LEECO, INC., et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00248-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LEECO, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo MCCOY ELKHORN COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/28/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 6/21/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank 32 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Joint Status Report
    JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/25/2005.(mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 31 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/25/2005. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Joint Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 01/21/05.(mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER issued to parties who have filed claims for refund of excise taxes on coal productions. Attorneys asked to respond no later than 2/21/05. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (eph, )
            LREF
            Blank 28 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Joint Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 1/30/2004.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel will advise the court whether they have resolved this case, or whether they intend to file stipulations for dismissal. If settlement discussions are continuing, they should advise the court of the status of these negotiations and the likelihood that they will be successful in the near future. They parties may file a Joint Status Report no later than 1/30/2004, or they may file indepenently. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 26 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the 6/24/02 hearing by LEECO, INC., MCCOY ELKHORN COAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 25 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response
                  SUR-REPLY by LEECO, INC. to reply filed 1/7/02 by USA in 99-268T. Service: 2/26/02. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 24 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
                    PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING RECENT DEVELOPMENTS TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION AND TO FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                      MOTION by LEECO, INC. (Service: 1/4/02) for Leave to file a brief in response to Defendant's additional brief . Response due: 1/22/02. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by LEECO, INC. Service: 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                          RESPONSE by LEECO, INC. (Service: 10/22/01 ) to cross motion filed in 99-268T by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 20 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 Court Filing
                            REPLY by USA to [19-1] response by MCCOY ELKHORN COAL and LEECO, INC., by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/5/01. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 19 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Response
                              RESPONSE by LEECO, INC., MCCOY ELKHORN COAL to [13-1] report by USA. Service: 8/30/01 (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 18 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by LEECO, INC. Service: 8/31/01. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001, Terminated: 6/21/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  MOTION by LEECO, INC. (Service: 8/31/01) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Amended Complaint
                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by LEECO, INC., MCCOY ELKHORN COAL (Answer due 9/4/01 ) amending [1-1] complaint Service: 8/16/01 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [14-2] motion for Leave to file an amended answer ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/01) for Reconsideration of [12-4] order , and for Leave to file an amended answer . Response due: 9/4/01. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001
                                          Deadline updated; Response to [14-1] motion for Reconsideration of [12-4] order and [14-2] motion for Leave to file an amended answer reset to 9/4/01 . (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Response
                                            RESPONSE (report on the nature and extent of possible IRS audits) by USA pursuant to [12-4] order. Service: 8/15/01 (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Response
                                                  REPLY by USA to [9-1] report by MCCOY ELKHORN COAL, LEECO, INC. . Service: 7/11/01. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
                                                    STATUS REPORT by LEECO, INC. and MCCOY ELKHORN COAL. Service: 7/3/01. [Response to Defendant's suggestions for further Proceedings and Request for Pretrial Conference] (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001 Status Report
                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/18/01. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Status Report
                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/11/00. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER re: we have suspended most of the related coal cases until Defendant decides whether to apply for Supreme Court review. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/28/2000 Answer
                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 6/27/00 (JPSR due 8/14/00) (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/15/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service : 5/12/00 (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049549. Answer due on 6/27/00. (FE)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?