BLACK DIAMOND v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00241-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Black Diamond Company, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "BLACK DIAMOND COMPANY, THE"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Roger Thiessen +1 540 628 5151
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/28/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/5/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the 6/24/02 hearing by BLACK DIAMOND. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT)
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER re: This case was dismissed on 6/5/00, pursuant to Rule 41(a), the Clerk is asked to return the filings received on 8/31/01 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Court Filing
          STATUS REPORT by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/11/00. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER re: we have suspended most of the related coal cases until Defendant decides whether to apply for Supreme Court review. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BLACK DIAMOND. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A). Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Terminated Case
                Case closed (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 5/11/00. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                    Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000 Notice of Related Cases
                      NOTICE by BLACK DIAMOND of related case: (97-68 T). (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049532. Answer due on 6/27/00. (FE)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 86 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?