SOUTHERN MINERALS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00467-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SOUTHERN MINERALS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis Jeffrey Whittlesey +1 202 659 6928 +1 202 659 1559 dwhittlesey@dickinsonwright.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/4/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $1354000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 4
Reopened 8/18/2008
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '05-5122'[], '05-5123'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag REOPEN
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 CAFC Mandate Reversing
MANDATE of CAFC reversing [34] Judgment, and Remanding case back to United States Court of Federal Claims. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 05-5122 for [37] Notice of Appeal filed by SOUTHERN MINERALS, INC. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Terminated:
      CAFC Case Number 05-5123 for [38] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by USA.(hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Terminated:
        NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005, Terminated: 8/18/2008 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by SOUTHERN MINERALS, INC. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 062821. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 35 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005
            CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated March 8, 2005, forwarded to Dennis Jeffery Whittlesey, also certified copy of judgment forwarded to Tommy Thompson, Tax Division of the Department of Justice. See letter in file. (bre,)
              LREF
              Blank 36 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct
              MOTION to Correct the Record filed by USA.Service: 3/10/2005. Response due by 3/28/2005. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $507,033.00. This judgment shall be paid without interest. All parties shall bear their own costs, including any possible attorneys' fees or other expenses of this litigation. (lld, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Stipulation
                  STIPULATION for entry of judgment (captioned Stipulated Judgment) filed by all parties. (dls )
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER: re: STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal with prejudice. Response due by 1/31/2005 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
                      STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal with prejudice by all parties. Service: 01/21/05.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 30 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Joint Status Report
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 01/21/05.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 29 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER issued to parties who have filed claims for refund of excise taxes on coal productions. Attorneys asked to respond no later than 2/21/05. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (eph, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Joint Status Report
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 1/30/2004.(jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 27 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER: If the stipulated sum covers less than all the quarters involved in pltf's litigation, we suggest a partial dismissal. If either party objects to this procedure, counsel should notify the court no later than 2/4/2004. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 26 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Terminated:
                                JOINT STIPULATION and MOTION for Suspension of Proceedings by SOUTHERN MINERALS, INC., USA. Response due by 2/9/2004.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel will advise the court whether they have resolved this case, or whether they intend to file stipulations of dismissal. If settlement discussions are continuing, they should advise the court of the status of these negotiations and the likelihood that they will be successful in the near future. The parties may file a Joint Status Report no later than 1/30/2004, or they may file independently. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                    NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the 6/24/02 hearing by SOUTHERN MINERALS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response
                                      SUR-REPLY by SOUTHERN MINERALS to reply filed 1/7/02 by USA in 99-268T. Service: 2/25/02. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
                                        PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING RECENT DEVELOPMENTS TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION AND TO FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by SOUTHERN MINERALS (Service: 1/4/02) for Leave to file a brief in response to Defendant's additional brief . Response due: 1/22/02. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by SOUTHERN MINERALS Service: 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                              RESPONSE by SOUTHERN MINERALS (Service: 10/22/01 ) to cross motion filed in 99-268T by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by SOUTHERN MINERALS. Service: 8/31/01. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001, Terminated: 3/4/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                  MOTION by SOUTHERN MINERALS (Service: 8/31/01) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by SOUTHERN MINERALS (Answer due 9/4/01 ) amending [1-1] complaint Service: 8/16/01 (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [14-2] motion for Leave to file an amended answer ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/01) for Reconsideration of [12-4] order , and for Leave to file an amended answer . Response due: 9/4/01. (LTD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001
                                                          Deadline updated; Response to [14-1] motion for Reconsideration of [12-4] order and [14-2] motion for Leave to file an amended answer reset to 9/4/01 . (LTD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Response
                                                            RESPONSE (Report on the nature and extent of possible IRS audits) by USA pursuant to [12-4] order. Service: 8/15/01 (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Status Report
                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER re: The parties request to stay proceedings until after the resolution of the Cyprus Amax Coal Co. case is granted (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                      JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Answer
                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 10/3/00 ( JPSR due 11/20/00 ) (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to answer Defendant's discovery. Reset Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's discovery requests to 11/9/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000, Terminated: 9/25/2000 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by SOUTHERN MINERALS (Service : 9/25/00 ) to Extend Time to answer Defendant's discovery [until November 9, 2000]. Response due: 10/12/00 (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service : 8/16/00. (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000
                                                                                NOTICE by SOUTHERN MINERALS of related cases: (97-68 T, 97-310 T, 97-311 T, 97-317 T, 97-521 T, 97-522 T, 00-244 T) (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000
                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050137. Answer due on 10/3/00. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?