HARSCO CORPORATION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00514-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Harsco Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Quigley +1 202 626 3593 +1 202 639 9355 michaelquigley@whitecase.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Loring Squires george.l.squires@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/25/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $55000000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 1/31/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 115 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by HARSCO CORPORATION, USA. Complaint and counterclaim dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (jat, )
    LREF
    Blank 114 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Order Cancelling Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
    ORDER: The status conference by telephone scheduled for 7/21/2004 was cancelled. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
      LREF
      Blank 113 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/21/2004 03:00 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jat, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Status Conference held on 6-23-04. (lmc)
          LREF
          Blank 112 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The next Status Conference is set for Wednesday, 6/23/2004 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Status Conference held on 5-5-04. (lmc)
              LREF
              Blank 111 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The next Status Conference is set for Wednesday, 5/5/2004 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Status Conference held on 4-1-04. (lmc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 110 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The next Status Conference Thursday, 4/1/2004 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Status Conference held on 2-6-04. (lmc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 109 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The Status Conference by telephone previously set for 1/28/2004, is rescheduled to Friday, 2/6/2004 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 108 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The next Status Conference shall be held by telephone on Wednesday, 1/28/2004 03:00 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Status Conference held on 12-17-03. (lmc)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Status Conference held on 11-12-03. (lmc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 107 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:The next Status Conference shall be held on Wednesday, 12/17/2003 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 106 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/12/2003 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (hw1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Status Conference held on 9-30-03. (lmc)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 105 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Terminated:
                                    MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order (Discovery 10/20/03; Exchange Trial Exhibits 10/27/03; Final day to file motions in limine 11/10/03) by HARSCO CORPORATION.Service: 9/26/03. Response due by 10/14/2003 (jat, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 104 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Supplemental BriefCourt Filing
                                      SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION Supporting Harsco's Counter Statement of Facts, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/16/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Status Conference held on 9-10-03. (lmc)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 103 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Pltf's Second Request for Production of Documents, until 10/15/03, by USA.Service: 9/15/03. Response due by 10/2/2003. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 102 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:The next Status Conference shall be held by telephone on Tuesday, 9/30/2003 03:00 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 101 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [100] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltf's Second Request for Production of Documents, until 9/15/03. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 100 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003, Terminated: 8/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltf's Second Request for Production of Documents, until 9/15/03, by USA.Service: 8/15/03. Response due by 9/2/2003.(jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 16, 2003 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [97] Dft's Unopposed Motion to Revise the Scheduling Order of June 19, 2003. Discovery due (final day to file motions to compel) by 9/19/2003. Motion(s) in Limine due by 10/10/2003. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/10/2003 03:00 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003, Terminated: 7/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION to Revise [77] Scheduling Order of June 19, 2003 by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/18/03. Response due by 8/4/2003. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER: For the reasons discussed in Court, [41] Dft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:A Status Conference by telephone shall be held on Wednesday, 9/10/2003 03:00 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003
                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/21/2003. (vp1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [93] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Pltf's Second Set of Requests for Admissions, Third Set of Interrogatories, and Second Request for Production of Documents, until 8/16/03. Response due by 8/16/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003, Terminated: 7/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltf's Second Set of Requests for Admissions, Third Set of Interrogatories, and Second Request for Production of Documents, until 8/16/03, by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/8/03. Response due by 7/25/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying [55] Pltf's Motion to Strike Certain Statements and Materials Offered in Support of Dft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Order on Motion to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [74] Pltf's Motion to Supplement Record in Support of Harsco Corp's Opposition to DOJ's Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental Pleading. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [41] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2003 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [62] Dft's Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental Pleading (Amend it answer, counterclaim, and offsets). Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                          RESPONSE/OPPOSITION to [74] Pltf's MOTION to Supplement Record in Support of Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental Pleading filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 7/14/2003. Service: 6/27/03.(jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Response
                                                                            RESPONSE to [54] Plaintiff's Counter-Statement of Facts filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/20/03.(jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [83] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Counter-Statement of Facts. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [84] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery due by 7/18/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003, Terminated: 6/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery, (until July 18, 2003), by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/20/03. (dw1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003, Terminated: 6/25/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Response to Plaintiff's Counter Statement of Facts by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge.Service: 6/20/03. Response due by 7/7/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                      REPLY to Response/Opposition to Motion re: [55] Motion to Strike Certain Statements and Materials Offered in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by HARSCO CORPORATION. Service: 6/20/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Response
                                                                                        REPLY to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                          RESPONSES to Plaintiff's Counter-Statement of Facts filed by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 6/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [76] Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [75] Motion for Extension of Time to revise the scheduling order filed May 23, 2003. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/18/2003. Motion(s) in limine due by 9/9/2003. Defendant's Reply due by 6/18/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  REPLY Brief in Support of [41] Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Short-Bed, Drop-Side Cargo Truck Models: M923A2 and M925A2. filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003, Terminated: 6/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Its Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact by UNITED STATES.Service: 06/18/03. Response due by 7/7/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 6/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend Schedule : (1) defendant's reply to response to motion for partial summary judgment by 6/18/03; (2) Discovery by 7/18/03; (3) motions in limine by 9/9/03 by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/11/03. Response due by 6/30/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 7/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) re: response to motion for leave to file second supplemental pleading by HARSCO CORPORATION.Service: 6/11/03. Response due by 6/30/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response re [62] MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Pleading filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/3/03 by hand. Corrected Copy (hw1, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [70] reply to motion for leave to file second supplemental pleading Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (hw1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 71 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to [55] Motion to Strike Certain Statements and Materials Offered in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 6/25/2003. Service: 06/11/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 70 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003, Terminated: 6/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Correct Defective Filing by Replacement by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/3/03 by hand. Response due by 6/17/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [62] MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Pleading filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/2/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [62] MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Pleading filed by HARSCO CORPORATION, by leave of the Judge. Reply due by 6/2/2003. Service: 5/19/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [66] Motion for Extension of Time to revise scheduling order. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 6/11/2003. Discovery due by 7/11/2003. Motion(s) in limine due by 9/2/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/26/2003, Terminated: 5/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend Schedule: (1) Defendant's reply to response to motion for partial summary judgment and response to motion to strike by 6/11/03; (2) Discovery cut-off (final day to file motions to compel) by 7/11/03; and (3) Final day for motions in limine by 9/2/03. by UNITED STATES.Service: 5/16/03. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [62] MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Pleading, (until May 19, 2003), by HARSCO CORPORATION, by leave of the Judge.Service: 5/6/03. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion(s) due by 8/19/2003. Defendant's Reply due by 5/28/2003. Discovery due by 6/27/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend scheduling order, by HARSCO CORPORATION. Service: 4/8/03.Response due 4/25/2003. (FILED WITH JOINT STATUS REPORT). (lrd)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003, Terminated: 7/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Pleading by The United States.Service: 4/4/03. Response due by 4/21/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [59] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [59] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response, (until 5/7/03), Response due by 5/7/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [57] Motion for Leave to File reply to Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Proposed Finding of Uncontroverted Fact. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lrd).
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003, Terminated: 4/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Motion to Strike, until 5/7/03, by The United States. Service: 3/24/03. Response due 4/10/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [56] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to the motion for summary judgment. Reply to the [41] Motion for Summary Judgment due 5/7/2003.Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003, Terminated: 4/1/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File a reply to plaintiff's response to defendant's proposed findings of uncontroverted fact filed by The United States. Service: 3/19/03. Response due by 4/7/2003. (dw1, ) Modified on 4/1/2003 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003, Terminated: 3/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [41] Motion for Summary Judgment,until May 7, 2003, by The United States.Service: 3/19/03. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003, Terminated: 7/3/2003 Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              MOTION, with one volume of exhibits, by HARSCO CORPORATION (Service: 3/10/03) to Strike certain statements and materials offered in support of Defendant's motion for partual summary judgment and brief support thereto. Response due: 3/27/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 03/13/2003
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS, with six volumes of exhibits, filed by HARSCO CORPORATION. Service: 3/10/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Response by HARSCO CORPORATION to [42-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 3/10/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by HARSCO CORPORATION (Service: 3/10/03) to [41-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 3/27/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Henry Hodges, Jr., with 5 volumes of appendix. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Discovery deadline is 4/18/03 , and Motion in Limine due 5/16/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 3/4/03) to Extend Time to complete discovery until 4/18/03. Response due: 3/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion for partial summary judgment Response to [41-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment due 3/10/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003, Terminated: 2/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by HARSCO CORPORATION (Service: 2/5/03) to Extend Time to respond to the motion for partial summary judgment , (until March 10, 2003). (FE) Modified on 02/13/2003
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [34-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental pleading (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Plaintinff's Response to [41-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment due 2/10/03 , Discovery deadline is 2/28/03 , Motions in Limine due 4/18/03 , (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file motion for partial summary judgment Motion for partial summary judgment due 12/23/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by HARSCO CORPORATION (Service : 1/7/03 ) to Amend the scheduling order: (1) Plaintiff's response to motion for partial summary judgment by 2/10/03; (2) Dicovery cuttoff by 2/28/03; (3) Exchange of trial exhibits by 4/4/03; (4) Final day to file motion in limine by 4/18/03; and (5) trial set for May 2003. Second of two event within one document. Response due: 1/24/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by HARSCO CORPORATION. First of two events within one document. Service: 1/7/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 12/23/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002, Terminated: 7/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 12/23/02) for Partial Summary Judgment as to the short-bed, drop-side cargo truck models: M9323A2 and M925A2, (together with a separate appendix). Response due: 1/22/03. (HW) Modified on 01/09/2003
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002, Terminated: 1/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/20/02) to Extend Time within which to file motion for partial summary judgment , (until December 23, 2002). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [34-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental pleading. Service: 11/13/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by HARSCO CORPORATION (Service: 11/1/02) to [34-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental pleading. Reply due: 11/18/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [36-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for leave to file supplemental pleading Response to [34-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental pleading reset to 11/4/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002, Terminated: 10/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by HARSCO CORPORATION (Service : 10/25/02 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for leave to file supplemental pleading [until November 2, 2002]. Response due: 11/12/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM by USA against HARSCO CORPORATION amending [7-1] answer by USA. (Ans. to Amd. Ans. Counterclaim due: 11/4/02 Service: 10/11/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002, Terminated: 2/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/11/02) for Leave to file supplemental pleading . Response due: 10/28/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 10/9/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by HARSCO CORPORATION (Service: 9/30/02) seeking the Court's attendance at motor vehicle demonstration . Response due: 10/17/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 10/1/02 , Discovery deadline is 11/12/02 , and Dispositive motions due 12/20/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 25, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories, granting [28-2] motion for Leave to file out of time Interrogatories deadline to 7/3/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002, Terminated: 7/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 6/13/02) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 7/3/02 and for Leave to file out of time . Response due: 7/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Status Conference set for 11:00 a.m. on 7/25/02 , Discovery cut-off and final day to file motions to compel due 9/18/02 , Final day to file dispositive motions 10/21/02; Final day to file motions in limine 12/4/02 , and Trial set for 1/13/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 5/28/02) to Extend Time to exchange expert witness reports and cor correlative adjustments to the schedule for discovery and trial until 7/22/02. Response due: 6/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER resetting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 7/25/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 6/5/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 3:00pm on 4/18/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Telephonic Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. 2/27/02 , Discovery deadline to 7/30/02 , Dispositive Motion Filing deadline to 8/30/02 , Motions in limine deadline to 10/15/02 and Trial for 11/4/02 - 11/8/02 ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by HARSCO CORPORATION and USA of proposed scheduling order . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER resetting Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. on 12/13/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Status Conference for 3:00pm 12/6/01 ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference by telephone at 11:00 a.m. 11/29/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER cancelling 9/20/01 status conference. Status Conference by telephone rescheduled for 11:00am, 10/4/01 ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 3:00 p.m. 9/20/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. on 7/31/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 6/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Discovery deadline to 1/31/02 , Dispositive Motion by 2/28/02 , Exchange of Trial Exhibits by 4/1/02 , (motions inlimine) Motion Filing deadline to 4/15/02 and Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. 7/31/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 5/30/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and request for admissions Interrogatories deadline to 4/20/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001, Terminated: 3/26/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by HARSCO CORPORATION (Service: 3/23/01) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and request for admissions (until 4/20/01). Response due: 4/9/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Telephonic Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 4/12/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT, by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by HARSCO CORPORATION to [7-2] counter claim by USA Service: 1/5/01. JPSR due 2/22/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by USA against HARSCO CORPORATION. Service: 12/22/00 (Answer to counterclaim due 1/16/01). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 12/26/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of reassignment to Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000, Terminated: 10/31/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/17/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until December 23, 2000]. Response due: 11/3/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by George Loring Squires. Service: 9/7/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT (Filed with 2 large bound volumes containing Exhibits 1 through 24), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050273. Answer due on 10/24/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 191 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?