GPU NUCLEAR, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00440-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gpu Nuclear, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Brooks Crawford +1 202 305 9640 +1 202 307 2503 kevin.crawford@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/26/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 3/31/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (204) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 193 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Court Filing
ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Memorandum noting the defects received 4/17/2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lg1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 191 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004
    STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. and USA. (Bessette, Paul) Modified on 4/1/2004 (dw1).
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Terminated Case - Public
      Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
        LREF
        Legal Document 192 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER to counsel with instructions regarding electronic filings for chambers. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 190 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Court Filing
          ORDER to counsel with instructions regarding electronic filings for chambers. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 189 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A Status Conference shall be held on Friday, 4/2/2004 11:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Christine O.C. Miller, to discuss pltf's motion for voluntary dismissal or to amend the stay, as well as the other pending motions. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 188 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
              NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 187 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The necessary agreement by both judges being present, to promote docket efficiency and the efficient administration of justice, pursuant to RCFC 40.1(b), it is hereby ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to Judge Christine O.C. Miller for all further proceedings. Judge Lynn J. Bush no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 186 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                    ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [179] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 185 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Facsimile Number by USA. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 184 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER re: all filings in this case relating to issues of consolidation shall be captioned solely in the name of this case and shall show the name of the presiding judge in this case. A courtesy copy of any such filing relating to issues of consolidation shall be provided to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jat, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 183 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                          REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [179] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate, filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 182 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [181] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [179] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Consideration of Its Motion for Consolidation, until 9/3/03. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 181 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003, Terminated: 9/10/2003 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [180] Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 180 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                OPPOSITION to [179] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by GPU NUCLEAR, INC., Filed by Leave of the Judge. Reply due by 9/12/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                    Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 179 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                      SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 178 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 41(a)Court Filing
                                        ORDER denying [170] Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss - Rule 41(a), granting [170] Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (hw1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 177 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Order dated 4/23/03 by The United States.Service: 5/1/03. Response due by 5/19/2003 (hw1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 176 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                            ORDER RETURNING supplemental motion for summary judgment and proposed findings of uncontroverted fact, etc. received 4/17/03. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (hw1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 174 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [166] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by 50 pages. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (hw1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 171 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                RESPONSE re [131] Cross Motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance rate (together with a separate appendix) filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/28/2003. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003
                                                  RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/11/03.(hw1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/15/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [147] Response to Motion to Dismiss,until 4/16/03, by The United States. Service: 4/11/03. (vro, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 175 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 172 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                        REPLY to Response to [137] Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims relating to its TMI-1 nuclear facility for lack of standing, filed by The United States.Service: 4/16/03. (lrd)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 173 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [167] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to the Motion to Dismiss. Reply to the Motion to Dismiss due 4/16/2003. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (lrd)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 169 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION to Strike portions of plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance of spent nuclear fuel by The United States.Service: 4/11/03 by hand. Response due by 4/25/2003 (hw1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 166 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 30 pages by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/28/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 170 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003, Terminated: 5/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION to Stay the case by GPU NUCLEAR, INC.Service: 4/10/03. Response due by 4/28/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 170 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003, Terminated: 5/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a), without prejudice, (or, in the alternative), by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. Service: 4/10/03. Response due by 5/12/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 165 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Attorney Brad Flagg in place of Alex Tomaszczuk by GPU NUCLEAR, INC.. Service: 4/3/03. (dw1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                      ***Attorney Arnold Bradley Fagg for GPU NUCLEAR, INC. added. Attorney Alexander D. Tomaszczuk terminated. (dls, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 164 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 163 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 162 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003
                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [64-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 161 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003
                                                                              Response by USA to [133-1] proposed findings by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 160 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [159-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/10/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/27/03. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [150-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file its reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for lack of stadings Reply to Response to Motion due 4/11/03 for [137-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Relating to its TMI-1 Nuclear facility for lack of Standing (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [152-1] motion for Leave to file response to motion for leave to place filings under seal temporarily, denying [142-1] motion for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003, Terminated: 2/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 2/14/03) for Leave to file response to motion for leave to place filings under seal temporarily . Response due: 3/3/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 150 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003, Terminated: 2/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/6/03 ) to Extend Time within which to file its reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for lack of stadings ,(until April 11, 2003). due: 2/24/03 (VO) Modified on 02/13/2003
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER - see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                          RESPONSE by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 1/21/03) to [137-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Relating to its TMI-1 Nuclear facility for lack of Standing. Reply due: 2/7/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 1/15/03) to [143-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion and reply to the motion for partial summary judgment. (LTD)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [143-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion and reply to the motion for partial summary judgment Defendant's reply to the motion to dismiss takings claim due 1/30/03 , Defendant's reply to Plaintiffs' response to the Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste brief due 3/11/03 , Defendant's reply to [71-1] motion for partial summary judgment due 3/28/03 , and Defendant's reply and response to cross-motions regarding the reate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance is due 4/11/03 (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003, Terminated: 1/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion and reply to the motion for partial summary judgment until ? Response due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service : 12/20/02 ) for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily . Response due: 1/6/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      REPLY by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. to response to [124-1] motion for the government to acknowledge its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract . Service: 1/6/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 140 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [135-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion for summary judgment Response to [124-1] motion for the government to acknowledge its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract due 12/19/02 (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [127-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion for summary judment by 12/18/02 ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [126-1] motion for Leave to File Missing Appendix Table of Contents (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 12/19/02 ) to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Relating to its TMI-1 Nuclear facility for lack of Standing , (together with separate appendix FILED UNDER SEAL). Two of two events within one document. Response due: 1/20/03 (HW) Modified on 12/27/2002
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/19/02 ) to [124-1] motion for the government to acknowledge its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract, (together with separate appendix FILED UNDER SEAL). Reply due: 1/6/03. One of two events within document. (HW) Modified on 12/27/2002
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [123-2] order. Service: 12/19/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002, Terminated: 12/20/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 12/18/02) to Extend Time to respond to the motion for summary judgment until 12/19/02. Response due: 1/6/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Response by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. to [65-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/13/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. Service: 12/13/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                          Response by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. to [70-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/13/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            CROSS MOTION, with appendix, by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 12/13/02) and RESPONSE to [71-1] motion for partial summary judgment by USA. Response due: 1/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [125-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, with appendix, by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 12/13/02) to [64-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 12/30/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/13/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [131-1] cross motion due 1/14/02 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002, Terminated: 12/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 12/16/02) to Extend Time to respond to the motion for summary judment until 12/18/02. Response due: 1/2/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002, Terminated: 12/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service : 12/16/02 ) for Leave to File Missing Appendix Table of Contents. Response due: 1/2/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002, Terminated: 12/17/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 12/13/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability DEEMED a Renewed MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 11/8/02) for the government to acknowledge its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 12/16/02 (also includes a status report) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. [renewed motion partial summary judgment on liability included]i, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/8/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: (1) granting in part, denying in part [119-1] motion requesting an order setting 11/25/02 as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to motion for summary judgment ; (2) Defendant shall file its reply by 1/10/03; (3) Plaintiff's status report and renewed request for partial summary judgment on liability shall be deemed as plaintiff's status report and renewed motion for the government to acknowledeg its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract, etc.; (5) shall file response to plaintiff's renewed motion, etc., by 12/16/02; (6) in the event the government challanges plaintiff's standing to bring suit, defendant shall also file its dispositive motion in that regard by 12/16/02; and (7) Response to [71-1] motion for partial summary judgment reset to 12/16/02, [64-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment reset to 12/16/02 ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [120-1] motion for Leave to correct certificate of service (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 11/12/02) to [119-1] motion requesting an order setting 11/25/02 as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 11/29/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002, Terminated: 11/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 11/8/02) for Leave to correct certificate of service relating to the motion requesting an order setting 11/25/02, as the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the summary judgment motions. Response due: 11/25/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002, Terminated: 11/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/24/02 ) requesting an order setting 11/25/02 as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to motion for summary judgment . Response due: 11/12/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 113 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 111 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 108 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 107 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 106 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 105 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 07/03/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER,Re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/3/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir in Judge diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying the motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6). (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion to extend time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See Case No. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying aas moot [72-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 1/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to file response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment until 1/25/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by USA for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Response due: 1/17/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/28/01 (DS) Modified on 12/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [66-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [67-1] motion for a status conference and staying Plaintiff's response to the dispositive motions (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001, Terminated: 12/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 12/14/01) for a status conference . Response due: 1/2/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 12/20/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD) Modified on 11/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. See 98-126 C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [41-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: proposed stipulated order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [42-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting Palintiff's Motion for leave to file copies of response to the transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service is due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [43-1] motion for Leave to file motion that the utility plaintiff's have filed with the discovery Judge (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001, Terminated: 10/15/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file motion that the utility plaintiff's have filed with the discovery Judge , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kevin Brooks Crawford. Service: 10/5/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [38-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan is to be filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: The parties shall file a STATUS REPORT 30 days after the coonclusion of discovery (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. to [28-2] order. Reply due by 9/14/01. Service: 8/31/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [28-2] order. Response: 8/31/01. Service: 8/20/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION (Service: 7/9/01) for Leave to file proposed order concerning liability in SPENT NUCLEAR FUEL cases . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION for an order for coordinated discovery . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing judge, denying [7-1] motion to Stay Defendant shall show cause by 8/20/01, plaintiff shall respond by 8/31/01 and defendant shall reply by 9/14/01 and the motion for entry of protective order is DENIED as moot (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001, Terminated: 8/7/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 7/13/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing judge . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/10 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 6/14/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [12-1] Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is designated as managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [12-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961 (Filed with separate Appendix) Service: 2/16/01 (FE) Modified on 02/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 1/30/01) to [12-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961 Reply due: 2/8/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to the motion to reassign cases., granting [19-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Defendant's reply to plaintiffs' response to motion to reassign" (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file a copy of "Defendant's reply to plaintiffs' response to motion to reassign" Response due: 3/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001, Terminated: 2/22/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to the motion to reassign cases. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 1/29/01) to [12-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. Reply due: 2/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases" (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001, Terminated: 1/31/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 1/30/01) for Leave to file a copy of the "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases" . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              See 30-1 Response to motion filed January 29, 2001, in 98-483C Florida Power & Light Company. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 3/31/2004 Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/8/01) to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961 . Response due: 1/25/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases involving breaches of the standard contract ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 1/12/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) for Leave to file a copy of motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases involving breaches of the standard contract Response due: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. (Service: 11/9/00 ) to [7-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 11/27/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 10/23/00 ) to Stay [until 21 days after the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit issues it mandates in (99-5096 and 99-5138). Response due: 11/9/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 10/25/00 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000, Terminated: 9/25/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/22/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to October 25, 2000). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 8/31/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. . Service: 8/30/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by GPU NUCLEAR, INC. of related cases: (99-447 C, 98-621 C, 98-154 C, 98-485 C, 98-483 C, 98-486 C, 98-474 C, 98-488 C, 98-614 C, 98-126 C, 98-484 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050044. Answer due on 9/25/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 239 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?