MID-VOL LEASING, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00247-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EVERGREEN MINING CO., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo MID-VOL LEASING, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo Old Ben Coal Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/28/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $5631000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 11/22/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Joint Status Report
    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 1/30/2004.(jcp, )
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER: We ask that the Clerk of Court dismiss without prejudice the claims for the following taxable quarters for pltf Mid-Vol Leasing, Inc.: 1996 - 2nd, 3rd and 4th quarter; 1997 - all quarters; 1998 - all quarters; 1999 - all quarters and 2000 - 1st quarter. For pltf Old Ben Coal Company dismiss the following quarters without prejudice: 1995 - 4th quarter; 1996 - all quarters; and 1997 - 1st quarter. The parties will bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
        STIPULATION for Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice by all parties. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel will advise the court whether they have resolved this case, or whether they intend to file stipulations of dismissal. If settlement discussions are continuing, they should advise the court of the status of these negotiations and the likelihood that they will be successful in the near future. The parties may file a Joint Status Report no later than 1/30/2004, or they may file independently. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
            NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the June 24, 2002 hearing by MID-VOL LEASING, OLD BEN COAL COMPANY, EVERGREEN MINING CO. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response
              SUR-REPLY by MID-VOL LEASING to reply filed 1/7/02 by USA in 99-268T. Service: 2/25/02. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
                PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING RECENT DEVELOPMENTS TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION AND TO FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                  MOTION by MID-VOL LEASING (Service: 1/4/02) for Leave to file a brief in response to Defendant's additional brief . Response due: 1/22/02. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by MID-VOL LEASING Service: 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                      RESPONSE by MID-VOL LEASING (Service: 10/22/01 ) to cross motion filed in 99-268T by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/11/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                        (REPLY) RESPONSE by USA to [19-1] response by MID-VOL LEASING. Service: 9/5/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 09/12/2001
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Response
                          RESPONSE by MID-VOL LEASING to [13-1] report by USA. Service: 8/30/01 (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by MID-VOL LEASING. Service: 8/31/01. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001, Terminated: 11/22/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                              MOTION by MID-VOL LEASING (Service: 8/31/01) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Amended Complaint
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by MID-VOL LEASING, OLD BEN COAL COMPANY, EVERGREEN MINING CO. (Answer due 9/4/01 ) amending [1-1] complaint Service: 8/16/01 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [14-2] motion for Leave to file an amended answer ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/01) for Reconsideration of [12-4] order , and for Leave to file an amended answer Response due: 9/4/01. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001
                                      Deadline updated; Response to [14-1] motion for Reconsideration of [12-4] order and [14-2] motion for Leave to file an amended answer reset to 9/4/01 . (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Response
                                        RESPONSE (report on the nature and extent of possible IRS audits) by USA pursuant to [12-4] order. Service: 8/15/01 (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Response
                                              REPLY by USA to [9-1] report by EVERGREEN MINING CO., OLD BEN COAL COMPANY, MID-VOL LEASING. Service: 7/11/01. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
                                                STATUS REPORT by MID-VOL LEASING, OLD BEN COAL COMPANY and EVERGREEN MINING CO. . Service: 7/3/01. [Response to defendant's Suggestions for further Proceedings] (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001 Status Report
                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/18/01. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/11/00. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER re: we have suspended most of the related coal cases until Defendant decides whether to apply for Supreme Court review. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                        JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/28/2000 Answer
                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 6/27/00 (JPSR due 8/14/00) (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service : 5/16/00. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049548. Answer due on 6/27/00. (FE)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 205 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?