CONCEPT MINING, INC., et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00244-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CONCEPT MINING, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. William Gust +1 540 983 9354
No Logo RIDGE LAND COMPANY, THE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. William Gust +1 540 983 9354
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/28/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 7/23/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall dismiss with prejudice the claims for taxable quarters ending 3/31/1999 through 12/31/1999 for each plaintiff. The parties will bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Stipulation
      STIPULATION for Partial Dismissal with Prejudice by CONCEPT MINING, INC., RIDGE LAND COMPANY, THE, USA. (jat, )
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
        NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the 6/24/02 hearing by CONCEPT MINING, INC., RIDGE LAND COMPANY. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response
          SUR-REPLY by CONCEPT MINING, INC. to reply filed 1/7/02 by USA in 99-268T. Service: 2/25/02. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
            PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING RECENT DEVELOPMENTS TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION AND TO FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
              MOTION by CONCEPT MINING, INC. (Service: 1/4/02) for Leave to file a brief in response to Defendant's additional brief . Response due: 1/22/02. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by CONCEPT MINING, INC. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                  RESPONSE by CONCEPT MINING, INC. (Service: 10/11/01) to cross-motion filed in 00-244T by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 Court Filing
                    REPLY by USA to [15-1] response by RIDGE LAND COMPANY and CONCEPT MINING, INC., by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/31/01. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CONCEPT MINING, INC. Service: 8/31/01. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001, Terminated: 7/23/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                        MOTION by CONCEPT MINING, INC. (Service: 8/31/01) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001 Response
                          RESPONSE by CONCEPT MINING, INC., RIDGE LAND COMPANY to [12-1] report by USA. Service: 8/28/01 (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Amended Complaint
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by CONCEPT MINING, INC., RIDGE LAND COMPANY (Answer due 9/4/01 ) amending [1-1] complaint Service: 8/16/01 (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                              ORDER regarding further procedures ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Status Report
                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/15/01. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001 Status Report
                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/18/01. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Status Report
                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/11/00. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER re: we have suspended most of the related coal cases until Defendant decides whether to apply for Supreme Court review. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 08/18/2000
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/28/2000 Answer
                                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 6/27/00 (JPSR due 8/14/00) (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/15/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service : 5/12/00 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000 Notice of Related Cases
                                                    NOTICE by CONCEPT MINING, INC., RIDGE LAND COMPANY of related cases: (97-68 T, 97-310 T, 97-311 T, 97-317 T, 97-521 T, 97-522 T). (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049535. Answer due on 6/27/00. (FE)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 183 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?