CHISHOLM COAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00457-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHISHOLM COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HOWE, ANDERSON, STEYER, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Lou Smith +1 202 296 5680 +1 202 331 8049 mlsmith@haspc.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/31/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 12/3/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
    NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the 6/24/02 hearing by CHISHOLM COAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response
      SUR-REPLY by CHISHOLM COAL to reply filed 1/7/02 by USA in 99-268T. Service: 2/25/02. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
        PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING RECENT DEVELOPMENTS TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION AND TO FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
          MOTION by CHISHOLM COAL (Service: 1/4/02) for Leave to file a brief in response to Defendant's additional brief Response due: 1/22/02 (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Notice of Change of Address
            NOTICE of change of address by Mary Lou Smith (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by CHISHOLM COAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                RESPONSE by CHISHOLM COAL (Service: 10/22/01) to cross-motion filed in 99-268T by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CHISHOLM COAL. Service: 8/31/01. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001, Terminated: 12/3/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                    MOTION by CHISHOLM COAL (Service: 8/31/01) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Amended Complaint
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by CHISHOLM COAL (Answer due 9/4/01 ) amending [1-1] complaint Service: 8/16/01 (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [16-2] motion for Leave to file amended answer ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/01) for Reconsideration of [14-4] order , and for Leave to file amended answer . Response due: 9/4/01. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001
                            Deadline updated; Response to [16-1] motion for Reconsideration of [14-4] order and [16-2] motion for Leave to file amended answer reset to 9/4/01 . (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/15/01. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                    RESPONSE by CHISHOLM COAL (Service: 7/3/01) to [10-1] motion for transfer of this case to Judge Hodges. Reply due: 7/16/01. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 Court Filing
                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 6/19/01) for transfer of this case to Judge Hodges . Response due: 7/6/01. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Status Report
                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER re: this case will remain suspended until 30 days after the U.S. Supreme Court issues a final decision in Cyprus Amax Coal Co. et al. v. United States. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                              JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's discovery requests. Reset Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's discovery requests to 10/25/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Answer
                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/29/00 ( JPSR due 11/16/00 ) (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000, Terminated: 9/29/2000 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by CHISHOLM COAL (Service : 9/28/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's discovery requests [30 days]. Response due: 10/16/00 (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER returning to Plaintiff for correction of defects, their motion for approval of a stipulated extension of time. (Not signed by attorney of record/Copies missing/Judge's name on filing) ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service : 8/16/00. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                          Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050097. Answer due on 9/29/00. (FE)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?