PACIFIC COAST COAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00236-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PACIFIC COAST COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/26/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 4
Reopened 8/18/2008
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '05-5115'[], '05-5177'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag REOPEN
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 CAFC Mandate Reversing
MANDATE of CAFC reversing [30] Judgment, and Remanding back to the U.S. Court of Federal Claims. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
    NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Harlan Becker. Service: 10/18/2005.(hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 37 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Terminated:
      CAFC Case Number 05-5177 for [35] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005, Terminated: 8/18/2008 CAFC Case Number
        CAFC Case Number 05-5115 for [33] Notice of Appeal filed by PACIFIC COAST COAL COMPANY. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 35 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Terminated: Court Filing
          NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by USA. Copies to the Judge, opposing party and CAFC.(hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 33 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005, Terminated: 8/18/2008 Notice of Appeal
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by PACIFIC COAST COAL COMPANY. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 062795. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 34 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [32] Motion to Correct the Record. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005, Terminated: 4/26/2005 Terminated:
                MOTION to Correct to Record, filed by USA. Service: 4/21/2005. Response due by 5/9/2005. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005
                  CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated March 4, 2005, forwarded to Steven Harlan Becker, also certified copy of judgment forwarded to Tommy Thompson, Tax Division, of the Department of Justice. See letter in file. (bre,)
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005
                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $150,912.00, as set forth on the attached Exhibit A. This judgment shall be paid without interest. The parties shall bear their own costs, including any possible attorneys' fees or other expenses of this litigation. (lld, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Stipulation
                      STIPULATION for entry of judgment [captioned stipulated judgment] filed by all parties. (dls)
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                        STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/25/2005. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Joint Status Report
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 01/21/05.(mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 26 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER issued to parties who have filed claims for refund of excise taxes on coal productions. Attorneys asked to respond no later than 2/21/05. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (eph, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 25 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Joint Status Report
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 1/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 24 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel will advise the court whether they have resolved this case, or whether they intend to file stipulations of dismissal. If settlement discussions are continuing, they should advise the court of the status of these negotiations and the likelihood that they will be successful in the near future. The parties may file a Joint Status Report no later than 1/30/2004, or they may file independently. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                  NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the 6/24/02 hearing by PACIFIC COAST COAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response
                                    SUR-REPLY by PACIFIC COAST COAL to reply filed 1/7/02 by USA in 99-268T. Service: 2/25/02. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
                                      PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING RECENT DEVELOPMENTS TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION AND TO FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by PACIFIC COAST COAL (Service: 1/4/02) for Leave to file a brief in response to Defendant's additional brief . Response due: 1/22/02. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by PACIFIC COAST COAL Service: 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                            RESPONSE by PACIFIC COAST COAL (Service: 10/22/01 ) to cross motion filed in 99-268T by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by PACIFIC COAST COAL. Service: 8/31/01. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001, Terminated: 3/4/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                MOTION by PACIFIC COAST COAL (Service: 8/31/01) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by PACIFIC COAST COAL (Answer due 9/4/01 ) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 8/16/01 (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [13-2] motion for Leave to file an amended answer ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/01) for Reconsideration of [11-4] order , and for Leave to file an amended answer . Response due: 9/4/01. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001
                                                        Deadline updated; Response to [13-1] motion for Reconsideration of [11-4] order and [13-2] motion for Leave to file an amended answer reset to 9/4/01 . (LTD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Status Report
                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/15/01. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Status Report
                                                                STATUS REPORT and SUGGESTIONS FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by USA. Service: 6/15/01. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Status Report
                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/11/00. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER re: we have suspended most of the related coal cases until Defendant decides whether to apply for Supreme Court review. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                      JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Answer
                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 6/23/00 (JPSR due 8/10/00) (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 5/11/00. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                            NOTICE by PACIFIC COAST COAL of related cases: (97-68 T, 98-200 T, 98-557 T, 99-267 T, 99-268 T, 99-298 T, 99-299 T, 99-300 T, 99-301 T, 99-302 T, 00-216 T, 00-218 T). (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049506. Answer due on 6/26/00. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 219 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?