separately submitted amended answer. Reply due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 8/30/01) for Leave to file the separately submitted amended answer (with status report). Response due: 9/17/01. (LTD) Modified on 08/30/2001
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001
                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/30/01. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 Response
                              RESPONSE by USA to [8-1] report by GLAMORGAN COAL, TERRY EAGLE LIMITED. Service: 7/11/01. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Court Filing
                                STATUS REPORT by TERRY EAGLE LIMITED and GLAMORGAN COAL. Service: 7/3/01. [Response to motion to assign this case to Judge Hodges and Response to suggestions for further proceedings] (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 6/19/01) to assign this case to Judge Hodges . Response due: 7/6/01. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Status Report
                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER re: The parties request for the Court to suspend proceedings until final resolution of the "Cyprus Amax Coal Co." litigation is granted [the request is in the "JPSR" page 2] (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                        JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 Answer
                                          ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 5/22/00 ( JPSR due 7/10/00 ) (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/24/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service : 4/21/00 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/28/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                              Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000
                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049287. Answer due on 5/22/00. (FE)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 167 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?