EVANS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00229-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LARRY NMN EVANS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert T. Summa +1 314 726 7980
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Robert Feniger +1 202 307 3390 +1 202 305 2118 david.feniger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/24/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/6/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(b). (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b). ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER Show Cause Motion Filing deadline to 2/28/01, for the plaintiff and Plaintiff shall file opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss by 2/28/01 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service : 12/6/00 ) to Dismiss. Response due: 1/22/01 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Transcript
            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 6, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER set Defendant's motion to dismiss filing deadline to 12/6/00 and set Plaintiff's response deadline to 1/22/01. ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Status Conference
                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 12/6/00 ) (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference at 2:00 p.m. on 11/6/00. ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Supplemental Statement by USA. Service: 10/5/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Memorandum
                      MEMORANDUM by USA re: [4-1] order. Service: 10/5/00 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer and supplemental statement deadline to 10/5/00. ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000, Terminated: 9/18/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/14/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until October 5, 2000]. Response due: 10/2/00 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 9/21/00. ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000, Terminated: 8/18/2000 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/15/00) to Extend Time to file a response to the complaint , (until September 21, 2000). Response due: 9/1/00. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Robert Feniger. Service : 7/13/00 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 8/22/00. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000, Terminated: 6/1/2000 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/30/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until August 22, 2000]. Response due: 6/16/00 (JT) Modified on 05/31/2000
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER re: Standard Special Procedures [revised May 9, 2000] (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Denise Darcel Duprau. Service: 5/11/00. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Edward J. Damich. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049489. Answer due on 6/23/00. (FE)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?