PINNAVAIA, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00189-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JOSEPH C. PINNAVAIA, Plaintiff
No Logo Matthew D Pinnavaia, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 4/5/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/6/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated December 28, 2000 affirmed [4-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 5/25/2000 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [5-1] appeal by MATTHEW D. PINNAVAIA, JOSEPH C. PINNAVAIA. CAFC NUMBER: 00-5068 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000, Terminated: 12/28/2000 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by JOSEPH C. PINNAVAIA and MATTHEW D. PINNAVAIA. Copy to Sr. Judge James F. Merow, C.A.F.C. and defendant. (FE) Modified on 04/19/2000
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed as untimely pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec 2501. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000
          Case closed (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Court Filing
            UNPUBLISHED DECISION dismissing [2-1] complaint, granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000, Terminated: 4/5/2000 Complaint
              COMPLAINT (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000, Terminated: 4/5/2000 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                MOTION by JOSEPH C. PINNAVAIA, MATTHEW D. PINNAVAIA (Service: 4/5/00) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000
                  CASE assigned to Sr. Judge James F. Merow. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 199 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?