RAPOCA ENERGY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00242-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RAPOCA ENERGY COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PENN STUART & ESKRIDGE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wade W. Massie +1 276 623 4409 +1 276 628 5621 wmassie@pennstuart.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/28/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 7/20/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
    ***Attorney Wade Wallihan Massie for RAPOCA ENERGY COMPANY added. Attorney Eric Roger Thiessen terminated. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 33 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Terminated:
      Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Wade W. Massie in place of Eric Roger Thiessen, filed by RAPOCA ENERGY COMPANY. Service: 6/24/2005. (mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 32 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Joint Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT by RAPOCA ENERGY COMPANY. Service: 2/24/2005.(mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 31 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/25/2005. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 30 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Joint Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/21/05.(mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 29 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER issued to parties who have filed claims for refund of excise taxes on coal productions. Attorneys asked to respond no later than 2/21/05. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (eph, )
                LREF
                Blank 28 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Joint Status Report
                JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 1/30/2004.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                  STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel will advise the court whether they have resolved this case, or whether they intend to file stipulations of dismissal. If settlement discussions are continuing, they should advise the court of the status of these negotiations and the likelihood that they will be successful in the near future. The parties may file a Joint Status Report no later than 1/30/2004, or they may file independently. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 26 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                    NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the 6/24/02 hearing by RAPOCA ENERGY. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT) Modified on 06/25/2002
                      LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response
                      SUR-REPLY by RAPOCA ENERGY to reply filed 1/7/02 by USA in 99-268T. Service: 2/25/02. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 24 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
                        PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING RECENT DEVELOPMENTS TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION AND TO FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                          MOTION by RAPOCA ENERGY (Service: 1/4/02) for Leave to file a brief in response to Defendant's additional brief . Response due: 1/22/02. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by RAPOCA ENERGY Service: 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                              RESPONSE by RAPOCA ENERGY (Service: 10/22/01 ) to cross motion filed in 99-268T by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by RAPOCA ENERGY. Service: 8/31/01. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001, Terminated: 7/20/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  MOTION by RAPOCA ENERGY (Service: 8/31/01) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Amended Complaint
                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by RAPOCA ENERGY (Answer due 9/4/01 ) amending [1-1] complaint Service: 8/16/01 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [16-2] motion for Leave to file amended answer ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/01) for Reconsideration of [14-4] order , and for Leave to file amended answer . Response due: 9/4/01. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Status Report
                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/15/01. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001 Status Report
                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/18/01. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Status Report
                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/11/00. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER re: we have suspended most of the related coal cases until Defendant decides whether to apply for Supreme Court review. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000
                                                      JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to file "JPSR". Reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 8/25/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000, Terminated: 8/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                          JOINT MOTION by USA (Service: 8/11/00) to Extend Time to file "JPSR" , (until August 25, 2000). (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/28/2000 Answer
                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 6/27/00 (JPSR due 8/14/00) (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by RAPOCA ENERGY (Answer due 6/27/00 ) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 6/2/00 (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 5/11/00. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                    NOTICE by RAPOCA ENERGY of related case: (97-68 T). (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049533. Answer due on 6/27/00. (FE)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?