CHRISTENSEN, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00355-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo All Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo EARL WESTERCOM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo PHILIP CLARK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo RICHARD GLORIOSO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 6/22/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Stipulation
County
Terminated 5/31/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLASS, CLOSED
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 87 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT,dated May 31,2005, forwarded to Barry Paul Steinberg. See letter in file. (bre,)
    LREF
    Blank 86 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs recover of and from the United States the sum of $7,280,000.00. This amount shall be paid to plaintiffs' attorney, Barry P. Steinberg, for subsequent distribution to plaintiffs as required by the parties' settlement agreement. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 85 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Court Filing
      ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment in accordance with the Stipulation filed May 25, 2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 84 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Stipulation
        STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by all parties. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 83 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Court Filing
          PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION approving the parties' proposed settlement agreement. The Clerk is authorized to enter judgment in accord with the agreement and the stipulation for Entry of Judgment annexed to that agreement. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for correction of a class member's name, filed January 14, 2005 is granted. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/22/2005. (vp1, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Transcript
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/7/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                LREF
                Blank 82 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Supplemental Brief
                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in support of Final Approval of Settlement by USA. Service: 02/01/05.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 81 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Supplemental Brief
                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support of Final Approval of Settlement Agreement by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN. Service: 01/26/05.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 80 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Status Report
                    Plaintiff's STATUS REPORT Service: 1/14/05.(eph, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 79 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Terminated:
                      Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION for Substitution and Motion for Correction of a Class Member's name. by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN. Service: 1/14/05.Response due by 1/31/2005 (eph, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 78 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER re: the parties' proposed Settlement Agreement.Class counsel shall file a status report incorporating each Class Member Settlement Participation Form by 1/18/05; Each party may submit a supplemental brief in support of final approval of the Settlement Agreement by 1/31/05; a hearing on the fairness of the parties' proposed Settlement Agreement shall be held on 2/7/05 at 9:30 a.m.; and if a class member chooses to appear in person to present his or her views at the hearing, the member shall submit to the court, defendant's counsel, and class counsel an Individual Class Member's Notice of Support or Objection and Request to Appear and Present Views by 1/3/05. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jat, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 77 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Terminated:
                          JOINT MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, Approval of Notice of Class of Settlement and Scheduling of Hearing, by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO, USA, EARL WESTERCOM.Service: 9/10/2004. Response due by 9/27/2004.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 76 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [75] Motion for Extension of Time. Agency Decision due by 11/23/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 75 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004, Terminated: 6/23/2004 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Extension of Time until November 23, 2004 to file agency findings by USA.Service: 6/17/04. Response due by 7/6/2004 (jat, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 74 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Order Remanding to AgencyCourt Filing
                                PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER DENYING plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on remedies; GRANTING defendant's motion for remand insofar as this case is REMANDED for six months to the Secretary of the Air Force for further proceedings consistent with the specific directions set out in this opinion; DENYING defendant's motion for remand insofar as defendant sought a remand without directions; and directing the Secretary of the Air Force or an appropriate official or officer acting on his behalf to file findings of fact with respect to each class member respecting whom monetary relief is proposed to be denied based on the harmless-error test. Agency Findings due by 9/23/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. Certified copy forwarded to the Secretary of the Air Force.(dls)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow : Motion Hearing held on 1/21/04 re [65] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO, EARL WESTERCOM, [69] Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on Motion,. (rs1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 73 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 1/21/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004
                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/26/2004. (vp1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 72 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Response
                                        REPLY in Support of Dft's MOTION for Remand to the Secretary of the Air Force, filed by USA. Service: 1/7/2004.(jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 71 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Description not available
                                          OPPOSITION to Dft's MOTION for Remand and REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [65] Pltfs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Remedies filed by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO, EARL WESTERCOM. Reply due by 1/4/2004. Service: 12/8/03.(jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 70 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Response
                                            RESPONSE to Dft's Proposed Findings of Undisputed Facts filed by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO, EARL WESTERCOM. Service: 12/8/03.(jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 69 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [65] Pltf's MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Remedies and Dft's Motion for Remand: Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 68 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE of Filing Original Signed Declaration of Howard G. Clayton by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/19/03.(jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [66] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Telefaxed Signature of Mr. Howard Clayton. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003, Terminated: 11/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Telefaxed Signature of Mr. Howard Clayton Upon His Declaration With "Dft's Proposed Filing of Undisputed Facts" by USA.Service: 11/14/03. Response due by 12/1/2003. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Remedies by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO, EARL WESTERCOM.Service: 10/8/03. Response due by 11/10/2003 (jat, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO, EARL WESTERCOM. Service: 10/8/03.(jat, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Order Lifting StayCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SCHEDULING ORDER:1) The stay of proceedings in this case is lifted. 2) The parties' proposed schedule for briefing remedial issues is adopted, as follows: a) Pltfs shall submit their Motion and brief on or before 10/15/2003. b) Dft shall submit its response and any Cross Motion on or before 11/14/2003. c) Pltfs shall submit their Reply, if any, on or before 12/15/2003. d) Dft shall submit its Reply, if any, on or before 1/7/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 9/17/03.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER AND ORDER STAYING CASE:The stay of proceedings in this case is continued until 10/20/2003, at which time the stay will expire unless extended by the Court. Failing a settlement, the parties are directed to submit a Joint Status Report to this Court on or before 10/27/2003. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Charles Lettow. Judge Edward J. Damich no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 8/4/03.(jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER denying as moot [31-1] motion for Leave to conduct limited discovery (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER continuing STAY in this case and ordering parties to file a joint status report no later than 5 days after the U.S. Court of Appeals decision in Christian v. United States, No. 97-165 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Status Report
                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Status Report
                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO, EARL WESTERCOM, USA Service: 7/26/02 (HW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [51-1] motion for Leave to file telefaxed signature. The Court ORDERS that plaintiffs' counsel file an original signature by Notice of Compliance deadline of 8/2/02 . The Court direct entry of summary judgment in favor of the Plaintiffs as to liability in this case. The Court imposes a Stay until 7 days after the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit decides whether to hear an interlocutory appeal in CHRISTIAN v. US, (No. 97-165) ( signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002, Terminated: 7/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/02) for Leave to file telefaxed signature . Response due: 8/12/02. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Transcript
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 24, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Reid Prouty Service :7/9/02 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER imposing a stay on all proceedings in this case for purposes of settlement discussions. Set Joint Status Report deadline to 7/24/02. ( signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Status Report
                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 6/24/02 for [31-1] motion for Leave to conduct limited discovery (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                            REPLY by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO, EARL WESTERCOM to response to [31-1] motion for Leave to conduct limited discovery. Service: 5/10/02. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002
                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/6/02) to [31-1] motion for Leave to conduct limited discovery. Reply due: 5/20/02. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                STANDARD SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part, denying in part [41-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file response to motion for leave to conduct discovery Response to [31-1] motion for Leave to conduct limited discovery due 5/7/02 (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN (Service: 4/26/02) to [41-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file response to motion for leave to conduct discovery. Reply due: 5/10/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002, Terminated: 4/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/02 ) to Extend Time within which to file response to motion for leave to conduct discovery , (until June 28, 2002). Response due: 5/13/02 (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [38-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Motion for Leaave to conduct Discovery Response to [31-1] motion for Leave to conduct limited discovery due 4/29/02 (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER denying [35-1] motion for Reconsideration of [34-2] order (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002, Terminated: 4/15/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/2/02) to Extend Time to respond to the Motion for Leaave to conduct Discovery until 4/29/02. Response due: 4/19/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                              RESPONSE by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO and EARL WESTERCOM (Service: 3/23/02) to [35-1] motion for Reconsideration of [34-2] order. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER Response to [35-1] motion for Reconsideration of [34-2] order reset to 3/26/02 (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002, Terminated: 4/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/13/02) for Reconsideration of [34-2] order . (LTD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [32-1] motion to Stay Proceedings, granting [32-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to conduct discovery Response to [31-1] motion for Leave to conduct limited discovery due 4/5/02 (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO, EARL WESTERCOM (Service: 2/22/02) to [32-1] motion to Stay Proceedings, [32-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to conduct discovery. Reply due: 3/8/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002, Terminated: 3/4/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 2/21/02) to Stay Proceedings or, in the alternative, to Extend Time to respond to motion to conduct discovery , (until April 5, 2002). Response due: 3/11/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002, Terminated: 11/12/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                          MOTION by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN (Service: 2/14/02) for Leave to conduct limited discovery . Response due: 3/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Notice of reassignment to Judge Edward J. Damich . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of additional Plaintiffs by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, et al. Service: 10/9/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT and INITIAL NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFF'S by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO and EARL WESTERCOM. Service: 8/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; Status Report deadline to 10/10/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Plaintiff's Status Report deadline to 08/22/01 , and Plaintiff's status report due on 10/10/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO, EARL WESTERCOM and USA. Service: 4/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        PUBLISHED DECISION denying [21-1] cross motion, denying [17-1] motion to Dismiss, denying [17-2] motion for Summary Judgment, granting [3-1] motion to Certify Class and defendant's motion to appoint Barry P. Steinberg and William A. Aileo as counsel to trepresent the interests of the class is hereby allowed Joint Status Report deadline to 4/30/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to Motion for Summary Judgment Response to [21-1] cross motion reset to 4/27/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001, Terminated: 3/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 3/26/01) to Extend Time to file response to Motion for Summary Judgment (until 4/27/01). Response due: 4/12/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 3/26/01) to Extend Time to file response to motion for summary judgment and a reply to response to motion for summary judgment , (until April 27, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO, EARL WESTERCOM (Service: 3/5/01) and RESPONSE to [17-1] motion to Dismiss by USA, [17-2] motion for Summary Judgment by USA. Response due: 4/5/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO and EARL WESTERCOM. Service: 3/5/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO and EARL WESTERCOM. Service: 3/5/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [21-1] cross motion reset to 4/5/01 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/8/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/8/01) to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: The Clerk of the Court shall file the defendant's proposed findings of uncontroverted fact and motion to dismiss or for summary judgmnet received on 2/2/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, PHILIP CLARK, RICHARD GLORIOSO and EARL WESTERCOM to response to [3-1] motion to Certify Class. Service: 2/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to the complaint Answer deadline to 2/8/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001, Terminated: 2/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/31/01) to Extend Time to file response to the complaint , (until February 8, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/31/01) to [3-1] motion to Certify Class. Reply due: 2/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 2/1/01 and Response to [3-1] motion to Certify Class reset to 2/1/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 1/10/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until January 31, 2001). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and motion to certify a class reset Answer deadline to 1/11/01 , and Response to [3-1] motion to Certify Class reset to 1/11/01 . ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000, Terminated: 10/23/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 10/20/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and motion to certify a class (to January 11, 2001). (DS) Modified on 10/26/2000
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and motion to certify a class reset Answer deadline to 11/1/00 , and Response to [3-1] motion to Certify Class reset to 11/1/00 . ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000, Terminated: 8/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/31/00) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and motion to certify a class (until November 1, 2000). (FE) Modified on 10/26/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lee Joshua Freedman Service : 7/13/00 (JT) Modified on 10/26/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: two rules that will apply to the litigation of this suit in addition to the Rules of the United States Court of Federal Claims. ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 10/26/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN, et al. to Certify Class . (Copies served on defendant attached to complaint.) Response due: 7/7/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #049843. Answer due on 8/21/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?