ASTA ENGINEERING v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00214-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ASTA ENGINEERING, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sam Z. Gdanski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sam Zalman Gdanski +1 845 362 4800 +1 845 362 4700 samgdanski@gdanski.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/18/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/31/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with no costs assessed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000 Court Filing
    ORDER directing that the complaint be dismissed, with no costs assessed. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 Published DecisionCourt Filing
        PUBLISHED DECISION (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Response to Order to Show Cause
          Response to order to show cause by ASTA ENGINEERING. Service: 5/2/00 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service: 5/2/00. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 Response to Order to Show Cause
              Response to order to show cause filed by USA. Service: 5/2/00 (titled "Memorandum of law in support of the Court's subject matter jurisdiction") (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Court's Show Cause Order, granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Show Cause Order. Reset Response to Show Cause due: 5/2/00 for USA, 5/3/00 for ASTA. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                  Notice of reassignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow . Copy to parties. (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000, Terminated: 4/27/2000 Terminated:
                    MOTION by ASTA ENGINEERING (Service : 4/24/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's Show Cause Order [until May 3, 2000]. Response due: 5/11/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/25/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the Show Cause Order [until May 2, 2000]. Response due: 5/12/00 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 4/25/00 for USA, for ASTA ENGINEERING. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000, Terminated: 5/31/2000 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                          MOTION by ASTA ENGINEERING (Service: 4/18/00) for Preliminary Injunction Response due: 5/2/00. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Court Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000
                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049452. Answer due on 6/19/00. (FE)
                                LREF

                                Space Space

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?